MCGILLVARY v. GALFY et al
Plaintiff: CALEB L. MCGILLVARY
Defendant: JAMES GALFY, THE ESTATE OF JOSEPH GALFY, III, SCOTT M. PETERSON, THEODORE ROMANKOW, THE UNION COUNTY, NEW JERSEY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE, PETER A. LIGUORI, JOHN G. CITO, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE, ABC, LLC, XYZ, INC. and ROBERT PANDINA
Case Number: 2:2021cv17121
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #8 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by THEODORE ROMANKOW, SCOTT M. PETERSON has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/26/2021. (bt, )
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The documents #6 and #7 submitted by JAMES GALFY, THE ESTATE OF JOSEPH GALFY, III has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/26/2021. (sm)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney JORDYNN JACKSON for SCOTT M. PETERSON,JORDYNN JACKSON for THEODORE ROMANKOW,JORDYNN JACKSON for THE UNION COUNTY, NEW JERSEY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE added. (JACKSON, JORDYNN)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Dec 1 2021.. (SCHWARTZ, BARBARA)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Dec 1 2021.. (SCHWARTZ, BARBARA)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by JOHN G. CITO has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/25/2021. (bt, )
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by PETER A. LIGUORI has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/1/2021. (bt, )
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THEODORE ROMANKOW, JAMES GALFY, THE UNION COUNTY, NEW JERSEY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE, JOHN G. CITO, PETER A. LIGUORI, THE ESTATE OF JOSEPH GALFY, III, SCOTT M. PETERSON. (sm)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Peter Liguori. Attorney BRETT JOSEPH HAROLDSON for PETER A. LIGUORI added. (HAROLDSON, BRETT)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to John Cito. Attorney BRETT JOSEPH HAROLDSON for JOHN G. CITO added. (HAROLDSON, BRETT)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHN G. CITO, JAMES GALFY, PETER A. LIGUORI, ROBERT PANDINA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number CAM13229 (dd, )
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint Received. Filing Fee or IFP not included. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Envelope)(pnm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCGILLVARY v. GALFY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALEB L. MCGILLVARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES GALFY
Represented By: BARBARA S. SCHWARTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE ESTATE OF JOSEPH GALFY, III
Represented By: BARBARA S. SCHWARTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT M. PETERSON
Represented By: JORDYNN JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THEODORE ROMANKOW
Represented By: JORDYNN JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE UNION COUNTY, NEW JERSEY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE
Represented By: JORDYNN JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER A. LIGUORI
Represented By: BRETT JOSEPH HAROLDSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN G. CITO
Represented By: BRETT JOSEPH HAROLDSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT PANDINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?