SCHULMAN v. ZOETIS, INC.
Plaintiff: FRANCES YVONNE SCHULMAN
Defendant: ZOETIS, INC. and ZOETIS REFERENCE LABS, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv01351
Filed: March 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael E Farbiarz
Referring Judge: Julien Xavier Neals
2 Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 203 Equal Pay Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STATUS REPORT in advance of the October 5, 2023 Status Conference by FRANCES YVONNE SCHULMAN. (SALWEN, JULIE)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STATUS REPORT in advance of the October 5, 2023 Status Conference by All Defendants. (CINO, ROBERT)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 LETTER ORDER withdrawing the pro hac vice admission of Sunu Chandy. SUNU CHANDY terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/2/2023. (sm)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by SUNU CHANDY. (SALWEN, JULIE)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by ZOETIS REFERENCE LABS, LLC, ZOETIS, INC..(CINO, ROBERT)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 7/19/2023. (sm)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Letter from Robert J. Cino, Esq.. (CINO, ROBERT)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 OPINON AND ORDER denying #62 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; the denial of the motion is without prejudice to the Defendants' New Jersey versus New Hampshire choice of law argument being made later, in the context of a summary judgment motion, after discovery is fully complete. Signed by Judge Michael E. Farbiarz on 7/14/2023. (sm)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Michael E. Farbiarz for all further proceedings. Judge Julien Xavier Neals no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 6/13/23. (ak, )
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 6/8/2023. (lag, )
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Status Conference held on 6/8/2023. (LM, )
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STATUS REPORT in Advance of the June 8, 2023 Status Conference by FRANCES YVONNE SCHULMAN. (SALWEN, JULIE)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STATUS REPORT in Advance of the June 8, 2023 Status Conference by All Defendants. (CINO, ROBERT)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ZOETIS REFERENCE LABS, LLC, ZOETIS, INC. re #62 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Partial) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CINO, ROBERT)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by FRANCES YVONNE SCHULMAN re #62 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Partial) (SALWEN, JULIE)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Rachel Smith to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SALWEN, JULIE)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee: $150.00, receipt number NEW48253 as to RACHEL SMITH. (ps)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #64 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rachel Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 5/8/2023. (sm)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #64 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rachel Smith of National Womens Law Center. Motion set for 6/5/2023 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 CERTIFICATION in Support filed by FRANCES YVONNE SCHULMAN re #64 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rachel Smith of National Womens Law Center with attached proposed order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SALWEN, JULIE)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 CERTIFICATION in Support filed by FRANCES YVONNE SCHULMAN re #64 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rachel Smith of National Womens Law Center of Julie Salwen (SALWEN, JULIE)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 CERTIFICATION in Support filed by FRANCES YVONNE SCHULMAN re #64 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rachel Smith of National Womens Law Center by Rachel Smith (SALWEN, JULIE)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rachel Smith of National Womens Law Center by FRANCES YVONNE SCHULMAN. (SALWEN, JULIE)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #62 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Partial). Motion set for 6/5/2023 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #62 by FRANCES YVONNE SCHULMAN. (SALWEN, JULIE)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #62 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Partial). Motion set for 5/15/2023 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Partial) by ZOETIS REFERENCE LABS, LLC, ZOETIS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law, #2 Certification Robert J. Cino, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Certification Ivelisse Williams, #5 Certification David Gardner, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(CINO, ROBERT)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #61 submitted by ZOETIS REFERENCE LABS, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/2/2023. (sm)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Zoetis Reference Labs, LLC. Attorney ROBERT JUDE CINO for ZOETIS REFERENCE LABS, LLC added. (CINO, ROBERT)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT that Counsel for Defendants hereby accepts service of the summons and First Amended Complaint on behalf of Defendant Zoetis Reference Labs, LLC, and waives any objections based on defects in that service on behalf of both Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 4/5/2023. (sm) Modified on 4/20/2023 (jmh).
