INDUSTRIAL MINERAL HOLDINGS v. FLUITEC LLC
Plaintiff: INDUSTRIAL MINERAL HOLDINGS
Defendant: FLUITEC LLC, FLUITEC N.V., FLUITEC INTERNATIONAL, LLC, SOCIETE DU PONT NEUF, CINMAR B.V., ANDRE ANNICQ, JANHARM MUSTERS and PIERRE VANDERKELEL
Case Number: 2:2021cv16511
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #20 Letter submitted by FLUITEC N.V. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/15/2021. (bt, )
November 1, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #18 Letter submitted by SOCIETE DU PONT NEUF has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/15/2021. (bt, )
October 29, 2021 Filing 20 Letter from David Cook re #19 Notice of Appearance. (COOK, DAVID)
October 29, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID L. COOK on behalf of FLUITEC N.V. (COOK, DAVID)
October 29, 2021 Filing 18 Letter from David Cook re #17 Notice of Appearance. (COOK, DAVID)
October 29, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID L. COOK on behalf of SOCIETE DU PONT NEUF (COOK, DAVID)
October 29, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID L. COOK on behalf of FLUITEC INTERNATIONAL, LLC (COOK, DAVID)
October 26, 2021 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FLUITEC INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (COOK, DAVID)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/5/2022 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/26/21. (LM, )
October 26, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #12 7.1.1 Third Party Funding Statement filed by David Cook on 10/22/2021 was submitted with a Corporate Disclosure Statement. PLEASE RESUBMIT the Corporate Disclosure Statement USING the event CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT found under Other Filings -> Other Documents. (qa, )
October 22, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by FLUITEC INTERNATIONAL, LLC.(COOK, DAVID)
October 22, 2021 Filing 12 Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by FLUITEC INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (COOK, DAVID)
October 19, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by INDUSTRIAL MINERAL HOLDINGS re #1 Complaint, (MURPHY, J.)
October 7, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #10 submitted by FLUITEC INTERNATIONAL, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/22/2021. (sm)
October 6, 2021 Filing 10 Letter from David Cook re #4 Certificate of Service,. (COOK, DAVID)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LETTER ORDER denying #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; etc. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 10/6/2021. (sm)
October 3, 2021 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by INDUSTRIAL MINERAL HOLDINGS re #2 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MURPHY, J.)
October 1, 2021 Filing 7 BRIEF in Opposition filed by FLUITEC INTERNATIONAL, LLC re #2 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (COOK, DAVID)
October 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID L. COOK on behalf of FLUITEC INTERNATIONAL, LLC (Attachments: #1 Brief Fluitec Intl LLC Letter Opposing Emergency Motion)(COOK, DAVID)
September 27, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by INDUSTRIAL MINERAL HOLDINGS re #1 Complaint, (MURPHY, J.)
September 27, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by INDUSTRIAL MINERAL HOLDINGS re #2 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service)(MURPHY, J.)
September 10, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #2 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion set for 10/4/2021 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, )
September 8, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ANDRE ANNICQ, CINMAR B.V., FLUITEC INTERNATIONAL, LLC, FLUITEC N.V., JANHARM MUSTERS, PIERRE VANDERKELEL, SOCIETE DU PONT NEUF. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, )
September 8, 2021 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by INDUSTRIAL MINERAL HOLDINGS. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(MURPHY, J.)
September 3, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, )
September 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12774327), filed by INDUSTRIAL MINERAL HOLDINGS.(MURPHY, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INDUSTRIAL MINERAL HOLDINGS v. FLUITEC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDUSTRIAL MINERAL HOLDINGS
Represented By: J. TODD MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUITEC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUITEC N.V.
Represented By: DAVID L. COOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUITEC INTERNATIONAL, LLC
Represented By: DAVID L. COOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIETE DU PONT NEUF
Represented By: DAVID L. COOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CINMAR B.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDRE ANNICQ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANHARM MUSTERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PIERRE VANDERKELEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?