ILLIANO v. WAYNE BOARD OF EDUCATION et al
Plaintiff: SCOTT ILLIANO
Defendant: WAYNE BOARD OF EDUCATION, MICHAEL REWICK, MARK TOBACK, JEFF DILOLLO, CATHERINE KAZAN, WAYNE HILLS BASEBALL BOOSTER CLUB, PAM O'MEALY, MELISSA CASAMASSINA, KATHERINE D'AGATI, JOHN/JANE DOES 1-5, ABC ENTITIES 1-10 and Michael Bubba
Case Number: 2:2022cv00114
Filed: January 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 LETTER ORDER re #80 Directing the Parties to meet and confer regarding any purported deficiencies in Defendant BUBBA's discovery responses. If issues remain following a good faith meet and confer, the Parties shall submit a joint letter of five (5) pages or less setting forth all remaining disputes along with the parties respective positions by 11/30/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 11/13/2023. (jd, )
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel to Court. (FARSIOU, STEVEN)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 LETTER ORDER Denying #78 Plaintiff's request for a 90 day extension of fact discovery; As set forth in the Courts #77 Order, fact discovery shall be completed by 1/31/2024 and there will be no further extensions. Defendant BUBBA shall serve his response to written discovery by no later than 11/7/2023. No further extensions. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 11/6/2023. (jd, )
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel. (FARSIOU, STEVEN)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 LETTER ORDER re #76 Joint letter to the Court; Fact discovery shall be completed by 1/31/2024, and there will be no further extensions of the deadline. The Court will conduct a Telephone Status Conference with the parties on 1/30/2024 at 12:00 PM. Counsel for Defendant, Wayne Board of Education shall initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/19/2023. (jd,)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Telephone Conference held on 10/19/2023. (seb)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Letter from Plaintiff. (FARSIOU, STEVEN)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 LETTER ORDER re #74 Adjourning the Telephone Conference to 10/19/2023 at 12:00 PM; The parties shall submit joint letter by 10/13/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 9/7/2023. (jd, )
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Letter from Plaintiff re #73 Order. (FARSIOU, STEVEN)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 LETTER ORDER granting #72 Plaintiff's request for a one-week extension for the parties to file a joint letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 8/30/2023. (jd, )
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Letter from Plaintiff re #68 Order,, Set Hearings,. (FARSIOU, STEVEN)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 LETTER ORDER: Telephone Conference adjourned to 9/18/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 8/28/2023. (ld, )
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by MELISSA CASAMASSINA, KATHERINE D'AGATI, PAM O'MEALY, WAYNE HILLS BASEBALL BOOSTER CLUB re #53 MOTION to Dismiss Partially the 2nd Amended Complaint REVISED (NIRENBERG, HOWARD)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 TEXT ORDER re #67 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion filed by MELISSA CASAMASSINA, WAYNE HILLS BASEBALL BOOSTER CLUB, KATHERINE D'AGATI, PAM O'MEALY: The reply brief (D.E. 67) filed by Defendants Melissa Casamassina, Katherine DAgati, Pam OMealy, and Wayne Hills Baseball Booster Club (Booster Club Defendants) does not comply with Local Civil Rules 7.2(b) and (d). The Booster Club Defendants may file an amended reply brief by no later than 4:00 p.m. on Wednesday, August 16, 2023. Should the Booster Club Defendants fail to comply with this Order or the relevant civil rules, their right to submit a reply brief will be deemed waived. So Ordered by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 8/15/2023. (cds)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 LETTER ORDER Scheduling a Telephone Status Conference set for 9/14/2023 at 10:00 AM; Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the call. The Parties shall submit a joint letter of seven (7) pages or less setting forth all outstanding discovery disputes along with the parties' respective positions by no later than 8/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 8/10/2023. (jd, )
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by MELISSA CASAMASSINA, KATHERINE D'AGATI, PAM O'MEALY, WAYNE HILLS BASEBALL BOOSTER CLUB re #53 MOTION to Dismiss Partially the 2nd Amended Complaint (NIRENBERG, HOWARD)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Telephone Conference held on 8/10/2023. (seb)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by MICHAEL BUBBA, JEFF DILOLLO, CATHERINE KAZAN, MICHAEL REWICK, MARK TOBACK, WAYNE BOARD OF EDUCATION re #54 MOTION to Dismiss Partially Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SHAH, ROSHAN)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 LETTER ORDER re #64 granting a brief three-day extension to submit a reply brief in further support of the motion, until 8/10/2023. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 8/7/2023. (jd, )
