TANG et al v. CITIC CAPITAL HOLDINGS LTD. et al
Plaintiff: JOHN YONG TANG and FARIS AL KOOHEJI
Defendant: CITIC CAPITAL HOLDINGS LTD., HARBIN PHARMACEUTICAL GROUP HOLDING CO., LTD., HARBIN PHARMACEUTICAL GROUP CO., LTD., KENNETH A. MARTINDALE, TRICIA K. TOLIVAR, HSING CHOW, RACHEL LAU, MICHELE S. MEYER, ALAN WAN, YONG KAI WONG, ALAN D. FELDMAN, MICHAEL F. HINES, AMY B. LANE, PHILIP E. MALLOTT, ROBERT F. MORAN, EVERCORE INC., GREGORY BERUBE, ABC COMPANY, JOHN DOE, YICHEN ZHANG and ZT BIOPHARMACEUTICAL LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv17008
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Andre M Espinosa
Referring Judge: Julien Xavier Neals
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Pro Hac Vice counsel, DANIEL S. SCHECTER and MICHAEL J. REISS, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jc, )
November 9, 2021 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ALAN D. FELDMAN, MICHAEL F. HINES, AMY B. LANE, PHILIP E. MALLOTT, KENNETH A. MARTINDALE, MICHELE S. MEYER, ROBERT F. MORAN, TRICIA K. TOLIVAR re #21 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (MCDONOUGH, KEVIN)
November 9, 2021 Filing 26 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Michael J. Reiss to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12966207.) (MCDONOUGH, KEVIN)
November 9, 2021 Filing 25 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Daniel S. Schecter to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12966157.) (MCDONOUGH, KEVIN)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SUPPLEMENTAL STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER TO EXTEND TIME; that the date by which the GNC Management/Director Defendants and the Evercore Defendants may answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint is extended to December 13, 2021, etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 11/5/2021. (ld, )
November 5, 2021 Filing 23 STIPULATION /Supplemental Stipulation and Proposed Consent Order to Extend Time by ALAN D. FELDMAN, MICHAEL F. HINES, AMY B. LANE, PHILIP E. MALLOTT, KENNETH A. MARTINDALE, MICHELE S. MEYER, ROBERT F. MORAN, TRICIA K. TOLIVAR. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MCDONOUGH, KEVIN)
November 5, 2021 Answer Due Deadline Update - The answer due date has been set for 12/13/2021 as to TRICIA K. TOLIVAR, ROBERT F. MORAN, EVERCORE INC., ALAN D. FELDMAN, PHILIP E. MALLOTT, KENNETH A. MARTINDALE, MICHAEL F. HINES, AMY B. LANE, MICHELE S. MEYER, GREGORY BERUBE. (dam)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF NICOLE H. SPRINZEN, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 11/3/2021. (ld, )
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to DANIEL S. SCHECTER, ESQ. and MICHAEL J. REISS, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 11/3/2021. (ld, )
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER TO EXTEND TIME; That the date by which Defendants may answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint is extended to and including December 13, 2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 10/28/2021. (ld, )
October 27, 2021 Filing 19 STIPULATION and CONSENT ORDER TO EXTEND TIME by HSING CHOW, YICHEN ZHANG. (LEARY, PAUL)
October 27, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL K. LEARY, JR on behalf of HSING CHOW, YICHEN ZHANG (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LEARY, PAUL)
October 25, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion set for 11/15/2021 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, )
October 21, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by GREGORY BERUBE, EVERCORE INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric S. Hochstadt in support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Declaration of John A. Neuwirth in support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Declaration of Stefania D. Venezia in support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #4 Declaration of Andrew Cauchi in support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(HOCHSTADT, ERIC)
October 21, 2021 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EVERCORE INC.. (HOCHSTADT, ERIC)
October 21, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC SHAUN HOCHSTADT on behalf of GREGORY BERUBE, EVERCORE INC. (HOCHSTADT, ERIC)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER TO EXTEND TIME; that the date by which ZT may answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint is extended to and including December 13, 2021.etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 10/19/2021. (ld, )
October 18, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nicole H. Sprinzen by ZT BIOPHARMACEUTICAL LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Paul K. Leary, Jr., #2 Certification of Nicole H. Sprinzen, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(LEARY, PAUL)
October 18, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL K. LEARY, JR on behalf of ZT BIOPHARMACEUTICAL LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LEARY, PAUL)
October 18, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION and CONSENT ORDER TO EXTEND TIME by All Plaintiffs. (CAI, WENJIE)