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Letter from Robert J. Cino, Esq. re #54 Scheduling Order,,. (CINO, ROBERT)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ZOETIS REFERENCE LABS, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Zoetis, Inc.. Attorney ROBERT JUDE CINO for ZOETIS, INC. added. (CINO, ROBERT)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #57 submitted by ZOETIS, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/21/2023. (sm)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION re #52 Amended Complaint -- Stipulation of Service on Defendant Zoetis Reference Labs, LLC by FRANCES YVONNE SCHULMAN. (SALWEN, JULIE)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Request for Summons to be Issued by FRANCES YVONNE SCHULMAN as to ZOETIS REFERENCE LABS, LLC. (SALWEN, JULIE)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER AND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER that the parties are directed to meet and confer regarding defendants application to compel authorizations for the release of plaintiffs medical records relating to emotional distress. The parties shall file a joint letter on or before April 5, 2023 informing the Court whether the issue has been resolved by stipulation or requires adjudication; a Telephone Status Conference is set for 6/8/2023 at 2:00 PM; fact discovery is extended for a final time through 7/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 3/28/2023. (sm)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Status Conference held on 3/28/2023. (ECR) (LM).
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 TEXT ORDER - The Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff on March 24, 2023 (ECF No. #52 ), supersedes the prior Complaint (ECF No. #1 ) and renders the Motion to Dismiss filed on June 6, 2022 (ECF No. #14 ) moot. Accordingly, Defendant Zoetis Reference Labs, LLCs Motion to Dismiss at ECF No. #14 is hereby DISMISSED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Julien Xavier Neals on 3/27/2023. (kd)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ZOETIS, INC., ZOETIS REFERENCE LABS, LLC, filed by FRANCES YVONNE SCHULMAN.(SALWEN, JULIE)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STATUS REPORT by FRANCES YVONNE SCHULMAN. (SALWEN, JULIE)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STATUS REPORT by ZOETIS, INC.. (CINO, ROBERT)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #46 Motion to Amend the Complaint on or before 3/24/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 3/20/2023. (sm)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #46 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint and file First Amended Complaint. Motion set for 4/3/2023 before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by FRANCES YVONNE SCHULMAN re #46 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint and file First Amended Complaint (SALWEN, JULIE)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 CERTIFICATION in support filed by FRANCES YVONNE SCHULMAN re #46 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint and file First Amended Complaint Declaration of Julie Salwen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amendments to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order)(SALWEN, JULIE) Modified on 3/14/2023 (lag, ).
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint and file First Amended Complaint by FRANCES YVONNE SCHULMAN. (SALWEN, JULIE)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER that any request for leave to file a motion to add new parties or amend pleadings, whether by amended or third-party complaint, must be filed not later than 3/10/2023; the parties shall appear for a Telephonic Status Conference on 3/28/2023 at 2:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 2/15/2023. (sm)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Status Conference held on 2/14/2023. (LM, )
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STATUS REPORT in advance of Court conference by FRANCES YVONNE SCHULMAN. (SALWEN, JULIE)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Letter from Robert J. Cino, Esq. to Judge Wettre re status letter in advance of conference. (CINO, ROBERT)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 LETTER ORDER that Phoebe Wolfe is withdrawn as attorney pro hac vice. PHOEBE WOLFE terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/20/2023. (sm)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Letter from David Harrison Esq. (HARRISON, DAVID)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TEXT ORDER - The Court will address plaintiff's request to extend the deadline for amended pleadings (ECF No. 39) at the telephone conference before the undersigned on February 14, 2023 at 2:30 p.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/18/2023. (rn)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Pleadings by FRANCES YVONNE SCHULMAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SALWEN, JULIE)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Letter from Robert J. Cino to Judge Neals regarding Plaintiff's letter in further support of their opposition to Defendants' MTD re #37 Response in Opposition to Motion,. (CINO, ROBERT)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by FRANCES YVONNE SCHULMAN re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint - Letter Alerting Court to Recent Decision that Supports Plaintiff's Arguments in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (SALWEN, JULIE)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney KELLY ROSE ANDERSON terminated. Attorney CODY C HUBBS for ZOETIS, INC. added.. (CINO, ROBERT)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 RULE 502(d) ORDER that nothing contained herein is intended to or shall serve to limit a partys right to conduct a review of documents, ESI or information (including metadata) for relevance, responsiveness and/or segregation of privileged and/or protected information before production. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/10/2022. (sm)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/10/2022. (sm)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Proposed Order Rule 502(d) and Discovery Confidentiality Orders by ZOETIS, INC.. (CINO, ROBERT)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/7/2022. (sm)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Status Conference held on 11/3/2022. (LM, )
