KAETZ v. THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: WILLIAM F. KAETZ
Defendant: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE, TONYA SULIA GOODMAN, UNITED STATES PROBATION OFFICE, AFONSO FERNANDES, JAVIER MARRERO, ALLEGHENY COUNTY JAIL, ORLANDO HARPER, NORTHEAST OHIO CORRECTIONS CENTER, DAVID BOBBY, DOUGLAS SUGHRUE, JUDGE NICHOLAS J. RANJAN, JUDGE PATRICIA L. DODGE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, DESIGNATION AND SENTENCE COMPUTATION CENTER, EMILY RACE, BUFFEYANNE ESQUIVEL, BI INCORPORATED and JUDGE J. NICHOLAS RANJAN
Case Number: 2:2022cv01003
Filed: February 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 5/16/2022 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, )
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss by ALLEGHENY COUNTY JAIL, ORLANDO HARPER. Responses due by 5/2/2022 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A -- Declaration of Orlando Harper, #4 Exhibit B -- Criminal Docket, #5 Exhibit C -- Kaetz filing on 10/19/21, #6 Exhibit D -- Extraordinary Writ for Mandamus and Injunction, #7 Exhibit E -- Joint Status Report, #8 Exhibit F -- Habeas Docket, #9 Exhibit G -- Petition for Habeas, #10 Exhibit H -- Habeas Report and Recommendation, #11 Exhibit I -- Judge Ranjan Opinion, #12 Exhibit J -- Kaetz Letter Argument in Support of Third Circuit Appeal)(WIYGUL, ROBERT)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT ANDREW WIYGUL on behalf of ALLEGHENY COUNTY JAIL, ORLANDO HARPER (WIYGUL, ROBERT)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY MARK ORTOLANI on behalf of DOUGLAS SUGHRUE (ORTOLANI, TIMOTHY)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT A. BERNS on behalf of DOUGLAS SUGHRUE (BERNS, ROBERT)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Received by DOUGLAS SUGHRUE. (BERNS, ROBERT)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #9 Application 6.1 filed by DOUGLAS SUGHRUE on 4/11/2022 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. For future filings of this nature, please select the event "Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order" found under Other Documents. The Clerk's Office has terminated the #9 Motion and will review the Application 6.1. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (ams, )
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #9 submitted by DOUGLAS SUGHRUE has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/25/2022. (ams, )
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Howard B. Mankoff with Application for Extension of Time to Answer)(MANKOFF, HOWARD)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #8 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by BI INCORPORATED has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/27/2022. (ams, )
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by HOWARD B. MANKOFF on behalf of BI INCORPORATED (Attachments: #1 Letter from Howard B. Mankoff re corrected Notice of Appearance)(MANKOFF, HOWARD)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by HOWARD B. MANKOFF on behalf of BI INCORPORATED (MANKOFF, HOWARD)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALLEGHENY COUNTY JAIL, BI INCORPORATED, DAVID BOBBY, DESIGNATION AND SENTENCE COMPUTATION CENTER, PATRICIA L. DODGE, BUFFEYANNE ESQUIVEL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, AFONSO FERNANDES, TONYA SULIA GOODMAN, ORLANDO HARPER, JAVIER MARRERO, NORTHEAST OHIO CORRECTIONS CENTER, EMILY RACE, J. NICHOLAS RANJAN, DOUGLAS SUGHRUE, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE, UNITED STATES PROBATION OFFICE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order USM-285 forms received for THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE (The U.S. Attorney, The Attorney General of the United States), TONYA SULIA GOODMAN (The U.S. Attorney, The Attorney General of the United States), UNITED STATES PROBATION OFFICE (The U.S. Attorney, The Attorney General of the United States), AFONSO FERNANDES (The U.S. Attorney, The Attorney General of the United States), JAVIER MARRERO (The U.S. Attorney, The Attorney General of the United States), ALLEGHENY COUNTY JAIL, ORLANDO HARPER, NORTHEAST OHIO CORRECTIONS CENTER, DAVID BOBBY, DOUGLAS SUGHRUE, JUDGE J. NICHOLAS RANJAN, JUDGE PATRICIA L. DODGE, FEDERAL BEREAU OF PRISONS, DESIGNATION AND SENTENCE COMPUTATION CENTER, EMILY RACE, BUFFEYANNE ESQUIVEL, BI INCORPORATED. (ams, )
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CLERK'S LETTER: Transmittal of USM 285 Forms. (ams, )
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 -2 Application IFP; The Clerk is to file the Complaint, and provide the Plaintiff with USM285 Forms for each Defendant to complete and return. etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 3/1/2022. (ams, )
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order COMPLAINT against ALLEGHENY COUNTY JAIL, BI INCORPORATED, DAVID BOBBY, DESIGNATION AND SENTENCE COMPUTATION CENTER, PATRICIA L. DODGE, BUFFEYANNE ESQUIVEL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, AFONSO FERNANDES, TONYA SULIA GOODMAN, ORLANDO HARPER, JAVIER MARRERO, NORTHEAST OHIO CORRECTIONS CENTER, EMILY RACE, NICHOLAS J. RANJAN, DOUGLAS SUGHRUE, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE, UNITED STATES PROBATION OFFICE with JURY DEMAND, filed by WILLIAM F. KAETZ (See D.E. #1 ).(ams, )
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (mxw)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Application IFP, #3 Letter, #4 Envelope)(mxw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KAETZ v. THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM F. KAETZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TONYA SULIA GOODMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES PROBATION OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AFONSO FERNANDES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAVIER MARRERO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEGHENY COUNTY JAIL
Represented By: ROBERT ANDREW WIYGUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORLANDO HARPER
Represented By: ROBERT ANDREW WIYGUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHEAST OHIO CORRECTIONS CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID BOBBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUGLAS SUGHRUE
Represented By: ROBERT A. BERNS
Represented By: TIMOTHY MARK ORTOLANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDGE NICHOLAS J. RANJAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDGE PATRICIA L. DODGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DESIGNATION AND SENTENCE COMPUTATION CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMILY RACE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUFFEYANNE ESQUIVEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BI INCORPORATED
Represented By: HOWARD B. MANKOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDGE J. NICHOLAS RANJAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?