October 13, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FARIS AL KOOHEJI, JOHN YONG TANG. GREGORY BERUBE served on 9/28/2021, answer due 10/19/2021; HSING CHOW served on 10/11/2021, answer due 11/1/2021; PHILIP E. MALLOTT served on 9/22/2021, answer due 10/13/2021; MICHELE S. MEYER served on 10/2/2021, answer due 10/25/2021; YICHEN ZHANG served on 10/7/2021, answer due 10/28/2021; ZT BIOPHARMACEUTICAL LLC served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021. (CAI, WENJIE)
October 13, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion set for 11/1/2021 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, )
October 12, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by WENJIE CAI on behalf of All Plaintiffs (CAI, WENJIE)
October 8, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ALAN D. FELDMAN, MICHAEL F. HINES, AMY B. LANE, PHILIP E. MALLOTT, KENNETH A. MARTINDALE, MICHELE S. MEYER, ROBERT F. MORAN, TRICIA K. TOLIVAR. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Kevin M. McDonough in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certification of Daniel Scott Schecter in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Certification of Michael J. Reiss in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(MCDONOUGH, KEVIN)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER TO EXTEND TIME; The date by which the GNC Management/Director Defendants and the Evercore Defendants may answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint is extended to and including November 19, 2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 10/8/2021. (ld, )
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION and Proposed Consent Order to Extend Time by ALAN D. FELDMAN, MICHAEL F. HINES, AMY B. LANE, PHILIP E. MALLOTT, KENNETH A. MARTINDALE, MICHELE S. MEYER, ROBERT F. MORAN, TRICIA K. TOLIVAR. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MCDONOUGH, KEVIN)
October 7, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN M. MCDONOUGH on behalf of ALAN D. FELDMAN, MICHAEL F. HINES, AMY B. LANE, PHILIP E. MALLOTT, KENNETH A. MARTINDALE, MICHELE S. MEYER, ROBERT F. MORAN, TRICIA K. TOLIVAR (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MCDONOUGH, KEVIN)
September 20, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by FARIS AL KOOHEJI, JOHN YONG TANG.(TANG, JOHN)
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to GREGORY BERUBE, HSING CHOW, CITIC CAPITAL HOLDINGS LTD., EVERCORE INC., ALAN D. FELDMAN, HARBIN PHARMACEUTICAL GROUP CO., LTD., HARBIN PHARMACEUTICAL GROUP HOLDING CO., LTD., MICHAEL F. HINES, AMY B. LANE, RACHEL LAU, PHILIP E. MALLOTT, KENNETH A. MARTINDALE, MICHELE S. MEYER, ROBERT F. MORAN, TRICIA K. TOLIVAR, ALAN WAN, YONG KAI WONG. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
September 16, 2021 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by All Plaintiffs. (TANG, JOHN)
September 16, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a #Civil Cover Sheet using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ps)
September 16, 2021 Judge Julien Xavier Neals and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa added. (ps)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12804349) with JURY DEMAND, filed by FARIS AL KOOHEJI, JOHN YONG TANG.(TANG, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TANG et al v. CITIC CAPITAL HOLDINGS LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN YONG TANG
Represented By: JOHN YONG TANG
Represented By: WENJIE CAI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FARIS AL KOOHEJI
Represented By: JOHN YONG TANG
Represented By: WENJIE CAI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITIC CAPITAL HOLDINGS LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARBIN PHARMACEUTICAL GROUP HOLDING CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARBIN PHARMACEUTICAL GROUP CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH A. MARTINDALE
Represented By: KEVIN M. MCDONOUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRICIA K. TOLIVAR
Represented By: KEVIN M. MCDONOUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSING CHOW
Represented By: PAUL K. LEARY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RACHEL LAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELE S. MEYER
Represented By: KEVIN M. MCDONOUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALAN WAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YONG KAI WONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALAN D. FELDMAN
Represented By: KEVIN M. MCDONOUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL F. HINES
Represented By: KEVIN M. MCDONOUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMY B. LANE
Represented By: KEVIN M. MCDONOUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIP E. MALLOTT
Represented By: KEVIN M. MCDONOUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT F. MORAN
Represented By: KEVIN M. MCDONOUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVERCORE INC.
Represented By: ERIC SHAUN HOCHSTADT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY BERUBE
Represented By: ERIC SHAUN HOCHSTADT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YICHEN ZHANG
Represented By: PAUL K. LEARY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZT BIOPHARMACEUTICAL LLC
Represented By: PAUL K. LEARY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?