RAMOS v. WALMART INC.
Plaintiff: JACQUELINE RAMOS and EDWIN JOHNSON
Defendant: WALMART, INC. and WALMART INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv13827
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Andre M Espinosa
2 Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting #126 Walmart's Motion to Seal Exhibit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 2/6/2023. (dam)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Letter from Gregory Chiarello and Robert T. Quackenboss re Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 132 NOTICE by EDWIN JOHNSON, JACQUELINE RAMOS Notice of Subsequent Ruling Impacting Discovery Dispute (CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting #130 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order; that the fact discovery deadline is extended to July 28, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 1/27/2023. (ld, )
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: Fact Discovery due by 7/28/2023. (ld, )
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #130 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #39 Scheduling Order, . Motion set for 2/21/2023 before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #39 Scheduling Order, by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Amend Scheduling Order)(CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER that Walmart's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (ECF No. 79) is DENIED; that Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings (ECF No. 86), requesting the Court impose a six-year statute of limitations period on their CHRIA claim, is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 1/12/2023. (ld, )
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 128 OPINION. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 1/12/2023. (ld, )
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 127 TEXT ORDER Due to the Court's scheduling needs, the telephonic status conference previously set for January 19, 2023, is rescheduled to February 27, 2023, at 2:00 p.m. A joint status letter must be filed by February 22, 2023. To join the conference, dial 866-434-5269 and enter access code 1874589#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 1/11/2023. (mp)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #126 MOTION to Seal Exhibits to Joint Dispute Letter. Motion set for 2/6/2023 before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MOTION to Seal Exhibits to Joint Dispute Letter by WALMART INC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(QUACKENBOSS, ROBERT).
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Exhibit to #124 Letter Ex. C to Joint Discovery Dispute Letter by All Plaintiffs. (CHIARELLO, GREGORY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Letter from Counsel (Joint Discovery Dispute Letter). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice counsel, ADAM KLEIN, ESQ., DANIEL STROMBERG, ESQ., and JARRON D. MCALLISTER, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jarron D. McAllister to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13873370.) (CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Daniel Stromberg to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13873362.) (CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Adam Klein to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13873345.) (CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Transcript of Telephone Conference held on October 24, 2022, before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Transcriber: King Transcription Services (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 12/23/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/2/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/2/2023. (wh)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF DANIEL S. STROMBERG, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 11/30/2022. (ld, )
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JARRON D. McALLISTER, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 11/30/2022. (ld, )
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ADAM KLEIN, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 11/30/2022. (ld, )
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Letter from Gregory S. Chiarello re Pro Hac Vice Admission of Adam Klein. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Adam Klein, #2 Certification of Gregory Chiarello, #3 Proposed Order)(CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Letter from Gregory S. Chiarello re Pro Hac Vice Admission of Daniel S. Stromberg. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Daniel S. Stromberg, #2 Certification of Gregory Chiarello, #3 Proposed Order)(CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Letter from Gregory S. Chiarello re Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jarron D. McAllister. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jarron D. McAllister, #2 Certification of Gregory Chiarello, #3 Proposed Order)(CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting #105 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to DANIEL J. BUTLER, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 11/21/2022. (ld, )
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting #106 Motion to Seal Exhibits to Joint Dispute Letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 11/21/2022. (ld, )
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 NOTICE of Change of Address by GREGORY S CHIARELLO (CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 NOTICE of Change of Address by GREGORY S CHIARELLO (CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #105 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #106 Consent MOTION to Seal Exhibits to Joint Dispute Letter. Motion reset for 11/21/2022 before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 109 REDACTION to #89 MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Motion to Quash Defendant's Third-Party Subpoenas, #90 Declaration,,, Exhibit E to Declaration of Christopher M. McNerney in Support of Motion to Quash - Redacted by EDWIN JOHNSON, JACQUELINE RAMOS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F to Declaration of Christopher M. McNerney in Support of Motion to Quash - Redacted)(CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #96 Motion to Seal Document #96 MOTION to Seal Document #90 Declaration,,, Motion to Seal Exhibits E and F to Declaration of Christopher McNerney in Support of Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 11/7/2022. (ld, )
