FEDWAY ASSOCIATES, INC. v. WINE, LIQUOR & DISTILLERY WORKERS UNION LOCAL 1-D, UFCW
Petitioner: FEDWAY ASSOCIATES, INC.
Respondent: Wine, Liquor & Distillery Workers Union Local 1-D, UFCW
Case Number: 2:2021cv19604
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: Any Motion filed under Federal rule of civil procedure 11 shall comply with all requirements set forth therein re #43 Letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 12/27/2021. (bt, )
December 23, 2021 Filing 43 Letter from John D. Horowitz, Esq.. (HOROWITZ, JOHN)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 LETTER ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 12/21/2021. (jd,)
December 21, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Telephone Conference held on 12/21/2021. (seb)
December 20, 2021 Filing 41 Exhibit to #40 Letter to Judge Susan Wigenton by WINE, LIQUOR & DISTILLERY WORKERS UNION LOCAL 1-D, UFCW. (BORG, ANDREW)
December 20, 2021 Filing 40 Letter from Andrew Borg, Esq.. (BORG, ANDREW)
December 18, 2021 Filing 39 Letter from John D. Horowitz, Esq.. (HOROWITZ, JOHN)
December 13, 2021 Filing 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WINE, LIQUOR & DISTILLERY WORKERS UNION LOCAL 1-D, UFCW. (BORG, ANDREW)
December 13, 2021 Filing 37 AMENDED ANSWER to PETITION TO STAY ARBITRATION AND COUNTERCLAIM #7 Complaint by WINE, LIQUOR & DISTILLERY WORKERS UNION LOCAL 1-D, UFCW. (BORG, ANDREW)
December 13, 2021 Pro Hac Vice counsel, J. WARREN MANGAN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (dam, )
December 8, 2021 Filing 36 VERIFIED ANSWER to Complaint /PETITION TO STAY ARBITRATION by WINE, LIQUOR & DISTILLERY WORKERS UNION LOCAL 1-D, UFCW.(BORG, ANDREW)
December 7, 2021 Filing 35 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice J. Warren Mangan to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13027102.) (BORG, ANDREW)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to J. Warren Mangan, Esq. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 12/6/2021. (ams, )
December 3, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice J Warren Mangan by WINE, LIQUOR & DISTILLERY WORKERS UNION LOCAL 1-D, UFCW. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(BORG, ANDREW)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 LETTER ORDER scheduling Telephone Conference for 12/21/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 11/30/2021. (jd,)
November 30, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Telephone Conference held on 11/30/2021. (seb)
November 30, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW DOUGLAS BORG on behalf of WINE, LIQUOR & DISTILLERY WORKERS UNION LOCAL 1-D, UFCW (BORG, ANDREW)
November 29, 2021 Filing 30 Letter from John D. Horowitz, Esq.. (HOROWITZ, JOHN)
November 23, 2021 Filing 29 RESPONSE. (BORG, ANDREW)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re #27 Letter; Telephone Conference set for 11/30/2021 at 3:30 PM before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 11/19/2021. (ams, )
November 17, 2021 Filing 27 Letter. (HOROWITZ, JOHN)
November 9, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN D. HOROWITZ on behalf of FEDWAY ASSOCIATES, INC. (HOROWITZ, JOHN)
November 3, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (ak, )
November 3, 2021 Filing 25 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-08536. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Order to Show Cause. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT for the reasons stated on the record at the November 1, 2021 hearing, Petitioners motion for a preliminary injunction and for transfer to the District of New Jersey is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT in light of Respondents consent to transfer venue pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), see Dkt. 23, the case shall be transferred to the District of New Jersey. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the open motion at Docket Entry 14 and to transfer the above-captioned case to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. No further proceedings shall be had in this Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/3/2021) (tg)
November 3, 2021 Filing 23 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from J. Warren Mangan, Esq. dated November 3, 2021 re: transfer action to USDC New Jersey. Document filed by Wine, Liquor & Distillery Workers Union Local 1-D, UFCW..(Mangan, J.)
November 3, 2021 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - United States District Court of New Jersey.(tg)
November 1, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Valerie E. Caproni: Show Cause Hearing held on 11/1/2021. Attorneys John Horowitz and Kathryn Jones present for the petitioner. Attorney J. Warren Mangan present for the respondent. Court Reporter Paula Speer present. (anc)
November 1, 2021 Filing 22 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from J. Warren Mangan, Esq. dated November 1, 2021 re: bring additional citations to Court's attention. Document filed by Wine, Liquor & Distillery Workers Union Local 1-D, UFCW..(Mangan, J.)
October 29, 2021 Filing 21 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #14 PROPOSED MOTION for Order to Show Cause for TRO and Preliminary Injunction. . Document filed by Fedway Associates, Inc...(Horowitz, John)
October 28, 2021 Filing 20 OPPOSITION BRIEF to Petitioner's Order to Show Cause for Injunctive Relief and Declaratory Judgment. Document filed by Wine, Liquor & Distillery Workers Union Local 1-D, UFCW..(Mangan, J.)
