AIT WORLDWIDE LOGISTICS, INC. et al v. M/V ONE APUS in rem et al
Plaintiff: AIT WORLDWIDE LOGISTICS, INC., TOPOCEAN CONSOLIDATION SERVICE (LOS ANGELES) INC. and WORLDBRIDGE LOGISTICS, INC.
Defendant: HMM CO. LTD., M/V ONE APUS in rem, OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE. LTD., HYUNDAI MERCHANT MARINE CO., LTD, HAPAG-LLOYD AG and SHIPCO TRANSPORT, INC.
Case Number: 2:2022cv01022
Filed: February 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Esther Salas
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 0740 DAMAGE OR INJURY CAUSED BY VESSEL
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2022 Filing 15 Letter from George W. Wright, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(WRIGHT, GEORGE)
March 7, 2022 Filing 14 WARRANT for Arrest of Vessel in Rem issued as to M/V ONE APUS, Voyage No. 009W, etc (ek)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER for Appointment of Substitute Custodian, etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 3/7/2022. (ek)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER of In Rem Vessel Arrest, etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 3/7/2022. (ek)
March 3, 2022 Filing 11 Letter from George W. Wright, Esq.. (WRIGHT, GEORGE)
March 3, 2022 Filing 10 Proposed Order (Warrant for Arrest) by AIT WORLDWIDE LOGISTICS, INC., TOPOCEAN CONSOLIDATION SERVICE (LOS ANGELES) INC., WORLDBRIDGE LOGISTICS, INC.. (WRIGHT, GEORGE)
March 3, 2022 Filing 9 Proposed Order for Appointment of Substitute Custodian by AIT WORLDWIDE LOGISTICS, INC., TOPOCEAN CONSOLIDATION SERVICE (LOS ANGELES) INC., WORLDBRIDGE LOGISTICS, INC.. (WRIGHT, GEORGE)
March 3, 2022 Filing 8 Letter from George W. Wright, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(WRIGHT, GEORGE)
March 2, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to HAPAG-LLOYD AG, HMM CO. LTD., M/V ONE APUS in rem, OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE. LTD., SHIPCO TRANSPORT, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: No later than March 3, 2022, Plaintiffs shall file a letter, not to exceed seven pages, explaining the legal basis to issue a warrant to arrest the container vessel M/V ONE APUS. Plaintiffs shall also address whether the one-year statute of limitations has expired under the Carriage of Goods by Sea Act, 46 U.S.C. 30701. See Petroleos Mexicanos Refinacion v. M/T KING A, 554 F.3d 99 (3d Cir. 2009). So Ordered by Judge Esther Salas on 2/28/2022. (ek)
February 25, 2022 Filing 5 Proposed Order of In Rem Vessel Arrest by AIT WORLDWIDE LOGISTICS, INC., TOPOCEAN CONSOLIDATION SERVICE (LOS ANGELES) INC., WORLDBRIDGE LOGISTICS, INC. re #1 Complaint,. (WRIGHT, GEORGE)
February 25, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WORLDBRIDGE LOGISTICS, INC. identifying V. ALEXANDER AND CO., INC. as Corporate Parent.. (WRIGHT, GEORGE)
February 25, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TOPOCEAN CONSOLIDATION SERVICE (LOS ANGELES) INC. identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (WRIGHT, GEORGE)
February 25, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AIT WORLDWIDE LOGISTICS, INC. identifying AIT WORLDWIDE LOGISTICS INTERMEDIARY HOLDINGS, INC. as Corporate Parent.. (WRIGHT, GEORGE)
February 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HAPAG-LLOYD AG, HMM CO. LTD., M/V ONE APUS in rem, OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE. LTD., SHIPCO TRANSPORT, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13213541), filed by AIT WORLDWIDE LOGISTICS, INC., WORLDBRIDGE LOGISTICS, INC., TOPOCEAN CONSOLIDATION SERVICE (LOS ANGELES) INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Schedule A, #3 Schedule B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(WRIGHT, GEORGE)
February 25, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AIT WORLDWIDE LOGISTICS, INC. et al v. M/V ONE APUS in rem et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMM CO. LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V ONE APUS in rem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN NETWORK EXPRESS PTE. LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HYUNDAI MERCHANT MARINE CO., LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAPAG-LLOYD AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHIPCO TRANSPORT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIT WORLDWIDE LOGISTICS, INC.
Represented By: GEORGE W. WRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOPOCEAN CONSOLIDATION SERVICE (LOS ANGELES) INC.
Represented By: GEORGE W. WRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WORLDBRIDGE LOGISTICS, INC.
Represented By: GEORGE W. WRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?