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Letter from Dennis Schmieder re #54 MOTION to Dismiss Partially Plaintiff's Complaint. (SCHMIEDER, DENNIS)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Letter from Dennis Schmieder re #54 MOTION to Dismiss Partially Plaintiff's Complaint. (SCHMIEDER, DENNIS)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 LETTER ORDER re #61 Extending the reply brief deadline, until 8/14/2023. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 8/3/2023. (jd, )
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Letter from Sandra N. Varano, Esq. re #53 MOTION to Dismiss Partially the 2nd Amended Complaint. (NIRENBERG, HOWARD)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 BRIEF in Opposition filed by SCOTT ILLIANO re #54 MOTION to Dismiss Partially Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certification Cert of Exhibits with Exhibits)(FARSIOU, STEVEN)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 BRIEF in Opposition filed by SCOTT ILLIANO re #53 MOTION to Dismiss Partially the 2nd Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certification Cert of Exhibits)(FARSIOU, STEVEN)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 TEXT ORDER re #57 Letter: Plaintiffs request (D.E. 57) for a one-week extension to file briefs in opposition to Defendants motions to dismiss (D.E. 53, 54) is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file his opposition brief(s) by no later than Monday, July 31, 2023. Any reply brief(s) shall be filed by no later than Monday, August 7, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 7/25/2023. (cds)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Letter from Steven D. Farsiou, Esq.. (FARSIOU, STEVEN)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #56 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct, and #55 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Partially the 2nd Amended Complaint. Motion set for 8/7/2023 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jd, )
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #54 MOTION to Dismiss Partially Plaintiff's Complaint by MICHAEL BUBBA, JEFF DILOLLO, CATHERINE KAZAN, MICHAEL REWICK, MARK TOBACK, WAYNE BOARD OF EDUCATION. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Letter to Court)(SCHMIEDER, DENNIS)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Partially the 2nd Amended Complaint by MELISSA CASAMASSINA, KATHERINE D'AGATI, PAM O'MEALY, WAYNE HILLS BASEBALL BOOSTER CLUB. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Letter)(NIRENBERG, HOWARD)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #54 MOTION to Dismiss Partially Plaintiff's Complaint, and #53 MOTION to Dismiss Partially the 2nd Amended Complaint. Motion set for 8/7/2023 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jd, )
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION to Dismiss Partially Plaintiff's Complaint by Michael Bubba, JEFF DILOLLO, CATHERINE KAZAN, MICHAEL REWICK, MARK TOBACK, WAYNE BOARD OF EDUCATION. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Partial Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service Certification of Service)(SCHMIEDER, DENNIS)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION to Dismiss Partially the 2nd Amended Complaint by MELISSA CASAMASSINA, KATHERINE D'AGATI, PAM O'MEALY, WAYNE HILLS BASEBALL BOOSTER CLUB. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(NIRENBERG, HOWARD)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 LETTER ORDER: The Parties' joint letter shall be submitted by 8/4/2023. The 6/29/2023 Telephone Conference is adjourned to 8/10/2023 at 12:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/28/2023. (wh)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Letter from Howard M. Nirenberg, Esq.. (NIRENBERG, HOWARD)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Letter from Steven D. Farsiou, Esq.. (FARSIOU, STEVEN)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #49 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by PAM O'MEALY, MELISSA CASAMASSINA, WAYNE HILLS BASEBALL BOOSTER CLUB, and KATHERINE D'AGATI has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/11/2023. (jd, )
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Wayne Hills Baseball Booster Club, O'Mealy, Casamassina & D'Agati. Attorney HOWARD M. NIRENBERG for MELISSA CASAMASSINA,HOWARD M. NIRENBERG for KATHERINE D'AGATI,HOWARD M. NIRENBERG for PAM O'MEALY,HOWARD M. NIRENBERG for WAYNE HILLS BASEBALL BOOSTER CLUB added. (NIRENBERG, HOWARD)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #48 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by MARK TOBACK, Michael Bubba, MICHAEL REWICK, JEFF DILOLLO, WAYNE BOARD OF EDUCATION, CATHERINE KAZAN has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/11/2023. (jd, )
