SIWELL, INC. v. VOLOSEVICH et al
Plaintiff: Siwell, Inc. d/b/a Capital Mortgage Services Of Texas and SIWELL, INC. doing business as CAPITAL MORTGAGE SERVICES OF TEXAS
Defendant: Alexei Volosevich, Tammy Sewell, Foundation Real Estate LLC, Joseph James Real Estate Company and Clear Skies Title Agency LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv13852
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Julien Xavier Neals
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CLEAR SKIES TITLE AGENCY LLC re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint on pro se/non-CM/ECF defendants (COOPER, RYAN)
September 17, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (ams, )
September 17, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono. Motion set for 10/18/2021 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, )
September 16, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Motion set for 10/18/2021 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, )
September 15, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by CLEAR SKIES TITLE AGENCY LLC. Responses due by 10/4/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(COOPER, RYAN)
August 26, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono by ALEXEI VOLOSEVICH. (ams, )
August 26, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by ALEXEI VOLOSEVICH.(lag, ) Modified on 9/16/2021 (lag, ).
August 26, 2021 Filing 7 Consent Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically from Alexei Volosevich. (lag, )
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet served on Foundation Real Estate on 8/11/2021, filed by SIWELL, INC.. (LIGHT, DANIELLE)
August 13, 2021 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Clear Skies Title Agency LLC. Attorney RYAN JOHN COOPER for CLEAR SKIES TITLE AGENCY LLC added. (COOPER, RYAN)
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet served on Tammy Sewell on 08/04/2021, filed by SIWELL, INC.. (LIGHT, DANIELLE)
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint, and Demand for Jury Trial served on Clear Skies Title Agency LLC on 7/26/2021, filed by SIWELL, INC.., SUMMONS Returned Executed by SIWELL, INC.. CLEAR SKIES TITLE AGENCY LLC served on 7/26/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (LIGHT, DANIELLE)
July 20, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Julien Xavier Neals and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Clear Skies Title Agency LLC, Foundation Real Estate LLC, Joseph James Real Estate Company, Tammy Sewell, Alexei Volosevich. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Clear Skies Title Agency LLC, Foundation Real Estate LLC, Joseph James Real Estate Company, Tammy Sewell, Alexei Volosevich ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12644956) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Siwell, Inc. d/b/a Capital Mortgage Services Of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LIGHT, DANIELLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIWELL, INC. v. VOLOSEVICH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siwell, Inc. d/b/a Capital Mortgage Services Of Texas
Represented By: DANIELLE PAULA LIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIWELL, INC. doing business as CAPITAL MORTGAGE SERVICES OF TEXAS
Represented By: DANIELLE PAULA LIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexei Volosevich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Sewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foundation Real Estate LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph James Real Estate Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Skies Title Agency LLC
Represented By: RYAN JOHN COOPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?