M.N. et al v. SPARTA TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION et al
Plaintiff: M N, A D, M.N. and A.D.
Defendant: SPARTA TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION, NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION and ANGELICA ALLEN-MCMILLAN
Case Number: 2:2021cv19977
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jessica S Allen
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by M.N., A.D..(THURSTON, ROBERT)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: Currently pending before the Court is Plaintiffs motion for an order to show cause and a preliminary injunction. D.E. 11. As discussed with counsel during the teleconference on December 23, 2021, Defendants opposition is due by January 24, 2022. Plaintiffs reply is due by February 7, 2022. The Court will hear argument on February 10, 2022. So Ordered by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 12/23/21. (ro, )
December 23, 2021 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John Michael Vazquez: Status telephone conference held on 12/23/2021. (Court Reporter, Lisa Larsen (630-338-5069)) (ro, )
December 22, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE A. GILFILLAN on behalf of SPARTA TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION (GILFILLAN, KATHERINE)
December 22, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURIE LEE FICHERA on behalf of ANGELICA ALLEN-MCMILLAN, NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION (FICHERA, LAURIE)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: The Court has received and reviewed Plaintiffs application for an order to show cause and preliminary injunction. D.E. 11. On December 23, 2021 at 10:30 a.m., the Court will hold a teleconference with counsel to discuss a briefing schedule and return date. No defense counsel has yet entered an appearance. As a result, Plaintiffs counsel is instructed to convey the contents of the order to defense counsel, if known, and if not, to Defendants. Th court will provide dial in information for the call. So Ordered by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 12/22/21. (ro, ) Modified on 12/22/2021 (ro).
December 21, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of M.N., #3 Declaration of John Rue, Esq., #4 Declaration of Saran Edwards, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(THURSTON, ROBERT)
December 21, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA PAUL BOHN on behalf of ANGELICA ALLEN-MCMILLAN, NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION (BOHN, JOSHUA)
December 21, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT CRAIG THURSTON on behalf of All Plaintiffs (THURSTON, ROBERT)
December 16, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Angelica Allen-McMillan, NJ Commissioner of Education on 12/15/2021, filed by A.D., M.N.. (EDWARDS, SARAN)
December 16, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on New Jersey Department of Education by and through Andrew J. Bruck, Attorney General on 12/13/2021, filed by A.D., M.N.. (EDWARDS, SARAN)
December 16, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Sparta Board of Education c/o Matt Beck, Superintendent on 12/10/2021, filed by A.D., M.N.. (EDWARDS, SARAN)
December 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAN QIANA EDWARDS on behalf of A.D., M.N. (EDWARDS, SARAN)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER re #3 Letter. Plaintiffs' request to transfer vicinage to Camden, New Jersey, and assign this case to Hon. Noel L. Hillman, U.S.D.J., is DENIED. Pursuant to L. R. Civ. 40.1, the Court finds that this matter was appropriately assigned to the Newark Vicinage. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 12/8/2021. (Fang, W)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 Letter from John Rue. (RUE, JOHN)
November 15, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ANGELICA ALLEN-MCMILLAN, NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, SPARTA TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANGELICA ALLEN-MCMILLAN, NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, SPARTA TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12976227), filed by M N, A D. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RUE, JOHN)
November 12, 2021 Case assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.N. et al v. SPARTA TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M N
Represented By: JOHN DOUGLAS RUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A D
Represented By: JOHN DOUGLAS RUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.N.
Represented By: ROBERT CRAIG THURSTON
Represented By: SARAN QIANA EDWARDS
Represented By: JOHN DOUGLAS RUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.D.
Represented By: ROBERT CRAIG THURSTON
Represented By: SARAN QIANA EDWARDS
Represented By: JOHN DOUGLAS RUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPARTA TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION
Represented By: KATHERINE A. GILFILLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Represented By: LAURIE LEE FICHERA
Represented By: JOSHUA PAUL BOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGELICA ALLEN-MCMILLAN
Represented By: JOSHUA PAUL BOHN
Represented By: LAURIE LEE FICHERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?