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 TEXT ORDER As discussed during the October 24, 2022 conference, the fact discovery deadline is extended to February 28, 2023. The next telephonic status conference will take place on January 19, 2023, at 3:00 p.m. At least three business days prior, the parties shall file a joint status letter not to exceed three pages double-spaced. To join the conference, dial 866-434-5269 and enter access code 1874589#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 10/26/2022. (mp)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa: Telephone Conference held on 10/24/2022. TO entered (spc) (ECR)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Consent MOTION to Seal Exhibits to Joint Dispute Letter by WALMART INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Notice of Motion to Seal Exhibits, #2 Declaration of Thomas R. Waskom in Support of Motion to Seal Exhibits, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(QUACKENBOSS, ROBERT)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by WALMART INC.. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Robert T. Quackenboss in Support of Motion, #2 Statement of Daniel J. Butler in Support of Motion, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(QUACKENBOSS, ROBERT)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #105 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 11/21/2022 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #106 Consent MOTION to Seal Exhibits to Joint Dispute Letter. Motion set for 11/21/2022 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 TEXT ORDER The Court has reviewed the joint status letter of October 19, 2022 [D.E. 102]. As to the outstanding dispute concerning the scope of discovery related to Plaintiffs' request for information about Walmart's background check policy (i.e. "Issues 1 and 2"), the parties shall engage in one additional meet and confer session prior to the upcoming status conference. No later than noon on October 24, 2022, the parties shall file a joint letter setting forth Plaintiffs' October 6 proposal for resolving that dispute, Walmart's objections thereto, and any progress made in the meet and confer. The parties shall be prepared to address this matter during the October 24, 2022 conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 10/20/2022. (mp)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by EDWIN JOHNSON, JACQUELINE RAMOS re #89 MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Motion to Quash Defendant's Third-Party Subpoenas (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Christopher M. McNerney, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H, #4 Exhibit I)(CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Time Change: The telephonic conference scheduled for October 24, 2022, will now take place at 4:00 p.m. (mp)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Letter from Counsel (Joint Status Letter) re #84 Scheduling Order. (CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE REPLY; that Plaintiffs are GRANTED leave to file the proposed brief attached as Exhibit 1 to their October 11, 2022 letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 10/18/2022. (ld, )
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Reply by EDWIN JOHNSON, JACQUELINE RAMOS re #99 Letter,,. (CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Letter from Gregory S. Chiarello Requesting Leave to File Reply in Support of Cross-Motion to Quash re #89 MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Motion to Quash Defendant's Third-Party Subpoenas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Quash, #2 Supplemental Declaration of Christopher McNerney in Support of Motion to Quash, #3 Exhibit G to McNerney Supplemental Declaration, #4 Exhibit H to McNerney Supplemental Declaration, #5 Exhibit I to McNerney Supplemental Declaration)(CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that at the direction of counsel, the Clerk's Office has unsealed the #97 Letter filed by R. QUACKENBOSS on 10/7/2022 (dam)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Exhibit to #97 Letter,, Sealed Exhibits by WALMART INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (sealed), #2 Exhibit B (sealed))(QUACKENBOSS, ROBERT)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Letter from Counsel (Joint Discovery Dispute Letter). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (QUACKENBOSS, ROBERT) Modified on 10/11/2022 (dam).
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #96 MOTION to Seal Document #90 Declaration,,, Motion to Seal Exhibits E and F to Declaration of Christopher McNerney in Support of Motion to Quash. Motion set for 11/7/2022 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MOTION to Seal Document #90 Declaration,,, Motion to Seal Exhibits E and F to Declaration of Christopher McNerney in Support of Motion to Quash by EDWIN JOHNSON, JACQUELINE RAMOS. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Declaration of Christopher McNerney, #3 Proposed Order)(CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE of Change of Address by GREGORY S CHIARELLO (CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by WALMART INC. re #89 MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Motion to Quash Defendant's Third-Party Subpoenas (QUACKENBOSS, ROBERT)
October 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Letter from Counsel re #92 Letter. (QUACKENBOSS, ROBERT)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Letter from Gregory Chiarello re #86 Cross MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Cross-Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Reply, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by WALMART INC. re #79 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by WALMART INC. re #77 Order, #86 Cross MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Cross-Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings (QUACKENBOSS, ROBERT)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #89 MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Motion to Quash Defendant's Third-Party Subpoenas. Motion set for 10/17/2022 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 DECLARATION of Christopher McNerney re #89 MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Motion to Quash Defendant's Third-Party Subpoenas by EDWIN JOHNSON, JACQUELINE RAMOS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(CHIARELLO, GREGORY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Motion to Quash Defendant's Third-Party Subpoenas by EDWIN JOHNSON, JACQUELINE RAMOS. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Declaration of Christopher McNerney, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Proposed Order)(CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 TEXT ORDER The Court has reviewed the letter and attached exhibits at D.E. 87. Plaintiffs are granted leave to file a motion to quash the subpoenas, identified therein, on or before September 21, 2022. Accordingly, the deadline for responding to the subject subpoenas is stayed pending resolution of the imminent motion, and Defendant shall so advise the subpoenaed parties. