STATE OF NEW JERSEY EX REL. KEN ELDER v. JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEW JERSEY EX REL. KEN ELDER
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2021cv19462
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Julien Xavier Neals
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2021 Reset Deadlines as to #19 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 2/7/2022 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND BRIEFING AND HEARAING DATES ON PLAINTIFF-RELATOR'S MOTION TO REMAND with a new return date of 2/7/2022; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/7/2021. (sm)
December 6, 2021 Filing 21 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Briefing and Hearing Dates on Plaintiff-Relator's Motion to Remand by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (RADOMSKI, SEAN)
December 2, 2021 Pro Hac Vice counsel, STEVEN L. BLOCH, DAVID S. GOLUB and MICHAEL S. DEVORKIN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (qa, )
December 2, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #19 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 1/3/2022 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, )
December 1, 2021 Filing 20 Proposed Order by STATE OF NEW JERSEY EX REL. KEN ELDER re #19 MOTION to Remand . (VEIT, JACQUELINE)
November 30, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand by STATE OF NEW JERSEY EX REL. KEN ELDER. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Declaration of David S. Golub, #3 Brief)(VEIT, JACQUELINE)
November 9, 2021 Filing 18 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Steven L. Bloch to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12969071.) (VEIT, JACQUELINE)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steven L. Bloch; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/8/2021. (sm)
November 8, 2021 Filing 16 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice David S. Golub to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12961054.) (VEIT, JACQUELINE)
November 8, 2021 Filing 15 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Michael S. Devorkin to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12960999.) (VEIT, JACQUELINE)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David S. Golub; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/5/2021. (sm)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael S. Devorkin; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/5/2021. (sm)
November 5, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steven L Bloch by STATE OF NEW JERSEY EX REL. KEN ELDER. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jacqueline G. Veit, #2 Certification of Steven L. Bloch, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(VEIT, JACQUELINE)
November 4, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David S. Golub by STATE OF NEW JERSEY EX REL. KEN ELDER. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jacqueline G. Veit, #2 Certification of David S. Golub, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(VEIT, JACQUELINE)
November 4, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael S. Devorkin by STATE OF NEW JERSEY EX REL. KEN ELDER. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jacqueline G. Veit, #2 Certification of Michael S. Devorkin, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(VEIT, JACQUELINE)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer M. Wollenberg; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/4/2021. (sm)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Douglas W. Baruch; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/4/2021. (sm)
November 3, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer M. Wollenberg by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Sean J. Radomski in support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Jennifer M. Wollenberg, #2 Certification of Jennifer M. Wollenberg in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(RADOMSKI, SEAN)
November 3, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Douglas W. Baruch by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Sean J. Randomski in support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Douglas W. Baruch, #2 Certification of Douglas W. Baruch in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(RADOMSKI, SEAN)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT that Defendant's time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 30 days after this Court denies the remand motion or 30 days after the case is reopened in state court; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/2/2021. (sm)
November 2, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (RADOMSKI, SEAN)
November 2, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JACQUELINE GAIL VEIT on behalf of STATE OF NEW JERSEY EX REL. KEN ELDER (VEIT, JACQUELINE)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co. as Corporate Parent.. (RADOMSKI, SEAN)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Essex County, case number ESX-L-006510-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number BNJDC-12939454), filed by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Third Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Docket, #3 Exhibit C - Notice Declining Intervention and Order re: Sealing, #4 Exhibit D - NDIL August 30 Transcript, #5 Exhibit E - CA Motion for Summary Adjudication, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(RADOMSKI, SEAN)
October 29, 2021 Judge Julien Xavier Neals and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STATE OF NEW JERSEY EX REL. KEN ELDER v. JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEW JERSEY EX REL. KEN ELDER
Represented By: JACQUELINE GAIL VEIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By: SEAN JOSEPH RADOMSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?