PERCELLA v. JUUL LABS INC. et al
Plaintiff: BRYAN PERCELLA
Defendant: JUUL LABS INC., PAX FOUNDATION, ALTRIA GROUP, INC., MEDUSA DISTRIBUTION, LLC D/B/A CARTISAN TECH, EONSMOKE, LLC, ELITE BROTHERS, LLC D/B/A SALTBAE50.COM, THE MADEWELL COLLECTIVE D/B/A MONSTER VAPE LABS, CREATIVE VAPES LABS, INC., WESTMAN HOLDING COMPANY, LLC, 7 DAZE, LLC, GOOD GUY VAPES FRANCHISING, LLC, GOOD GUY VAPES DISTRIBUTION, LLC, GOOD GUY VAPES (BAYONNE, NEW JERSEY), JOHN DOE 1-10, ABC CORPORATION 1-10, JUUL LABS, INC., PAX LABS, INC., MEDUSA DISTRIBUTION, LLC doing business as CARTISAN TECH, ELITE BROTHERS, LLC doing business as SALTBAE50.COM, THE MADEWELL COLLECTIVE doing business as MONSTER VAPE LABS, CREATIVE VAPE LABS, INC., GOOD GUY VAPES and ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Case Number: 2:2021cv16543
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Julien Xavier Neals
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that JLI's #6 Motion to Stay further proceedings pending final order on transfer to MDL 2913 is GRANTED; Percella's #16 Motion to Remand is administratively terminated without prejudice. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/29/2021. (ams, )
October 8, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #18 Reply to Response to Motion Notice of Withdrawal Amended (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(GERBINO, VINCENT)
October 6, 2021 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by BRYAN PERCELLA re #16 First MOTION to Remand Back to the Superior Court of New Jersey (GERBINO, VINCENT)
October 2, 2021 Filing 17 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #16 First MOTION to Remand Back to the Superior Court of New Jersey [New Motion Day November 15, 2021]. (HARRINGTON, ROGER)
September 28, 2021 Filing 16 First MOTION to Remand Back to the Superior Court of New Jersey by BRYAN PERCELLA. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Appendix, #3 Brief, #4 Declaration, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(GERBINO, VINCENT)
September 28, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #16 First MOTION to Remand Back to the Superior Court of New Jersey. Motion set for 11/1/2021 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, )
September 27, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by JUUL LABS, INC. re #6 MOTION to Stay Further Proceedings Pending Final Order on Transfer to MDL No. 2913 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Cert of Service, #2 Declaration Declaration)(HARRINGTON, ROGER)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Julien Xavier Neals for all further proceedings. Judge Susan D. Wigenton no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 09/21/21. (aw, )
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/20/21. (jc, ) (Main Document 13 replaced on 9/21/2021) (jc, ).
September 20, 2021 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Defendants by JUUL LABS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service Cert of Service)(HARRINGTON, ROGER)
September 20, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #6 MOTION to Stay Further Proceedings Pending Final Order on Transfer to MDL No. 2913 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Brief, #3 Certification, #4 Exhibit, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(GERBINO, VINCENT)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion; Defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise reply is extended to fourteen days after a ruling on (1) the Conditional Transfer to MDL No. 2913 or (2) fourteen days after a ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, if filed by Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/20/2021. (ams, )
September 17, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by 7 DAZE, LLC, CREATIVE VAPE LABS, INC., ELITE BROTHERS, LLC, GOOD GUY VAPES, GOOD GUY VAPES DISTRIBUTION, LLC, GOOD GUY VAPES FRANCHISING, LLC, MEDUSA DISTRIBUTION, LLC, THE MADEWELL COLLECTIVE, WESTMAN HOLDING COMPANY, LLC. (MEKLES, ERICA)
September 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by ERICA SINGER MEKLES on behalf of 7 DAZE, LLC, CREATIVE VAPE LABS, INC., ELITE BROTHERS, LLC, GOOD GUY VAPES, GOOD GUY VAPES DISTRIBUTION, LLC, GOOD GUY VAPES FRANCHISING, LLC, MEDUSA DISTRIBUTION, LLC, THE MADEWELL COLLECTIVE, WESTMAN HOLDING COMPANY, LLC (MEKLES, ERICA)
September 17, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by GOOD GUY VAPES FRANCHISING, LLC, THE MADEWELL COLLECTIVE, GOOD GUY VAPES, ELITE BROTHERS, LLC, WESTMAN HOLDING COMPANY, LLC, GOOD GUY VAPES DISTRIBUTION, LLC, CREATIVE VAPE LABS, INC., MEDUSA DISTRIBUTION, LLC, 7 DAZE, LLC has been DENIED as the Clerk only has the ability to extend the filing deadline of a responsive pleading for a period not to exceed fourteen (14) days, prior to the expiration of the original filing deadline. Please re-file this request before the Court for consideration. (ams, )