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 9/12/2022. (mp)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Letter from Gregory S. Chiarello Requesting Leave to File Motion to Quash. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #86 Cross MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Cross-Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. Motion set for 10/3/2022 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Cross MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Cross-Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings by EDWIN JOHNSON, JACQUELINE RAMOS. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings and in Support of Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings, #2 Proposed Order)(CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Letter from Counsel (Joint Status Letter) re #77 Order. (CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 10/24/2022 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Fact Discovery due by 12/16/2022.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 8/22/2022. (ld, )
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 TEXT ORDER: The #80 motion for an extension of time is GRANTED. The #79 motion will be construed as a 12(c) motion. SO ORDERED by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 08/22/2022. (lr, )
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 DECLARATION of Thomas R. Waskom in Support of Defendant's Appeal of Magistrate Judge's Discovery Order, or in the Alternative, Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by WALMART INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(QUACKENBOSS, ROBERT)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Transcript of Telephone Conference held on July 20, 2022, before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Court Transcriber: King Transcription Services (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 9/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/19/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2022. (adc)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #80 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Motion set for 9/19/2022 before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jd, )
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #79 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by WALMART INC. re #77 Order by EDWIN JOHNSON, JACQUELINE RAMOS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by WALMART INC. re #77 Order (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(QUACKENBOSS, ROBERT)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #79 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by WALMART INC. re #77 Order. Motion set for 9/6/2022 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Letter from Counsel (Joint Supplemental Letter Brief) re #77 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 7/29/2022. (ld, )
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa: Telephone Conference held on 7/22/2022. Order to be filed. (spc, )
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice counsel, CHIAMAKA ECHEBIRI, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Chiamaka Echebiri to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13575138.) (CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF CHIAMAKA ECHEBIRI, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 7/21/2022. (ld, )
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa: Telephone Conference held on 7/20/2022. Order to be filed. (Court Reporter, ECR) (spc)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Letter from Gregory S. Chiarello re Pro Hac Vice Admission of Chiamaka Echebiri. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Chiamaka Echebiri, #2 Certification of Gregory Chiarello, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Letter from Counsel (Second Joint Discovery Dispute Letter). (QUACKENBOSS, ROBERT)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Letter from Counsel (Joint Status Letter). (QUACKENBOSS, ROBERT)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 6/9/2022. (sm)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #64 Motion to Withdraw Christy E. Kiely, as pro hac vice Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 6/7/2022. (sm)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Proposed Order Revised Proposed Confidentiality Order by EDWIN JOHNSON, JACQUELINE RAMOS. (CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice counsel, THOMAS R. WASKOM, ESQ. and MEGHAN A. PODOLNY, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Meghan A. Podolny to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (QUACKENBOSS, ROBERT)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Thomas R. Waskom to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (QUACKENBOSS, ROBERT)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 5/31/2022. (ld, )
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 TEXT ORDER A telephonic status conference is scheduled for July 20, 2022, at 3:00 p.m. At least three business days prior, the parties shall file a joint status letter not to exceed three pages double-spaced. To join the conference, dial 866-434-5269 and enter access code 1874589#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 5/18/2022. (mp)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion Requesting Withdrawal of Christy E. Kiely as Attorney of Record by WALMART INC.. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order re Motion Requesting Withdrawal of Christy E. Kiely as Attorney of Record)(QUACKENBOSS, ROBERT)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee received: as to Meghan A. Podolny $ 150, receipt number TRE126569 (kht)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #64 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion Requesting Withdrawal of Christy E. Kiely as Attorney of Record. Motion set for 6/21/2022 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee received: as to Thomas R. Waskom $ 150, receipt number TRE126570 (kht)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #57 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to MEGHAN A. PODOLNY, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 5/10/2022. (ld, )
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #56 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to THOMAS R. WASKOM, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 5/10/2022. (ld, )
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER GOVERNING THE DISCLOSURE OF PRIVILEGED INFORMATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 5/10/2022. (ld, )
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Proposed Order Revised Proposed Order by WALMART INC.. (QUACKENBOSS, ROBERT)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONCERNING PRODUCTION OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 5/6/2022. (ld, )
