CROCS, INC. v. DR. LEONARD'S HEALTHCARE CORP. et al
Plaintiff: CROCS, INC.
Defendant: DR. LEONARD'S HEALTHCARE CORP. agent of D/B/A CAROL WRIGHT, STAR BAY GROUP INC., 718CLOSEOUTS, ROYAL DELUXE ACCESSORIES, LLC, FUJIAN HUAYUAN WELL IMPORT AND EXPORT TRADE CO., LTD. and DR. LEONARD'S HEALTHCARE CORP. doing business as CAROL WRIGHT
Case Number: 2:2021cv13583
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Katharine S Hayden
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted by CROCS, INC. as to STAR BAY GROUP INC.. (FISHMAN, PAUL)
September 7, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted by CROCS, INC. as to ROYAL DELUXE ACCESSORIES, LLC. (FISHMAN, PAUL)
September 7, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted by CROCS, INC. as to 718CLOSEOUTS. (FISHMAN, PAUL)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice of Fujian Huayuan Well Import and Export Trade Co., Ltd. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 9/2/2021. (ams, )
September 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice of Fujian Huayuan Well Import and Export Trade Col, Ltd. by CROCS, INC. (FISHMAN, PAUL)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice of Dr. Leonard's Healthcare Corp. d/b/a Carol Wright. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 8/23/2021. (ams, )
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal [PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DR. LEONARD'S HEALTHCARE CORP. D/B/A CAROL WRIGHT] by CROCS, INC. (FISHMAN, PAUL)
July 13, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to 718CLOSEOUTS, DR. LEONARD'S HEALTHCARE CORP., FUJIAN HUAYUAN WELL IMPORT AND EXPORT TRADE CO., LTD., ROYAL DELUXE ACCESSORIES, LLC, STAR BAY GROUP INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Exhibits) (ams, )
July 13, 2021 Judge Katharine S. Hayden and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (ps)
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CROCS, INC.. (FISHMAN, PAUL)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 718CLOSEOUTS, DR. LEONARD'S HEALTHCARE CORP., FUJIAN HUAYUAN WELL IMPORT AND EXPORT TRADE CO., LTD., ROYAL DELUXE ACCESSORIES, LLC, STAR BAY GROUP INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12624535) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CROCS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(FISHMAN, PAUL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CROCS, INC. v. DR. LEONARD'S HEALTHCARE CORP. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CROCS, INC.
Represented By: PAUL JOSEPH FISHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. LEONARD'S HEALTHCARE CORP. agent of D/B/A CAROL WRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STAR BAY GROUP INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 718CLOSEOUTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROYAL DELUXE ACCESSORIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FUJIAN HUAYUAN WELL IMPORT AND EXPORT TRADE CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. LEONARD'S HEALTHCARE CORP. doing business as CAROL WRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?