CAMPBELL et al v. WOODCLIFF HEALTH & REHABILITATION CENTER et al
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF DONVILLE CAMPBELL and DWAYNE CAMPBELL
Defendant: WOODCLIFF HEALTH & REHABILITATION CENTER, M.D. BIRINDER KAUR, JOHN DOES 1-10 and ABC CORPS 1-10
Case Number: 2:2021cv20761
Filed: December 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: William J Martini
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2022 Filing 20 Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Bergen County Justice Center10 Main StreetHackensack, NJ 07601 State No: BER-L-7744. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (gh, )
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CONSENT ORDER TO REMAND to the Superior Court of New Jersey - Bergen County, etc. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 2/25/22. (gh, )
February 25, 2022 ***Civil Case Terminated. (gh, )
February 24, 2022 Filing 18 Proposed Order Consent Order for Remand by WOODCLIFF HEALTH & REHABILITATION CENTER re #8 MOTION to Dismiss , #9 MOTION to Dismiss , #1 Notice of Removal, #4 Notice of Removal, #10 MOTION to Remand . (MILLER, MALINDA)
February 17, 2022 Filing 17 Letter from Rachel M. Schwartz, Esq.. (SCHWARTZ, RACHEL)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant Woodcliff Lake Health & Rehabilitation Centers letter dated February 16, 2022, requesting this civil action be remanded to the Superior Court of New Jersey in which it was originally filed. ECF No. 15. To the extent all parties, including Defendant Birinder Kaur, M.D., consent to remand, they shall file a signed Consent Order for Remand or before February 24, 2022. So Ordered by Judge William J. Martini on 2/17/22. (gh, )
February 16, 2022 Filing 15 Letter from Defendant Woodcliff Lake Health & Rehabilitation Center. (MILLER, MALINDA)
February 3, 2022 Filing 14 Letter from plaintiff's counsel. (LANE, WILLIAM)
February 2, 2022 Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss , #8 MOTION to Dismiss , #10 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 3/7/2022 before Judge William J. Martini. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
February 1, 2022 Filing 13 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by BIRINDER KAUR re #10 MOTION to Remand (SCHWARTZ, RACHEL)
February 1, 2022 Filing 12 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by WOODCLIFF HEALTH & REHABILITATION CENTER re #10 MOTION to Remand (MILLER, MALINDA)
February 1, 2022 Filing 11 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss , #9 MOTION to Dismiss . (LOPRETE, ALEXANDRA)
January 31, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 2/22/2022 before Judge William J. Martini. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt,)
January 28, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Service, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Counsel, #3 Exhibit Exhibits A-J, #4 Text of Proposed Order Order, #5 Brief Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion)(LOPRETE, ALEXANDRA)
January 25, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss , #8 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 2/22/2022 before Judge William J. Martini. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, )
January 21, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by WOODCLIFF HEALTH & REHABILITATION CENTER. Responses due by 2/8/2022 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Certificate of Service)(MILLER, MALINDA)
January 21, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by BIRINDER KAUR. Responses due by 2/8/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Counsel, #2 Brief Brief, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(SCHWARTZ, RACHEL)
January 6, 2022 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by WOODCLIFF HEALTH & REHABILITATION CENTER has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/21/2022. (bt,)
January 6, 2022 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by BIRINDER KAUR has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/22/2022. (bt,)
January 5, 2022 Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (MARTINO, SALVATORE)
January 4, 2022 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney RYAN NOTARANGELO for BIRINDER KAUR added. (NOTARANGELO, RYAN)
January 3, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN NOTARANGELO on behalf of BIRINDER KAUR (NOTARANGELO, RYAN)
December 31, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BIRINDER KAUR ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13077079), filed by BIRINDER KAUR.(SCHWARTZ, RACHEL)
December 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by SALVATORE CHRISTOPHER MARTINO on behalf of WOODCLIFF HEALTH & REHABILITATION CENTER (MARTINO, SALVATORE)
December 30, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WOODCLIFF HEALTH & REHABILITATION CENTER. (MILLER, MALINDA)
December 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WOODCLIFF HEALTH & REHABILITATION CENTER from Superior Court of New Jersey - Bergen County, case number BER L 7744 21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13075296), filed by WOODCLIFF HEALTH & REHABILITATION CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certification Notice of Filing in State Court)(MILLER, MALINDA)
December 30, 2021 Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAMPBELL et al v. WOODCLIFF HEALTH & REHABILITATION CENTER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF DONVILLE CAMPBELL
Represented By: ALEXANDRA LOPRETE
Represented By: WILLIAM R. LANE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DWAYNE CAMPBELL
Represented By: ALEXANDRA LOPRETE
Represented By: WILLIAM R. LANE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WOODCLIFF HEALTH & REHABILITATION CENTER
Represented By: SALVATORE CHRISTOPHER MARTINO
Represented By: MALINDA A. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. BIRINDER KAUR
Represented By: RYAN NOTARANGELO
Represented By: RACHEL MELISSA SCHWARTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?