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa: Telephone Conference held on 5/3/2022. order to be filed. (spc)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #56 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #57 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 6/6/2022 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #53 Motion to Withdraw #53 MOTION to Withdraw #17 Notice of Appearance of Jessica Lopez as Attorney for Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 5/2/2022. (ld, )
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by WALMART INC.. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Robert T. Quackenboss in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Meghan A. Podolny, #2 Statement of Meghan A. Podolny in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(QUACKENBOSS, ROBERT)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by WALMART INC.. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Robert T. Quackenboss in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Thomas R. Waskom, #2 Statement of Thomas R. Waskom in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(QUACKENBOSS, ROBERT)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Proposed Order Revised by EDWIN JOHNSON, JACQUELINE RAMOS re #53 MOTION to Withdraw #17 Notice of Appearance of Jessica Lopez as Attorney for Plaintiffs. (CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #53 MOTION to Withdraw #17 Notice of Appearance of Jessica Lopez as Attorney for Plaintiffs. Motion set for 6/6/2022 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Letter from Counsel (Joint Status Letter). (QUACKENBOSS, ROBERT)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION to Withdraw #17 Notice of Appearance of Jessica Lopez as Attorney for Plaintiffs by EDWIN JOHNSON, JACQUELINE RAMOS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Letter from Counsel (Joint Letter re Proposed Agreed Confidentiality Order). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(QUACKENBOSS, ROBERT)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Letter from Gregory Chiarello and Robert T. Quackenboss re Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 TEXT ORDER The Court has reviewed the letters at D.E. 48 and 49. The May 3, 2022 status conference shall proceed as scheduled. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 4/26/2022. (mp)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Letter from Gregory Chiarello in Opposition to Defendant's Request to Adjourn Status Conference re #48 Letter. (CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Letter from Robert T. Quackenboss re Walmart's Request to Reschedule the May 3, 2022 Status Conference. (QUACKENBOSS, ROBERT)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Concerning Production of Electronically Stored Information by EDWIN JOHNSON, JACQUELINE RAMOS. (CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Proposed Order Stipulated Order Governing the Disclosure of Privileged Information by WALMART INC.. (QUACKENBOSS, ROBERT)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice counsel, ELIANA THEODOROU, ESQ. and SHOMARI WARD, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Shomari Ward to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13212059.) (CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Eliana Theodorou to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13212023.) (CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ELIANA THEODOROU, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 2/15/2022. (ld, )
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF LUKAS MOFFETT, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 2/15/2022. (ld, )
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF SHOMARI WARD, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 2/15/2022. (ld, )
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Letter from Gregory S. Chiarello re Pro Hac Vice Admission of Eliana Theodorou. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Eliana Theodorou, #2 Statement of Gregory Chiarello, #3 Proposed Order)(CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 5/3/2022 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Amended Pleadings due by 7/27/2022. Fact Discovery due by 8/27/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 7/27/2022.;etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 2/7/2022. (ld, )
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa: Scheduling Conference held on 1/31/2022. Initial scheduling order to be filed. (spc)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Letter from Gregory S. Chiarello re Pro Hac Vice Admission of Shomari Ward. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Gregory Chiarello, #2 Certification of Shomari Ward, #3 Proposed Order)(CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #37 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Notice of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Lukas Moffett. Motion set for 2/22/2022 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Notice of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Lukas Moffett by WALMART INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certified Statement of Lukas Moffett in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Certified Statement of Robert T. Quackenboss in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Lukas Moffett, #3 Proposed Order Granting PHV Admission of Lukas Moffett)(QUACKENBOSS, ROBERT)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Scheduling Initial R16 Conference for 1/31/2022 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 1/12/2022. (spc)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendant's Answer and Defenses to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint by WALMART INC..(QUACKENBOSS, ROBERT)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 AMENDED COMPLAINT [Second] against WALMART INC., filed by JACQUELINE RAMOS, EDWIN JOHNSON.(CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Joint Discovery Plan by All Plaintiffs.(CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding filing of second amended complaint, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 12/14/2021. (lag, )
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Regarding Filing of Second Amended Complaint by WALMART INC.. (QUACKENBOSS, ROBERT)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendant's Answers and Defenses to Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint by WALMART INC..(QUACKENBOSS, ROBERT)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Christy E. Kiely. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 11/16/2021. (ams, )
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #25 Defendant's motion for an extension of time. Defendant shall answer, move, or otherwise reply to the Amended Complaint no later than November 29, 2021. No further extensions will be granted. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 11/16/2021. (qa, )