October 26, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Valerie E. Caproni: Telephone Conference held on 10/26/2021. Attorney John Horowitz present for the plaintiff. Attorney J. Warren Mangan present for the defendant. Court Reporter Sonya Moore present. (anc)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Respondent Wine, Liquor & Distillery Workers Union Local 1-D, UFCW ("Respondent"), shall show cause as to why an Order should not be made and entered, pursuant to Rule 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, directing that Respondent be preliminarily enjoined from arbitrating its claims against Fedway regarding the discharge of Donald Walker as set forth in Respondent's Demand for Arbitration, dated August 11, 2021, before the American Arbitration Association ("Arbitration"), pending a determination of Fedway's Verified Petition for declaratory relief; and it is further, ORDERED that Horowitz Law Group, PLLC, shall serve a true copy of this Order to Show Cause, together with the papers upon which it is based, upon J. Warren Mangan, Esq., counsel for Respondent, via the Electronic Case Filing system; and it is further, ORDERED that answering papers, if any, to this motion shall be served on Horowitz Law Group, PLLC, via the Electronic Case Filing system on or before noon on Oct. 28, 2021; and it is further, ORDERED that reply papers, if any, to this motion shall be served on counsel appearing for Respondent in this proceeding via the Electronic Case Filing system on or before 5pm on October 29, 2021; and it is further, ORDERED that Horowitz Law Group, PLLC, shall serve a true copy of this Order to Show Cause, together with the papers upon which it is based, via e-mail upon Leslie Murphy, Case Manager at AAA. Ordered that the parties shall appear at 3:00pm on November 1, 2021, in Courtroom 443, Thurood Marchall U.S. Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, NY, NY 10007, for a hearing on the motion. SO ORDERED. Show Cause Hearing set for 11/1/2021 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/26/2021) (mml)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER with respect to #14 Motion for Order to Show Cause. WHEREAS Petitioner has moved for a temporary restraining order, see Dkts. 1417; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the parties must appear for a teleconference regarding Petitioners request on October 26, 2021, at 5:15 p.m. The parties may dial-in at (888) 363- 4748 // Access Code: 3121171# // Security Code: 8536#. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/26/2021) (tg)
October 26, 2021 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Richard J. Delello, Esq. in Support re: #14 PROPOSED MOTION for Order to Show Cause for TRO and Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Fedway Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 8/13/21 Emails, #2 Exhibit B - 9/29/21 Emails, #3 Exhibit C - 9/30/21 Letter).(Horowitz, John)
October 26, 2021 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Robert D. Sansone in Support re: #14 PROPOSED MOTION for Order to Show Cause for TRO and Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Fedway Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F).(Horowitz, John)
October 26, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #14 PROPOSED MOTION for Order to Show Cause for TRO and Preliminary Injunction. . Document filed by Fedway Associates, Inc...(Horowitz, John)
October 26, 2021 Filing 14 PROPOSED MOTION for Order to Show Cause for TRO and Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Fedway Associates, Inc...(Horowitz, John)
October 26, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 10/26/2021 at 05:15 PM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (tg)
October 25, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by J. Warren Mangan on behalf of Wine, Liquor & Distillery Workers Union Local 1-D, UFCW..(Mangan, J.)
October 22, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Wine, Liquor & Distillery Workers Union Local 1-D, UFCW waiver sent on 10/19/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. Document filed by Fedway Associates, Inc...(Beckenstein, Lawrence)
October 19, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call 888-363-4749, Access code 3121171#, Security code 8536. Initial Conference set for 1/7/2022 at 03:30 PM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/19/2021) (tg)
October 19, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lawrence Aryeh Beckenstein on behalf of Fedway Associates, Inc...(Beckenstein, Lawrence)
October 18, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wine, Liquor & Distillery Workers Union Local 1-D, UFCW. (vf)
October 18, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Wine, Liquor & Distillery Workers Union Local 1-D, UFCW, re: #7 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by Fedway Associates, Inc...(Horowitz, John)
October 18, 2021 Filing 7 PETITION TO STAY ARBITRATION..Document filed by Fedway Associates, Inc...(Horowitz, John)
October 18, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #5 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by Fedway Associates, Inc...(Horowitz, John)
October 18, 2021 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PETITION TO Stay ARBITRATION..Document filed by Fedway Associates, Inc.(Horowitz, John) Modified on 10/18/2021 (vf).
October 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John David Horowitz to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons when you correct and refile your pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
October 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney John David Horowitz to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; PDF Title must correspond to event type selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 10/25/2021. (vf)
October 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney John David Horowitz to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; PDF Title must correspond to event type selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 10/25/2021. (vf)
October 18, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
October 18, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
October 18, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
October 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John David Horowitz to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons when you correct and refile your pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
October 16, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Horowitz, John)
October 16, 2021 Filing 3 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Fedway Associates, Inc...(Horowitz, John)
October 16, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Wine, Liquor & Distillery Workers Union Local 1-D,UFCW, re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by Fedway Associates, Inc...(Horowitz, John) Modified on 10/18/2021 (vf).
October 16, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PETITION TO STAY ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25205223).Document filed by Fedway Associates, Inc...(Horowitz, John) Modified on 10/18/2021 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FEDWAY ASSOCIATES, INC. v. WINE, LIQUOR & DISTILLERY WORKERS UNION LOCAL 1-D, UFCW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FEDWAY ASSOCIATES, INC.
Represented By: JOHN D. HOROWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Wine, Liquor & Distillery Workers Union Local 1-D, UFCW
Represented By: ANDREW DOUGLAS BORG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?