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Wayne Board of Education, Michael Rewick, Mark Toback, Jeff DiLollo, Catherine Kazan, and Michael Bubba. Attorney DENNIS C. SCHMIEDER for Michael Bubba,DENNIS C. SCHMIEDER for MELISSA CASAMASSINA,DENNIS C. SCHMIEDER for JEFF DILOLLO,DENNIS C. SCHMIEDER for CATHERINE KAZAN,DENNIS C. SCHMIEDER for MICHAEL REWICK,DENNIS C. SCHMIEDER for MARK TOBACK,DENNIS C. SCHMIEDER for WAYNE BOARD OF EDUCATION added. (SCHMIEDER, DENNIS)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by SCOTT ILLIANO.(FARSIOU, STEVEN)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 LETTER ORDER Advising the Telephone Conference set for 6/29/2023 will commence at 11:00 AM instead. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/12/2023. (jd, )
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Plaintiff Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint; and shall file the second Amended Complaint and request the issuance of a summons within seven (7) days from the date of this Order; terminating #18 and #22 Motion to Dismiss as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/7/2023. (jd, )
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #44 First MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Motion set for 6/20/2023 before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jd, )
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 First MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by SCOTT ILLIANO. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in support of motion, #2 Certification Exhibit Certification by Counsel, #3 Exhibit Exhibits A-B, #4 Exhibit Exhibits C-F, #5 Exhibit Exhibits G-J, #6 Exhibit Exhibits K-M, #7 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #8 Proposed 2nd Amended Complaint)(FARSIOU, STEVEN)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 LETTER ORDER: The Parties shall have thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to resolve the disputes outlined in Plaintiff's Letter. If issues remain, the Parties are to submit a Joint Letter of five (5) pages or less setting forth all remaining disputes along with the Parties' respective positions by 6/21/2023. The 6/1/2023 Telephone Conference is adjourned to 6/29/2023 at 12:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/9/2023. (wh)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Letter from Steven D. Farsiou, Esq.. (FARSIOU, STEVEN)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 LETTER ORDER re #40 extending the deadline to file a letter setting forth any remaining issues, until 5/8/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/1/2023. (jd, )
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Letter from Steven D. Farsiou, Esq.. (FARSIOU, STEVEN)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 LETTER ORDER that the parties are directed to engage in a good faith meet and confer and attempt to resolve any disputes regarding Defendants' responses to written discovery. If the parties are unable to resolve their issues, they are to submit a joint letter to the Court five (5) pages or less setting forth all remaining disputes along with the parties' respective positions by 4/28/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/6/2023. (sm)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Letter from Steven D. Farsiou, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(FARSIOU, STEVEN)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/5/2023. (jd, )
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Proposed Order by JEFF DILOLLO, CATHERINE KAZAN, MICHAEL REWICK, MARK TOBACK, WAYNE BOARD OF EDUCATION. (SCHMIEDER, DENNIS)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 LETTER ORDER that all discovery deadlines are hereby extended by thirty (30) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/6/2023. (sm)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Letter from Dennis Schmieder, Esq.. (SCHMIEDER, DENNIS)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 LETTER ORDER Scheduling a Telephone Status Conference for 6/1/2023 at 10:30 AM, Counsel for Defendant WAYNE BOARD of EDUCATION shall initiate the call. Responses to all extant written discovery shall be provided by 3/1/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/1/2023. (jd, )
January 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Letter from Steven D. Farsiou, Esq.. (FARSIOU, STEVEN)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by JEFF DILOLLO, CATHERINE KAZAN, MICHAEL REWICK, MARK TOBACK, WAYNE BOARD OF EDUCATION re #22 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SHAH, ROSHAN)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ORDER: Defendant's request is granted. Defendant shall file their reply no later than Friday, January 13, 2023 at 12:00 noon. No further extensions will be granted. re #27 Letter So Ordered by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 1/9/2023. (cds)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by MELISSA CASAMASSINA, KATHERINE D'AGATI, PAM O'MEALY, WAYNE HILLS BASEBALL BOOSTER CLUB re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Partially (NIRENBERG, HOWARD)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Letter from Steven D. Farsiou, Esq.. (FARSIOU, STEVEN)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Letter from Roshan D. Shah, Esq.. (SHAH, ROSHAN)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 BRIEF in Opposition filed by SCOTT ILLIANO re #22 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) for Failure to State a Claim by School Defendants (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G)(FARSIOU, STEVEN)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 LETTER ORDER granting #24 Letter requesting an extension of time to file a reply brief, until 1/10/2023. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 12/22/2022. (jd, )
