GOLDEN STATE MEDICAL SUPPLY, INC. v. AUSTARPHARMA LLC et al
Plaintiff: GOLDEN STATE MEDICAL SUPPLY, INC.
Defendant: AUSTARPHARMA LLC, AUSTARPHARMA RESEARCH, LLC, AUSTARPHARMA LABORATORIES, LLC, AUSTAR INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, RONG LIU, BOSTAL DRUG DELIVERY CO., LTD., GUANGZHOU BRISTOL DRUG DELIVERY CO., LTD. and LSQ FUNDING GROUP L.C.
Case Number: 2:2021cv17137
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jessica S Allen
Referring Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to DAVID N. SAPONARA etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 11/16/2021. (bt, )
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to JOSEPH DE SANTIS etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 11/16/2021. (bt, ) Modified on 11/16/2021 (bt, ).
November 16, 2021 Filing 31 Letter from Richard C. Weinblatt re Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,,. (WEINBLATT, RICHARD)
November 15, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD CHARLES WEINBLATT on behalf of GOLDEN STATE MEDICAL SUPPLY, INC. (WEINBLATT, RICHARD)
November 15, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David Saponara, #27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joseph De Santis, #29 MOTION to Dismiss Golden State Medical Supply, Inc.'s Complaint (Except Count I Against AustarPharma LLC). Motion set for 12/6/2021 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, )
November 12, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss Golden State Medical Supply, Inc.'s Complaint (Except Count I Against AustarPharma LLC) by AUSTARPHARMA LABORATORIES, LLC, AUSTARPHARMA LLC, AUSTARPHARMA RESEARCH, LLC, RONG LIU. Responses due by 11/22/2021 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul H. Aloe in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - Product Supply Agreement (February 19, 2014), #3 Exhibit B - Credit Agreement (March 6, 2020), #4 Exhibit C - Credit Memo (March 6, 2020), #5 Exhibit D - Credit Opportunity Schedule (March 6, 2020), #6 Exhibit E - Product Supply Agreement (May 5, 2020), #7 Exhibit F - Unpaid Invoices, #8 Exhibit G - AustarPharma Research NJ SOS Search, #9 Exhibit H - AustarPharma Laboratories NJ SOS Search, #10 Exhibit I - Letter to Golden State's Counsel re Service, #11 Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #12 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(ALOE, PAUL)
November 12, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David Saponara by AUSTARPHARMA LABORATORIES, LLC, AUSTARPHARMA LLC, AUSTARPHARMA RESEARCH, LLC, RONG LIU. (Attachments: #1 Certification of David Saponara in Support of Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Certification of Paul Aloe in Support of Pro Hac Vice Application, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting David Saponara Pro Hac Vice Application)(ALOE, PAUL)
November 12, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joseph De Santis by AUSTARPHARMA LABORATORIES, LLC, AUSTARPHARMA LLC, AUSTARPHARMA RESEARCH, LLC, RONG LIU. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Joseph De Santis in Support of Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Certification of Paul Aloe in Support of Pro Hac Vice Application, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joseph De Santis Pro Hac Vice Application)(ALOE, PAUL)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE as to LSQ Funding Group L.C.. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 11/8/2021. (ld, )
November 5, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to LSQ Funding Group L.C. by GOLDEN STATE MEDICAL SUPPLY, INC. (STAMOULIS, STAMATIOS)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting request for an extension of the time for the AP Defendants to respond to the complaint to November 12, 2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 11/5/2021. (ld, )
November 5, 2021 Pro Hac Vice counsel, SHASHANK UPADHYE, ESQ. and YIXIN TANG, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
November 4, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE by GOLDEN STATE MEDICAL SUPPLY, INC. REQUEST BY LOCAL COUNSEL FOR PRO HAC VICE ATTORNEY TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC NOTIFICATION (STAMOULIS, STAMATIOS)
November 4, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE by GOLDEN STATE MEDICAL SUPPLY, INC. REQUEST BY LOCAL COUNSEL FOR PRO HAC VICE ATTORNEY TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC NOTIFICATION (STAMOULIS, STAMATIOS)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Yixin Tang, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 11/4/2021. (ld, )
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Shashank Upadhye, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 11/4/2021. (ld, )
November 4, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Yixin Tang, #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Shashank Upadhye. Motion set for 12/6/2021 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
November 3, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Yixin Tang by GOLDEN STATE MEDICAL SUPPLY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(STAMOULIS, STAMATIOS)
November 3, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Shashank Upadhye by GOLDEN STATE MEDICAL SUPPLY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(STAMOULIS, STAMATIOS)
November 3, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by AUSTARPHARMA LABORATORIES, LLC, AUSTARPHARMA LLC, AUSTARPHARMA RESEARCH, LLC, RONG LIU. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NJ Corporate Records, #2 Exhibit GSMS Letter to Judge Wolfson (10-1-2021).pdf, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ALOE, PAUL)
November 2, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE re #14 Order,. (STAMOULIS, STAMATIOS)
November 2, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by ALAN FREDERICK KAUFMAN on behalf of LSQ FUNDING GROUP L.C. (KAUFMAN, ALAN)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RICO CASE ORDER 18 U.S.C. 1961-1968; The plaintiff shall file, within 30 days hereof, a RICO Case Statement that complies with Local Civil Rule 16.1(b)(4) and Appendix O;etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 10/27/2021. (ld, ) Modified on 10/28/2021 (ld).
