WYNDHAM HOTEL GROUP CANADA, ULC et al v. OSTRANDER
Plaintiff: WYNDHAM HOTEL GROUP CANADA, ULC and SUPER 8 WORLDWIDE, INC.
Defendant: BRIAN OSTRANDER
Case Number: 2:2021cv16333
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WYNDHAM HOTEL GROUP CANADA, ULC, SUPER 8 WORLDWIDE, INC.. BRIAN OSTRANDER served on 10/5/2021, answer due 10/26/2021. (COUCH, BRYAN)
September 1, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BRIAN OSTRANDER. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
August 31, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, )
August 31, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDER JAMES GACOS on behalf of SUPER 8 WORLDWIDE, INC., WYNDHAM HOTEL GROUP CANADA, ULC (GACOS, ALEXANDER)
August 31, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SUPER 8 WORLDWIDE, INC. identifying WYNDHAM HOTEL GROUP, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (COUCH, BRYAN)
August 31, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WYNDHAM HOTEL GROUP CANADA, ULC identifying WYNDHAM HOTEL GROUP, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (COUCH, BRYAN)
August 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BRIAN OSTRANDER ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12763695), filed by WYNDHAM HOTEL GROUP CANADA, ULC, SUPER 8 WORLDWIDE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(COUCH, BRYAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WYNDHAM HOTEL GROUP CANADA, ULC et al v. OSTRANDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WYNDHAM HOTEL GROUP CANADA, ULC
Represented By: ALEXANDER JAMES GACOS
Represented By: BRYAN PAUL COUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUPER 8 WORLDWIDE, INC.
Represented By: ALEXANDER JAMES GACOS
Represented By: BRYAN PAUL COUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN OSTRANDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?