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Letter from Howard M. Nirenberg, Esq. re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Partially. (NIRENBERG, HOWARD)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 BRIEF in Opposition filed by SCOTT ILLIANO re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Partially by Booster Defendants (Attachments: #1 Certification Exhibit Certification with attachments)(FARSIOU, STEVEN)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) for Failure to State a Claim. Motion set for 1/17/2023 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jd, )
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) for Failure to State a Claim by CATHERINE KAZAN, MICHAEL REWICK, MARK TOBACK, WAYNE BOARD OF EDUCATION. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SHAH, ROSHAN)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 LETTER ORDER granting #19 Letter requesting an extension of 14-days to Answer, move, or otherwise reply to the Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 11/29/2022. (jd, )
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Letter from Steven D. Farsiou, Esq.. (FARSIOU, STEVEN)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss Partially. Motion set for 1/3/2023 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jd, )
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Letter from Wayne Board of Education Defendants seeking an extension to answer or otherwise plead. (SCHMIEDER, DENNIS)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Partially by MELISSA CASAMASSINA, KATHERINE D'AGATI, PAM O'MEALY, WAYNE HILLS BASEBALL BOOSTER CLUB. (NIRENBERG, HOWARD)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by SANDRA NICOLE VARANO on behalf of MELISSA CASAMASSINA, KATHERINE D'AGATI, PAM O'MEALY, WAYNE HILLS BASEBALL BOOSTER CLUB (VARANO, SANDRA)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #15 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by PAM O'MEALY, MELISSA CASAMASSINA, WAYNE HILLS BASEBALL BOOSTER CLUB, KATHERINE D'AGATI has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/28/2022. (jd, )
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #16 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MARK TOBACK, MICHAEL REWICK, JEFF DILOLLO, WAYNE BOARD OF EDUCATION, CATHERINE KAZAN has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/28/2022. (jd, )
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (SHAH, ROSHAN)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Wayne Hills Baseball Booster Club, O'Mealy, Casamassina & D'Agati. Attorney HOWARD M. NIRENBERG for MELISSA CASAMASSINA,HOWARD M. NIRENBERG for KATHERINE D'AGATI,HOWARD M. NIRENBERG for PAM O'MEALY,HOWARD M. NIRENBERG for WAYNE HILLS BASEBALL BOOSTER CLUB added. (NIRENBERG, HOWARD)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by SCOTT ILLIANO.(FARSIOU, STEVEN)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Telephone Conference held on 10/4/2022. (seb)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER ORDER Scheduling a Telephone Status Conference for 2/1/2023 at 10:00 AM; and the parties shall exchange settlement positions prior to the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/4/2022. (jd, )
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #4 Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice; and that the Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days to file an Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 9/30/2022. (jd, )
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 OPINION. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 9/30/2022. (jd, )
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/22/2022. (jd, )
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Scheduling Conference held on 6/22/2022. (seb)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by MELISSA CASAMASSINA, KATHERINE D'AGATI, JEFF DILOLLO, CATHERINE KAZAN, PAM O'MEALY, MICHAEL REWICK, MARK TOBACK, WAYNE BOARD OF EDUCATION re #4 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SHAH, ROSHAN)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 BRIEF in Opposition filed by SCOTT ILLIANO re #4 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel, #2 Exhibits A-M, #3 Certificate of Service)(FARSIOU, STEVEN) Modified on 5/3/2022 (jd, ).
