PATRICK v. CORMEDIX INC. et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT PATRICK
Defendant: CORMEDIX INC., KHOSO BALUCH, MATTHEW DAVID and PHOEBE MOUNTS
Case Number: 2:2021cv14020
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Julien Xavier Neals
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JEREMY A. LIEBERMAN and ALEXANDER J. HOOD II, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (bt, )
August 16, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice J. Alexander Hood II to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12722188.) (PRZYBYLOWSKI, THOMAS)
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jeremy A. Lieberman to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12722177.) (PRZYBYLOWSKI, THOMAS)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 and #5 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to JEREMY A. LIEBERMAN and J. ALEXANDER HOOD II etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/13/2021. (bt, )
August 13, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 9/7/2021 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, )
August 12, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jeremy A. Lieberman and J. Alexander Hood II by ROBERT PATRICK re #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (PRZYBYLOWSKI, THOMAS)
August 12, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ROBERT PATRICK. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Thomas H. Przybylowski, #2 Declaration of J. Alexander Hood II, #3 Certificate of Good Standing)(PRZYBYLOWSKI, THOMAS)
August 12, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ROBERT PATRICK. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Thomas H. Przybylowski, #2 Declaration of Jeremy A. Lieberman, #3 Certificate of Good Standing)(PRZYBYLOWSKI, THOMAS)
July 26, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to KHOSO BALUCH, CORMEDIX INC., MATTHEW DAVID, PHOEBE MOUNTS. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, )
July 22, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Julien Xavier Neals and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, )
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by ROBERT PATRICK as to KHOSO BALUCH, CORMEDIX INC., MATTHEW DAVID, PHOEBE MOUNTS. (PRZYBYLOWSKI, THOMAS)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KHOSO BALUCH, CORMEDIX INC., MATTHEW DAVID, PHOEBE MOUNTS ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12653846) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ROBERT PATRICK. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Schedule A, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(PRZYBYLOWSKI, THOMAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PATRICK v. CORMEDIX INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT PATRICK
Represented By: THOMAS HENRY PRZYBYLOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORMEDIX INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KHOSO BALUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW DAVID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHOEBE MOUNTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?