COACHELLA MUSIC FESTIVAL, LLC et al v. CASEY et al
Plaintiff: COACHELLA MUSIC FESTIVAL, LLC and GOLDENVOICE, LLC
Defendant: RAASHAUN CASEY, DJ ENVY, LLC, DJ ENVY AUTO, LLC and DOES 1-20
Case Number: 2:2021cv17624
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: James B Clark
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #6 Application for a Temporary Restraining Order and Entry of a Preliminary Injunction. etc. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 10/1/2021. (ams, )
September 30, 2021 Filing 7 Letter from Rodman E. Honecker re #6 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation re: Entry of TRO)(HONECKER, RODMAN)
September 30, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #6 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order. Motion set for 11/1/2021 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
September 28, 2021 Filing 6 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order by COACHELLA MUSIC FESTIVAL, LLC, GOLDENVOICE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven E. Lauridsen, #2 Declaration of Jason Bernstein, #3 Exhibit 1 - Billboard Story, #4 Exhibit 2 - First Coachella Attendance, #5 Exhibit 3 - News Stores About Coachella, #6 Exhibit 4 - Lineup Poster Through 2019, #7 Exhibit 5 - Article re 360 Dome, #8 Exhibit 6 - Coachella Sells Out, #9 Exhibit 7 - Art Exhibitions at Coachella, #10 Exhibit 8 - Car Exhibits at Coachella, #11 Exhibit 9 - Screen Captures of Coachella website, #12 Exhibit 10 - Screen Captures of Coachella app, #13 Exhibit 11 - Coachella social media sites, #14 Exhibit 12 - First page of google results, #15 Exhibit 13 - Registration of Coachella Marks, #16 Exhibit 14 - Defendants social media and Eventbrite page, #17 Exhibit 15 - 7days7nights event page, #18 Exhibit 16 - Stylized use of Carchella, #19 Exhibit 17 - Music at Carchella Events, #20 Exhibit 18 - Cease and Desist Letter, #21 Exhibit 19 - Carchella Ticket Pricing, #22 Exhibit 20 - Twitter Screenshot of DJ Envy Page, #23 Exhibit 21 - Transcript of FB Video of DJ Envy, #24 Brief Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Emergency Application for a Temporary Restraining Order)(HONECKER, RODMAN)
September 28, 2021 Filing 5 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit To complaint) (JB, )
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to RAASHAUN CASEY, DJ ENVY AUTO, LLC, DJ ENVY, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (JB, )
September 27, 2021 Filing 3 Exhibit to #1 Complaint,,, Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark by All Plaintiffs. (HONECKER, RODMAN)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by COACHELLA MUSIC FESTIVAL, LLC, GOLDENVOICE, LLC identifying CVM&AF, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (HONECKER, RODMAN)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12837898) with JURY DEMAND, filed by COACHELLA MUSIC FESTIVAL, LLC, GOLDENVOICE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 News stores, #2 Exhibit Exh 2 Coachells sells out, #3 Exhibit Exh 3 Photographs of Coachella Car exhibitions, #4 Exhibit Exh 4 Screen capture of www.coahcella, #5 Exhibit Exh 5 Screen captures of Coachella App, #6 Exhibit Exh 6 Screen captures of Coachella social media websites, #7 Exhibit Exh 7 Registration of Coachella marks, #8 Exhibit Exh 8 7days7nights event page, #9 Exhibit Exh 9 Defs' social media and Eventbrite page promoting Carchella, #10 Exhibit Exh 10 creen Capture of Carchella (Stylized use of Coachella), #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(HONECKER, RODMAN)
September 27, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COACHELLA MUSIC FESTIVAL, LLC et al v. CASEY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COACHELLA MUSIC FESTIVAL, LLC
Represented By: RODMAN E. HONECKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOLDENVOICE, LLC
Represented By: RODMAN E. HONECKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAASHAUN CASEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DJ ENVY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DJ ENVY AUTO, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?