BERMUDEZ v. GLOUCESTER ENGINEERING CO., INC. et al
Plaintiff: KATHERIN J. BERMUDEZ
Defendant: DAVIS-STANDARD, LLC, GLOUCESTER ENGINEERING CO., INC. and ABC CO., INC. 1-10
Case Number: 2:2021cv13370
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jessica S Allen
Referring Judge: William J Martini
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by DAVIS-STANDARD, LLC. Responses due by 10/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Bermudez Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Removal Papers, #4 Exhibit C - Consent Order for Davis-Standard, #5 Exhibit D - Consent Order for Gloucester, #6 Exhibit E - Murphy Declaration (with Exhibits 1, 2, 3), #7 Exhibit F - Whipple Declaration (with Exhibit 1), #8 Exhibit G - Rojas Decision (10.13.20))(RUTKOWSKI, DAVID)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER extending Defendant Gloucester Engineering Co. Inc's time to Answer, Move or otherwise respond the the Complaint until 9/3/2021 re #10 Proposed Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 8/20/2021. (bt, )
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Proposed Order Extending Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by GLOUCESTER ENGINEERING CO., INC.. (GAFFREY, MARC)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT ORDER extending Defendant Davis Standard, LLC time to Answer, Move or otherwise respond to the Complaint until 9/3/2021 re #8 Proposed Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 8/9/2021. (bt, )
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Proposed Order Stipulated Consent by DAVIS-STANDARD, LLC. (RUTKOWSKI, DAVID)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Registered Agent on 7/15/2021, filed by KATHERIN J. BERMUDEZ. (KONRAY, ROY)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT ORDER granting Defendant Davis-Standard LLC extension until 8/10/2021 to Answer, Move or Otherwise Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint re #5 Proposed Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 7/16/2021. (bt, )
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Proposed Order Stipulated Consent by DAVIS-STANDARD, LLC. (RUTKOWSKI, DAVID)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #4 Application and Clerk Order to Ext Answer filed by D. RUTKOWSKI on 07/06/2021 was submitted incorrectly as a Proposed Order. For future reference, please refer to the event "Application and Clerk Order to Ext Answer," which can be found under "Civil, Other Filings, Other Documents." This message is for informational purposes only. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dam)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Attorney Information for Plaintiff KATHERIN J. BERMUNDEZ has been added. Caption modified to reflect information in State Court Complaint. Jury Demand modified from Defendant to Plaintiff. Party Information modified to reflect information in State Court Complaint. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (dam)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application and Clerk Order to Ext Answer filed by DAVIS-STANDARD, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/27/2021. (dam)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. (jr)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Proposed Order for extension of time to answer, move, or otherwise reply by DAVIS-STANDARD, LLC. (RUTKOWSKI, DAVID)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DAVIS-STANDARD, LLC. (RUTKOWSKI, DAVID)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DAVIS-STANDARD, LLC from SUPERIOR COURT OF BERGEN COUNTY, case number BER-L-3501-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12607959), filed by DAVIS-STANDARD, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(RUTKOWSKI, DAVID) Modified on 7/7/2021 (dam).
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal by DAVIS-STANDARD, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(RUTKOWSKI, DAVID) Modified on 7/7/2021 (dam).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BERMUDEZ v. GLOUCESTER ENGINEERING CO., INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVIS-STANDARD, LLC
Represented By: DAVID E. RUTKOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLOUCESTER ENGINEERING CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CO., INC. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHERIN J. BERMUDEZ
Represented By: ROY JOSEPH KONRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?