SCATTAGLIA v. MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: GERALD SCATTAGLIA, JR.
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1 -10 and MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv12750
Filed: June 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
2 Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint by MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(GLADBACH, ERIC)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti for all further proceedings. Judge John Michael Vazquez no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/30/2021. (jr)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that the deadline for Defendant to move or otherwise respond is extended up to and including 8/13/2021, with the Motion date being 9/7/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 7/12/2021. (bt, ) Modified on 7/13/2021 (bt, ).
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 Letter from Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC with Proposed Joint Consent Order Extending Time to Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GLADBACH, ERIC)
June 28, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/9/2021. (bt, )
June 23, 2021 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Attorney ERIC FRANCIS GLADBACH for MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC added. (GLADBACH, ERIC)
June 21, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) (GLADBACH, ERIC)
June 21, 2021 Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (ps)
June 18, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC identifying Daimler North America Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (GLADBACH, ERIC)
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC from NJ Superior Court/ Middlesex County, case number MID-L-2759-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12558742), filed by MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Other State Court Papers, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(GLADBACH, ERIC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCATTAGLIA v. MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERALD SCATTAGLIA, JR.
Represented By: LEWIS G. ADLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1 -10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC
Represented By: ERIC FRANCIS GLADBACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?