HERNANDEZ v. AMAZON.COM, INC
Plaintiff: JESSICA HERNANDEZ
Defendant: AMAZON .COM, INC
Case Number: 2:2021cv17876
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Katharine S Hayden
Referring Judge: Edward S Kiel
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by AMAZON.COM, INC.(SCHWARTZ, ANDREW)
October 20, 2021 Filing 10 Certification on behalf of JESSICA HERNANDEZ. (BRASLOW, DEREK)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER of Voluntary Dismissal of Count III: Negligence and dismissal of Count IV: Breach of Warranty from the Plaintiffs' Complaint, re #8 Stipulation. etc. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 10/14/2021. (qa, )
October 13, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION Dismissal of Counts III and IV by JESSICA HERNANDEZ. (BRASLOW, DEREK)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on December 22, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and the access code is 310-0383#. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Discovery Plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan can be found # here. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 10/12/2021. (sms)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez for all further proceedings. Judge Katharine S. Hayden no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 10/4/21. (ak, )
October 3, 2021 Filing 5 Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by AMAZON.COM, INC. (SCHWARTZ, ANDREW)
October 3, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMAZON.COM, INC. (SCHWARTZ, ANDREW)
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by BETH S. ROSE on behalf of AMAZON.COM, INC (ROSE, BETH)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Amazon.com, Inc... (SCHWARTZ, ANDREW)
October 1, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #2 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by AMAZON.COM, INC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/21/2021. (qa, )
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMAZON.COM, INC from Superior Court of Sussex County, case number SSX L 402 21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12852622), filed by AMAZON.COM, INC.(SCHWARTZ, ANDREW)
September 30, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Katharine S. Hayden and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (jr)
September 30, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HERNANDEZ v. AMAZON.COM, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSICA HERNANDEZ
Represented By: DEREK T. BRASLOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON .COM, INC
Represented By: ANDREW W. SCHWARTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?