September 16, 2021 Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney ERICA SINGER MEKLES for 7 DAZE, LLC,ERICA SINGER MEKLES for CREATIVE VAPE LABS, INC.,ERICA SINGER MEKLES for ELITE BROTHERS, LLC,ERICA SINGER MEKLES for GOOD GUY VAPES,ERICA SINGER MEKLES for GOOD GUY VAPES DISTRIBUTION, LLC,ERICA SINGER MEKLES for GOOD GUY VAPES FRANCHISING, LLC,ERICA SINGER MEKLES for MEDUSA DISTRIBUTION, LLC,ERICA SINGER MEKLES for THE MADEWELL COLLECTIVE,ERICA SINGER MEKLES for WESTMAN HOLDING COMPANY, LLC added. (MEKLES, ERICA)
September 10, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Further Proceedings Pending Final Order on Transfer to MDL No. 2913 by JUUL LABS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Declaration McGinn Declaration, #4 Certificate of Service Cert of Service)(HARRINGTON, ROGER)
September 10, 2021 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Juul Labs, Inc... (HARRINGTON, ROGER)
September 10, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Stay Further Proceedings Pending Final Order on Transfer to MDL No. 2913. Motion set for 10/4/2021 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, )
September 10, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by JUUL LABS, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/24/2021. (ams, )
September 7, 2021 Filing 4 Clerk's Letter: Attorney is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorney's address. (ams, )
September 7, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information - Please add aliases for parties using the "Alias" selection by clicking on the plus arrow after adding a party, Other - Corrected County from Atlantic to Hudson . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ams, )
September 3, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, )
September 3, 2021 Filing 3 Certification on behalf of JUUL LABS INC. Re #1 Notice of Removal,. (HARRINGTON, ROGER)
September 3, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JUUL LABS INC.. (HARRINGTON, ROGER)
September 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JUUL LABS INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey (Hudson County, Law Division), case number L-003025-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12775512), filed by JUUL LABS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(HARRINGTON, ROGER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PERCELLA v. JUUL LABS INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYAN PERCELLA
Represented By: VINCENT FRANK GERBINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUUL LABS INC.
Represented By: ROGER J. HARRINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAX FOUNDATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALTRIA GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDUSA DISTRIBUTION, LLC D/B/A CARTISAN TECH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EONSMOKE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELITE BROTHERS, LLC D/B/A SALTBAE50.COM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE MADEWELL COLLECTIVE D/B/A MONSTER VAPE LABS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CREATIVE VAPES LABS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTMAN HOLDING COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: ERICA SINGER MEKLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7 DAZE, LLC
Represented By: ERICA SINGER MEKLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOOD GUY VAPES FRANCHISING, LLC
Represented By: ERICA SINGER MEKLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOOD GUY VAPES DISTRIBUTION, LLC
Represented By: ERICA SINGER MEKLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOOD GUY VAPES (BAYONNE, NEW JERSEY)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATION 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUUL LABS, INC.
Represented By: ROGER J. HARRINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAX LABS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDUSA DISTRIBUTION, LLC doing business as CARTISAN TECH
Represented By: ERICA SINGER MEKLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELITE BROTHERS, LLC doing business as SALTBAE50.COM
Represented By: ERICA SINGER MEKLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE MADEWELL COLLECTIVE doing business as MONSTER VAPE LABS
Represented By: ERICA SINGER MEKLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CREATIVE VAPE LABS, INC.
Represented By: ERICA SINGER MEKLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOOD GUY VAPES
Represented By: ERICA SINGER MEKLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?