ELEZOVIC v. MOTOR COACH INDUSTRIES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS ELEZOVIC
Defendant: MOTOR COACH INDUSTRIES, INC., PETER PAN BUS LINES, INC., WABCO HOLDINGS INC., JOHN DOES 1-10 (FICTICIOUS NAMES) and ABC COMPANIES 1-10 (FICTITIOUS NAMES)
Case Number: 2:2022cv00110
Filed: January 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Andre M Espinosa
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2022 Pro Hac Vice counsel, WESLEY R. PAYNE, IV, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (bt)
March 8, 2022 Filing 19 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney DOUGLAS M WECK, Jr terminated. Attorney JAMES D. BURGER for MOTOR COACH INDUSTRIES, INC.,JAMES D. BURGER for MOTOR COACH INDUSTRIES, INC.,JAMES D. BURGER for MOTOR COACH INDUSTRIES, INC. added.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BURGER, JAMES)
March 8, 2022 Filing 18 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Wesley R. Payne, IV to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13237338.) (WECK, DOUGLAS)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Scheduling Initial R16 Conference for 4/19/2022 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 3/3/2022. (spc)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to WESLEY R. PAYNE, IV etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 3/1/2022. (bt)
February 28, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MOTOR COACH INDUSTRIES, INC.. (WECK, DOUGLAS)
February 15, 2022 Filing 14 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by MOTOR COACH INDUSTRIES, INC. re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Counts of Plaintiff's Complaint (WECK, DOUGLAS)
February 11, 2022 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by PETER PAN BUS LINES, INC. re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Counts of Plaintiff's Complaint Response to Plaintiff's Opposition (BARBER, RICHARD)
February 7, 2022 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by NICHOLAS ELEZOVIC re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Counts of Plaintiff's Complaint (DELANEY, NICHOLAS)
January 31, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Counts of Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 2/22/2022 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, )
January 28, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Counts of Plaintiff's Complaint by MOTOR COACH INDUSTRIES, INC.. (WECK, DOUGLAS)
January 28, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PETER PAN BUS LINES, INC.. (BARBER, RICHARD)
January 28, 2022 Filing 9 PETER PAN BUS LINES, INC's ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against MOTOR COACH INDUSTRIES, INC. by PETER PAN BUS LINES, INC..(BARBER, RICHARD)
January 19, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW PATRICK ROCCO on behalf of PETER PAN BUS LINES, INC. (ROCCO, MATTHEW)
January 19, 2022 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by PETER PAN BUS LINES, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/28/2022. (bt,)
January 19, 2022 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MOTOR COACH INDUSTRIES, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/1/2022. (bt, )
January 18, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against ABC COMPANIES 1-10 (FICTITIOUS NAMES), JOHN DOES 1-10 (FICTICIOUS NAMES), MOTOR COACH INDUSTRIES, INC., PETER PAN BUS LINES, INC. by WABCO HOLDINGS INC..(AVERELL, DIANE)
January 14, 2022 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Motor Coach Industries, Inc.. Attorney DOUGLAS M WECK, Jr for MOTOR COACH INDUSTRIES, INC. added. (WECK, DOUGLAS)
January 14, 2022 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Peter Pan Bus Lines Inc.. (BARBER, RICHARD)
January 14, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD EVAN BARBER on behalf of PETER PAN BUS LINES, INC. (BARBER, RICHARD)
January 12, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by DOUGLAS M WECK, Jr on behalf of MOTOR COACH INDUSTRIES, INC. (WECK, DOUGLAS)
January 10, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WABCO HOLDINGS INC.. (AVERELL, DIANE)
January 10, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WABCO HOLDINGS INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Hudson County, case number HUD-L-4699-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13098557), filed by WABCO HOLDINGS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(AVERELL, DIANE)
January 10, 2022 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr)
January 10, 2022 Case assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ELEZOVIC v. MOTOR COACH INDUSTRIES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS ELEZOVIC
Represented By: KATHERINE G. HOUGHTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOTOR COACH INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: JAMES D. BURGER
Represented By: DOUGLAS M WECK, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER PAN BUS LINES, INC.
Represented By: RICHARD EVAN BARBER
Represented By: MATTHEW PATRICK ROCCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WABCO HOLDINGS INC.
Represented By: DIANE FLEMING AVERELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10 (FICTICIOUS NAMES)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC COMPANIES 1-10 (FICTITIOUS NAMES)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?