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 6/22/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/25/2022. (seb)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney RONALD J. RICCI terminated. Attorney HOWARD M. NIRENBERG for MELISSA CASAMASSINA,HOWARD M. NIRENBERG for KATHERINE D'AGATI,HOWARD M. NIRENBERG for PAM O'MEALY,HOWARD M. NIRENBERG for WAYNE HILLS BASEBALL BOOSTER CLUB added.. (NIRENBERG, HOWARD)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney ROSHAN DEVEN SHAH terminated. Attorney HOWARD M. NIRENBERG for MELISSA CASAMASSINA,HOWARD M. NIRENBERG for KATHERINE D'AGATI,HOWARD M. NIRENBERG for PAM O'MEALY,HOWARD M. NIRENBERG for WAYNE HILLS BASEBALL BOOSTER CLUB added.. (NIRENBERG, HOWARD)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) for Failure to State a Claim. Motion set for 5/16/2022 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jd)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) for Failure to State a Claim by MELISSA CASAMASSINA, KATHERINE D'AGATI, JEFF DILOLLO, CATHERINE KAZAN, PAM O'MEALY, MICHAEL REWICK, MARK TOBACK, WAYNE BOARD OF EDUCATION. Responses due by 5/2/2022 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SHAH, ROSHAN)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by DENNIS C. SCHMIEDER on behalf of JEFF DILOLLO, CATHERINE KAZAN, MICHAEL REWICK, MARK TOBACK, WAYNE BOARD OF EDUCATION (SCHMIEDER, DENNIS)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal,, Amended Notice of Removal by JEFF DILOLLO, CATHERINE KAZAN, MICHAEL REWICK, MARK TOBACK, WAYNE BOARD OF EDUCATION. (DONEGAN, ERIN)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MARK TOBACK, Michael Rewick, Jeff DiLollo, WAYNE BOARD OF EDUCATION, Catherine Kazan from Passaic County Superior Court, case number PAS-L-3799-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13099276), filed by MARK TOBACK, Michael Rewick, Jeff DiLollo, WAYNE BOARD OF EDUCATION, Catherine Kazan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Notice to Plaintiff of Removal of Suit, #6 Notice to State Court of Removal of Suit)(DONEGAN, ERIN)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Jury Demand - Changed to Plaintiff; Party Information - Parties are to be entered in all capital letters. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jr)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (jr)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice of Removal #1 submitted by Erin Donegan on 1/10/22 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE using the event EXHIBIT (to document). This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ILLIANO v. WAYNE BOARD OF EDUCATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT ILLIANO
Represented By: STEVEN D. FARSIOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAYNE BOARD OF EDUCATION
Represented By: ROSHAN DEVEN SHAH
Represented By: ERIN DONEGAN
Represented By: DENNIS C. SCHMIEDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL REWICK
Represented By: ROSHAN DEVEN SHAH
Represented By: ERIN DONEGAN
Represented By: DENNIS C. SCHMIEDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK TOBACK
Represented By: ROSHAN DEVEN SHAH
Represented By: ERIN DONEGAN
Represented By: DENNIS C. SCHMIEDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFF DILOLLO
Represented By: ROSHAN DEVEN SHAH
Represented By: ERIN DONEGAN
Represented By: DENNIS C. SCHMIEDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATHERINE KAZAN
Represented By: ROSHAN DEVEN SHAH
Represented By: ERIN DONEGAN
Represented By: DENNIS C. SCHMIEDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAYNE HILLS BASEBALL BOOSTER CLUB
Represented By: RONALD J. RICCI
Represented By: HOWARD M. NIRENBERG
Represented By: SANDRA NICOLE VARANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAM O'MEALY
Represented By: RONALD J. RICCI
Represented By: ROSHAN DEVEN SHAH
Represented By: HOWARD M. NIRENBERG
Represented By: SANDRA NICOLE VARANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELISSA CASAMASSINA
Represented By: RONALD J. RICCI
Represented By: ROSHAN DEVEN SHAH
Represented By: HOWARD M. NIRENBERG
Represented By: SANDRA NICOLE VARANO
Represented By: DENNIS C. SCHMIEDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHERINE D'AGATI
Represented By: RAYMOND SCOTT VIVINO
Represented By: ROSHAN DEVEN SHAH
Represented By: HOWARD M. NIRENBERG
Represented By: SANDRA NICOLE VARANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN/JANE DOES 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC ENTITIES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bubba
Represented By: DENNIS C. SCHMIEDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?