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference set for November 3, 2022 will now proceed at 3:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Dial-in information for the conference is (888) 684-8852, access code 8948139. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/2/22. (LM, )
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Letter from David Harrison, Esq. (HARRISON, DAVID)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Letter from Robert J. Cino, Esq.. (CINO, ROBERT)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ZOETIS, INC. re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CINO, ROBERT)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 7/18/2022. (sm)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/18/2022. (LM, )
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Joint Discovery Plan by FRANCES YVONNE SCHULMAN.(SALWEN, JULIE)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Joint Discovery Plan by FRANCES YVONNE SCHULMAN.(SALWEN, JULIE)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 8/1/2022 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 LETTER ORDER Granting request for one cycle adjournment, to response to #14 Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Julien Xavier Neals on 7/7/2022. (JB, )
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion filed by ZOETIS, INC. re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (CINO, ROBERT)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by FRANCES YVONNE SCHULMAN re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (SALWEN, JULIE)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Letter from Robert J. Cino, Esq. re #18 Scheduling Order. (CINO, ROBERT)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 7/18/2022 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(d)(5) by FRANCES YVONNE SCHULMAN. (HARRISON, DAVID)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by KELLY ROSE ANDERSON on behalf of ZOETIS, INC. (ANDERSON, KELLY)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 7/5/2022 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 LETTER ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 16.1 that an initial scheduling conference shall be conducted telephonically on 7/18/2022 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 6/7/2022. (sm)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by LINDA JOANNE POSLUSZNY on behalf of ZOETIS, INC. (POSLUSZNY, LINDA)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD J. CINO on behalf of ZOETIS, INC. (CINO, RICHARD)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ZOETIS, INC.. (CINO, ROBERT)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by ZOETIS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of law in support of Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Certification Certification of Ivelisse Williams, #3 Certification Certification of David Gardner, #4 Text of Proposed Order Order dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint, in part, #5 Certificate of Service Cert. of Service)(CINO, ROBERT)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #13 submitted by ZOETIS, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/6/2022. (sm)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney ROBERT JUDE CINO for ZOETIS, INC. added. (CINO, ROBERT)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Hugh Baran, Patricia Kakalec. Phoebe Wolfe, Sunu Chandy, Gaylynn Burroughs, and Emily Martin : $ 900, receipt number TRE125771 (jdg, )
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Emily Martin to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SALWEN, JULIE)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Patricia Kakalec to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SALWEN, JULIE)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Sunu Chandy to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SALWEN, JULIE)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Gaylynn Burroughs to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SALWEN, JULIE)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Hugh Baran to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SALWEN, JULIE)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Phoebe Wolfe to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SALWEN, JULIE)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF HUGH BARAN, PATRICIA KAKALEC, PHOEBE WOLFE, SUNU CHANDY, GAYLYNN BURROUGHS, AND EMILY MARTIN PRO HAC VICE, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 4/5/2022. (lag, )
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FRANCES YVONNE SCHULMAN. ZOETIS, INC. waiver sent on 3/22/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (HARRISON, DAVID)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #4 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 4/18/2022 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Julie Salwen, #2 Declaration of Hugh Baran, #3 Declaration of Patricia Kakalec, #4 Declaration of Phoebe Wolfe, #5 Declaration of Sunu Chandy, #6 Declaration of Gaylynn Burroughs, #7 Declaration of Emily Martin, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(SALWEN, JULIE)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ZOETIS, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JULIE SALWEN on behalf of FRANCES YVONNE SCHULMAN (SALWEN, JULIE)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ZOETIS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13252309) with JURY DEMAND, filed by FRANCES YVONNE SCHULMAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(HARRISON, DAVID)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Julien Xavier Neals and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCHULMAN v. ZOETIS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCES YVONNE SCHULMAN
Represented By: JULIE SALWEN
Represented By: DAVID HARRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZOETIS, INC.
Represented By: ROBERT JUDE CINO
Represented By: KELLY ROSE ANDERSON
Represented By: CODY C HUBBS
Represented By: RICHARD J. CINO
Represented By: ROBERT J. CINO
Represented By: LINDA JOANNE POSLUSZNY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZOETIS REFERENCE LABS, LLC
Represented By: ROBERT J. CINO
Represented By: ROBERT JUDE CINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?