KONSTANTINOVA v. GARBUZOV et al
Plaintiff: ANNA KONSTANTINOVA
Defendant: AUTO PRODUCT GROUP, INC., ALEXANDER GARBUZOV and IGOR MYASNIKOV
Case Number: 2:2021cv12795
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: William J Martini
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by H SARAH KIM on behalf of ANNA KONSTANTINOVA (KIM, H SARAH)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LETTER ORDER scheduling a Telephone Conference on 9/13/2021 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 7/13/2021. (lag, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by AUTO PRODUCT GROUP, INC., ALEXANDER GARBUZOV. (THIBODAUX, ROY)
June 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by STEWART M. LEVISS on behalf of AUTO PRODUCT GROUP, INC., ALEXANDER GARBUZOV (LEVISS, STEWART)
June 22, 2021 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to First Amended Complaint.. (THIBODAUX, ROY)
June 22, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ALEXANDER GARBUZOV, AUTO PRODUCT GROUP, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/12/2021. (lag, )
June 21, 2021 Filing 4 Clerk's Letter: Attorney is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorney's address. (ps)
June 21, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by AUTO PRODUCT GROUP, INC., ALEXANDER GARBUZOV of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1446(d) (THIBODAUX, ROY)
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AUTO PRODUCT GROUP, INC.. (THIBODAUX, ROY)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ALEXANDER GARBUZOV, AUTO PRODUCT GROUP, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Bergen County, case number BER-L-8798-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12563439), filed by ALEXANDER GARBUZOV, AUTO PRODUCT GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(THIBODAUX, ROY)
June 21, 2021 Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KONSTANTINOVA v. GARBUZOV et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNA KONSTANTINOVA
Represented By: H SARAH KIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUTO PRODUCT GROUP, INC.
Represented By: ROY J. THIBODAUX, III
Represented By: STEWART M. LEVISS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDER GARBUZOV
Represented By: ROY J. THIBODAUX, III
Represented By: STEWART M. LEVISS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IGOR MYASNIKOV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?