EPOSEIDON OUTDOOR ADVENTURE, INC. v. MIGHTY VENTURES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: EPOSEIDON OUTDOOR ADVENTURE, INC.
Defendant: MIGHTY VENTURES, INC., MIGHTY MUG INCORPORATED and Israel Harry Zimmerman
Case Number: 2:2021cv17954
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Stanley R Chesler
Referring Judge: James B Clark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL without Prejudice. etc. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 10/29/2021. (ams, )
October 28, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to all defendants without prejudice by EPOSEIDON OUTDOOR ADVENTURE, INC. (TSUI-YIP, GLORIA)
October 27, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #18 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion set for 12/6/2021 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
October 26, 2021 Filing 19 BRIEF in Support filed by EPOSEIDON OUTDOOR ADVENTURE, INC. re #18 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 9, #8 Exhibit 10, #9 Exhibit 11, #10 Exhibit 12, #11 Exhibit 13, #12 Exhibit 14, #13 Exhibit 15, #14 Exhibit 16, #15 Exhibit 17, #16 Exhibit 18, #17 Exhibit 19, #18 Exhibit 20, #19 Exhibit 21, #20 Exhibit 22, #21 Exhibit 23, #22 Exhibit 24)(TSUI-YIP, GLORIA)
October 26, 2021 Filing 18 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by EPOSEIDON OUTDOOR ADVENTURE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(TSUI-YIP, GLORIA)
October 25, 2021 Filing 17 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Charles J Meyer to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (TSUI-YIP, GLORIA)
October 25, 2021 Filing 16 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Blake R Hartz to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (TSUI-YIP, GLORIA)
October 25, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by EPOSEIDON OUTDOOR ADVENTURE, INC.. ISRAEL HARRY ZIMMERMAN waiver sent on 10/12/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (TSUI-YIP, GLORIA)
October 25, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by EPOSEIDON OUTDOOR ADVENTURE, INC.. MIGHTY VENTURES, INC. waiver sent on 10/12/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (TSUI-YIP, GLORIA)
October 25, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by EPOSEIDON OUTDOOR ADVENTURE, INC.. MIGHTY MUG INCORPORATED waiver sent on 10/12/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (TSUI-YIP, GLORIA)
October 25, 2021 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW045564 as to Charles J. Meyer. (lag, )
October 25, 2021 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW045563 as to Blake R. Hartz. (lag, )
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Charles J. Meyer, Esq. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/19/2021. (ams, )
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Blake R. Hartz, Esq. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/19/2021. (ams, )
October 18, 2021 Filing 10 AO120 Patent Form filed. (dam, )
October 18, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles J. Meyer, #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Blake R. Hartz. Motions set for 11/15/2021 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, these motions will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
October 15, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles J. Meyer by EPOSEIDON OUTDOOR ADVENTURE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Proposed Order)(TSUI-YIP, GLORIA)
October 15, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Blake R. Hartz by EPOSEIDON OUTDOOR ADVENTURE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Proposed Order)(TSUI-YIP, GLORIA)
October 4, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MIGHTY MUG INCORPORATED, MIGHTY VENTURES, INC., ISRAEL HARRY ZIMMERMAN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (JB, )
October 4, 2021 Magistrate Judge James B. Clark added. (jr)
October 1, 2021 Filing 6 Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by EPOSEIDON OUTDOOR ADVENTURE, INC.. (TSUI-YIP, GLORIA)
October 1, 2021 Filing 5 Request for Summons to be Issued by EPOSEIDON OUTDOOR ADVENTURE, INC. as to Israel Harry Zimmerman. (TSUI-YIP, GLORIA)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Summons to be Issued by EPOSEIDON OUTDOOR ADVENTURE, INC. as to MIGHTY VENTURES, INC.. (TSUI-YIP, GLORIA)
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Summons to be Issued by EPOSEIDON OUTDOOR ADVENTURE, INC. as to MIGHTY MUG INCORPORATED. (TSUI-YIP, GLORIA)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 STATEMENT Civil Cover Sheet by EPOSEIDON OUTDOOR ADVENTURE, INC.. (TSUI-YIP, GLORIA)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MIGHTY MUG INCORPORATED, MIGHTY VENTURES, INC., Israel Harry Zimmerman ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12857309) with JURY DEMAND, filed by EPOSEIDON OUTDOOR ADVENTURE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(TSUI-YIP, GLORIA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EPOSEIDON OUTDOOR ADVENTURE, INC. v. MIGHTY VENTURES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EPOSEIDON OUTDOOR ADVENTURE, INC.
Represented By: GLORIA TSUI-YIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIGHTY VENTURES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIGHTY MUG INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Israel Harry Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?