October 26, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GOLDEN STATE MEDICAL SUPPLY, INC.. AUSTARPHARMA LABORATORIES, LLC served on 9/24/2021, answer due 10/15/2021. (STAMOULIS, STAMATIOS)
October 26, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GOLDEN STATE MEDICAL SUPPLY, INC.. AUSTARPHARMA LLC served on 9/24/2021, answer due 10/15/2021. (STAMOULIS, STAMATIOS)
October 26, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GOLDEN STATE MEDICAL SUPPLY, INC.. AUSTARPHARMA RESEARCH, LLC served on 9/24/2021, answer due 10/15/2021. (STAMOULIS, STAMATIOS)
October 26, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GOLDEN STATE MEDICAL SUPPLY, INC.. LSQ FUNDING GROUP L.C. served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (STAMOULIS, STAMATIOS)
October 26, 2021 Filing 9 Letter from Paul H. Aloe to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo re: Plaintiff's Filing at Docket No. 8 re #8 Proposed Pretrial Order. (ALOE, PAUL)
October 22, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Order Optional Rico Case Order 18 U.S.C. 1961-1968 by GOLDEN STATE MEDICAL SUPPLY, INC.. (STAMOULIS, STAMATIOS)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen for all further proceedings. Judge Michael A. Shipp, Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 10/5/21. (ak, )
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting the AP Defendants' #5 Motion to Transfer Case, and directing the Clerk to reassign the Case to a District Judge of the Newark Vicinage. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 10/4/2021. (jmh)
September 30, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Transfer Case to Newark Vicinage by AUSTARPHARMA LABORATORIES, LLC, AUSTARPHARMA LLC, AUSTARPHARMA RESEARCH, LLC, RONG LIU. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul H. Aloe in Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ALOE, PAUL)
September 30, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Transfer Case to Newark Vicinage . Motion set for 11/1/2021 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
September 20, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AUSTAR INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, AUSTARPHARMA LABORATORIES, LLC, AUSTARPHARMA LLC, AUSTARPHARMA RESEARCH, LLC, BOSTAL DRUG DELIVERY CO., LTD., GUANGZHOU BRISTOL DRUG DELIVERY CO., LTD., RONG LIU, LSQ FUNDING GROUP L.C.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal, )
September 20, 2021 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jal, )
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Summons to be Issued by GOLDEN STATE MEDICAL SUPPLY, INC. as to AUSTAR INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, AUSTARPHARMA LABORATORIES, LLC, AUSTARPHARMA LLC, AUSTARPHARMA RESEARCH, LLC, BOSTAL DRUG DELIVERY CO., LTD., GUANGZHOU BRISTOL DRUG DELIVERY CO., LTD., RONG LIU, LSQ FUNDING GROUP L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(STAMOULIS, STAMATIOS)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GOLDEN STATE MEDICAL SUPPLY, INC. identifying GSMS, INC. as Corporate Parent.. (STAMOULIS, STAMATIOS)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AUSTAR INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, AUSTARPHARMA LABORATORIES, LLC, AUSTARPHARMA LLC, AUSTARPHARMA RESEARCH, LLC, BOSTAL DRUG DELIVERY CO., LTD., GUANGZHOU BRISTOL DRUG DELIVERY CO., LTD., RONG LIU, LSQ FUNDING GROUP L.C. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12812028) with JURY DEMAND, filed by GOLDEN STATE MEDICAL SUPPLY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(STAMOULIS, STAMATIOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GOLDEN STATE MEDICAL SUPPLY, INC. v. AUSTARPHARMA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOLDEN STATE MEDICAL SUPPLY, INC.
Represented By: RICHARD CHARLES WEINBLATT
Represented By: STAMATIOS STAMOULIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUSTARPHARMA LLC
Represented By: PAUL ALOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUSTARPHARMA RESEARCH, LLC
Represented By: PAUL ALOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUSTARPHARMA LABORATORIES, LLC
Represented By: PAUL ALOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUSTAR INTERNATIONAL LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONG LIU
Represented By: PAUL ALOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOSTAL DRUG DELIVERY CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUANGZHOU BRISTOL DRUG DELIVERY CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSQ FUNDING GROUP L.C.
Represented By: ALAN FREDERICK KAUFMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?