WYNDHAM HOTELS & RESORTS, INC. et al v. LINCOLN HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC et al
Plaintiff: WYNDHAM HOTELS & RESORTS, INC. and DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.
Defendant: LINCOLN HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC, LINCOLN HOTELS, LLC, SHAHIN KHAN, BUKHARI KHAN and ISMAT KHAN
Case Number: 2:2021cv15995
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Esther Salas
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2021 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW045478 as to John Christy (lag, )
October 13, 2021 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JOHN A CHRISTY, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (lag, )
October 8, 2021 Filing 17 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice John Christy to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (BIALKOWSKI, STEPHEN)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to JOHN CHRISTY, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/6/2021. (lag, )
October 5, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of John Christy, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(BIALKOWSKI, STEPHEN)
October 2, 2021 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ek)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LETTER ORDER scheduling a Telephone Conference on 11/16/2021 at 11:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/1/2021. (lag, )
September 30, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by ISMAT KHAN, SHAHIN KHAN.(BIALKOWSKI, STEPHEN)
September 22, 2021 Filing 12 Certification of Patricia Z. Schiraldi Pursuant To Local Civil Rule 201.1(d)(3) on behalf of DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC., WYNDHAM HOTELS & RESORTS, INC.. (SCHIRALDI, PATRICIA)
September 21, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #8 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ISMAT KHAN, SHAHIN KHAN has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/5/2021. (lag, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WYNDHAM HOTELS & RESORTS, INC., DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.. BUKHARI KHAN waiver sent on 9/17/2021, answer due 11/16/2021. (SAGER, DAVID)
September 20, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WYNDHAM HOTELS & RESORTS, INC., DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.. LINCOLN HOTELS, LLC waiver sent on 9/17/2021, answer due 11/16/2021. (SAGER, DAVID)
September 20, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WYNDHAM HOTELS & RESORTS, INC., DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.. LINCOLN HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC waiver sent on 9/17/2021, answer due 11/16/2021. (SAGER, DAVID)
September 20, 2021 Filing 8 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (BIALKOWSKI, STEPHEN)
September 20, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN BIALKOWSKI on behalf of All Defendants (BIALKOWSKI, STEPHEN)
September 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICIA SCHIRALDI on behalf of DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC., WYNDHAM HOTELS & RESORTS, INC. (SCHIRALDI, PATRICIA)
September 10, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WYNDHAM HOTELS & RESORTS, INC., DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.. SHAHIN KHAN served on 8/31/2021, answer due 9/21/2021. (SAGER, DAVID)
September 10, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WYNDHAM HOTELS & RESORTS, INC., DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.. ISMAT KHAN served on 8/31/2021, answer due 9/21/2021. (SAGER, DAVID)
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BUKHARI KHAN, ISMAT KHAN, SHAHIN KHAN, LINCOLN HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC, LINCOLN HOTELS, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
August 25, 2021 Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (ps)
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC., WYNDHAM HOTELS & RESORTS, INC. identifying WYNDHAM HOTELS & RESORTS, INC. as Corporate Parent.. (SAGER, DAVID)
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BUKHARI KHAN, ISMAT KHAN, SHAHIN KHAN, LINCOLN HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC, LINCOLN HOTELS, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12745177), filed by WYNDHAM HOTELS & RESORTS, INC., DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(SAGER, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WYNDHAM HOTELS & RESORTS, INC. et al v. LINCOLN HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WYNDHAM HOTELS & RESORTS, INC.
Represented By: DAVID S. SAGER
Represented By: PATRICIA SCHIRALDI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.
Represented By: DAVID S. SAGER
Represented By: PATRICIA SCHIRALDI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINCOLN HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN BIALKOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINCOLN HOTELS, LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN BIALKOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAHIN KHAN
Represented By: STEPHEN BIALKOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUKHARI KHAN
Represented By: STEPHEN BIALKOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISMAT KHAN
Represented By: STEPHEN BIALKOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?