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #25 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . Motion set for 12/20/2021 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, )
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by WALMART INC. re #25 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (QUACKENBOSS, ROBERT)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by EDWIN JOHNSON, JACQUELINE RAMOS re #25 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Attachments: #1 Certification of Ossai Miazad, #2 Exhibit A)(CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by WALMART INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Declaration of R. Quackenboss in Support of Application for Extension of Time, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(QUACKENBOSS, ROBERT)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE REPLY PURSUANT TO L.CIV.R. 6.1(b); that Defendant, Walmart Inc. shall have up to and including November 18, 2021 to file its responsive pleading to the Complaint.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 11/1/2021. (ld, )
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 Amended Complaint Consented-To Application for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Reply Pursuant to L.CIV.R. 6.1(b) by WALMART INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(QUACKENBOSS, ROBERT)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Notice of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Christy E. Kiely. Motion set for 11/15/2021 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Notice of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Christy E. Kiely by WALMART INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certified Statement of Christy E. Kiely in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Certified Statement of Robert T. Quackenboss in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Christy E. Kiely, #3 Proposed Order Granting PHV Admission of Christy E. Kiely)(QUACKENBOSS, ROBERT)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that Defendant's Application for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, orOtherwise Reply pursuant to Local Civil Rule 6.1(b) is GRANTED; that Defendant, Walmart Inc. shall have up to and including November 8, 2021 to file its responsive pleading to the Complaint. The Clerk is also directed to change the case style to reflect the proper Defendant entity name: Walmart Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 10/15/2021. (ld, )
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WALMART, INC.. (QUACKENBOSS, ROBERT)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 Amended Complaint Application for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Reply Pursuant to L.CIV.R. 6.1(b) by WALMART, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(QUACKENBOSS, ROBERT)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JACQUELINE RAMOS, EDWIN JOHNSON. WALMART, INC. served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA LIAT LOPEZ on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LOPEZ, JESSICA)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice counsel, CHRISTOPHER M. MCNERNEY, ESQ., POOJA SHETHJI, ESQ., OSSAI MIAZAD, ESQ. and MICHAEL C. POPE, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R., ESQ.101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against WALMART, INC., filed by JACQUELINE RAMOS, EDWIN JOHNSON.(CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Michael C. Pope to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12826521.) (CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Ossai Miazad to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12820992.) (CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Pooja Shethji to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12820962.) (CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Christopher M. McNerney to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12820906.) (CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to MICHAEL C. POPE, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 9/20/2021. (ld, )
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to POOJA SHETHJI, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 9/20/2021. (ld, )
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to CHRISTOPHER M. MCNERNEY, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 9/20/2021. (ld, )
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to OSSAI MIAZAD, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 9/20/2021. (ld, )
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 9/20/2021 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by JACQUELINE RAMOS. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Gregory Chiarello, #2 Certification of Michael C. Pope, #3 Proposed Order)(CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti for all further proceedings. Judge Claire C. Cecchi no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 8/11/2021. (mfr)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ossai Miazad, #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher M. McNerney, #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Pooja Shethji. Motion set for 9/7/2021 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Pooja Shethji by JACQUELINE RAMOS. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Gregory S. Chiarello, #2 Certification of Pooja Shethji, #3 Proposed Order)(CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher M. McNerney by JACQUELINE RAMOS. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Gregory S. Chiarello, #2 Certification of Christopher M. McNerney, #3 Proposed Order)(CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ossai Miazad by JACQUELINE RAMOS. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Gregory S. Chiarello, #2 Certification of Ossai Miazad, #3 Proposed Order)(CHIARELLO, GREGORY)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to WALMART, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. (ak, )
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WALMART, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12642599) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JACQUELINE RAMOS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CHIARELLO, GREGORY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RAMOS v. WALMART INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACQUELINE RAMOS
Represented By: GREGORY S CHIARELLO
Represented By: JESSICA LIAT LOPEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWIN JOHNSON
Represented By: JESSICA LIAT LOPEZ
Represented By: GREGORY S CHIARELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALMART, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALMART INC.
Represented By: ROBERT T. QUACKENBOSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?