JBS Hair, Inc. v. SLI Production IW Corp.
Plaintiff: JBS Hair, Inc.
Defendant: SLI Production IW Corp.
Case Number: 2:2022cv01576
Filed: March 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2022 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Daniel Kent: $ 150, receipt number TRE126479 (jdg)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting the #54 , #56 Motion for the pro hac vice admission of Daniel Kent. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 5/4/2022. (qa, )
May 3, 2022 Filing 56 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel Kent by JBS Hair, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard C. Weinblatt, #2 Declaration of Daniel Kent, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(WEINBLATT, RICHARD)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 TEXT ORDER: The plaintiff's motion for admission pro hac vice (ECF No. #54 ) does not indicate whether defendant consents to such admission. The movant is ordered to file supplemental papers by May 4, 2022 that accord with paragraph 5 of the Court's # Civil Case Management Order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 4/27/2022. (sms)
April 27, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #54 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 6/6/2022 before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
April 26, 2022 Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by JBS Hair, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard C. Weinblatt, #2 Declaration of Daniel Kent, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(WEINBLATT, RICHARD)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on June 6, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and the access code is 310-0383#. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Discovery Plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan can be found # here. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 4/20/2022. (sms)
April 14, 2022 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT MARIO FANTONE on behalf of SLI Production IW Corp. (FANTONE, ROBERT)
April 6, 2022 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD CHARLES WEINBLATT on behalf of JBS Hair, Inc. (WEINBLATT, RICHARD)
April 5, 2022 Filing 50 Clerk's Letter: Attorney's is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorney's address. (ps)
March 22, 2022 Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (ps)
March 21, 2022 Filing 49 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:21-cv-01861. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER directing Clerk to transfer this action to the District of New Jersey. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 3/21/2022. (dob)
March 21, 2022 Case transferred electronically to District of USDC of New Jersey. (dob)
March 21, 2022 Civil Case Terminated. (dob)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #45 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Anthony J Dain. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 3/18/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(dob)
March 18, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #45 APPLICATION for Admission of Anthony J. Dain Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11657845).. Attorney Anthony J. Dain added appearing on behalf of SLI Production IW Corp. (gas)
March 17, 2022 Filing 46 NOTICE by JBS Hair, Inc. re #42 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, re Preference for Transfer to District of New Jersey (Kent, Daniel)
March 15, 2022 Filing 45 APPLICATION for Admission of Anthony J. Dain Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11657845).by SLI Production IW Corp.. (Trimble, Seth) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Motion to Correct Misnomer.The Court hereby orders that named Defendant SLI PRODUCTION IW CORP., LTD., shall be changed to SLI PRODUCTION CORP. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 3/14/2022. (dob)
March 11, 2022 Filing 43 Joint MOTION to Correct Misnomer by SLI Production IW Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Trimble, Seth)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 OPINION AND ORDER granting #14 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff JBS Hair, Inc.s amended complaint for improper venue. Plaintiff isDIRECTED to file a notice on the docket indicating its preference for adismissal or transfer, and if the latter, the proper judicial forum.Defendant may file a response within seven (7) days of service of thatnotice. Defendant notes its name is SLI Production Corp., not SLI Production IW Corp. (Dkt. 14 at 1 n.1.) The Court ORDERS the parties to file a motion to correct misnomer within seven (7) days after entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 3/4/2022. (dob) Modified on 3/4/2022 to edit text (dob).
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #35 Motion to Stay pendingde terminationon the Motions to Dismiss and Motions to Transfer. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/12/2022. (dob)
January 12, 2022 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Defendant's Preliminary Proposed Constructions of Patent Terms by SLI Production IW Corp..(Trimble, Seth)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MODIFIED SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #34 Joint MOTION to Amend #17 Scheduling Order, Claim Construction Discovery ends on 2/3/2022. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/11/2022. (dob)
January 10, 2022 Filing 38 REPLY BRIEF re #35 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Motion to Transfer filed by SLI Production IW Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brianna Kadjo)(Nixon, Coby)
January 7, 2022 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Preliminary Proposed Claim Constructions and Identification of Intrinsic and Extrinsic Evidence by JBS Hair, Inc..(Marbutt, Olivia)
January 5, 2022 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Motion to Transfer filed by JBS Hair, Inc.. (Marbutt, Olivia)
December 22, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Motion to Transfer with Brief In Support by SLI Production IW Corp.. (Nixon, Coby)
December 10, 2021 Submission of #34 Joint MOTION to Amend #17 Scheduling Order to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (jpk)
November 22, 2021 Filing 34 Joint MOTION to Amend #17 Scheduling Order, by SLI Production IW Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nixon, Coby)
November 11, 2021 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re List of Claim Terms for Construction Pursuant to Patent L.R. 6.1(a) by SLI Production IW Corp..(Trimble, Seth)
November 9, 2021 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re List of Claim Terms for Construction Pursuant to Patent L.R. 6.1(a) by JBS Hair, Inc..(Kent, Daniel)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #27 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Brianna Kadjo. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 10/19/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(dob)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Maria Stubbings. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 10/19/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(dob)
October 18, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #28 APPLICATION for Admission of Maria Stubbings Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11321015). Attorney Maria Stubbings added appearing on behalf of SLI Production IW Corp. (cdg)
October 18, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #27 APPLICATION for Admission of Brianna Kadjo Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11321006). Attorney Brianna Kadjo added appearing on behalf of SLI Production IW Corp. (cdg)
October 12, 2021 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Improper Venue filed by SLI Production IW Corp.. (Trimble, Seth)
October 12, 2021 Filing 28 APPLICATION for Admission of Maria Stubbings Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11321015).by SLI Production IW Corp.. (Nixon, Coby) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 12, 2021 Filing 27 APPLICATION for Admission of Brianna Kadjo Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11321006).by SLI Production IW Corp.. (Nixon, Coby) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 5, 2021 Submission of #14 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Improper Venue, to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (dob)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Dennis Hopkins. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 10/4/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(dob)
September 29, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #25 APPLICATION for Admission of Dennis Hopkins Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11287321). Attorney Dennis Hopkins added appearing on behalf of SLI Production IW Corp. (cdg)
September 27, 2021 Filing 25 APPLICATION for Admission of Dennis Hopkins Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11287321).by SLI Production IW Corp.. (Nixon, Coby) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 13, 2021 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Improper Venue filed by JBS Hair, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A-V)(Marbutt, Olivia)
August 26, 2021 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service for Defendant's Initial Disclosures by SLI Production IW Corp..(Nixon, Coby)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2021. (dgs) (ADI)
August 25, 2021 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by JBS Hair, Inc..(Kent, Daniel)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to file Response and Reply to #14 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Improper Venue. Deadline for Response 9/13/201; Reply 10/1/2021. Defendnat's Response to Infringement Contentions and Invalidity Contentions due 10/1/2021. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/23/2021. (dob)
August 19, 2021 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve LPR 4.2 and 4.3 Contentions, and to File Response and Reply Briefs re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Improper Venue , Filed With Consent of All Parties by JBS Hair, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kent, Daniel)
August 12, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Disclosure of Preliminary Infringement Contentions by JBS Hair, Inc..(Kent, Daniel)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #16 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. This case is assigned to an eight-month discovery track. Within fourteen (14) days after the Courts ruling on Defendants #14 Motion to Dismiss, the parties must file an amended joint preliminary report and discovery plan as required by the Courts Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/12/2021. (dob)
August 11, 2021 Filing 16 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by JBS Hair, Inc.. (Kent, Daniel)
August 10, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE Of Filing Exhibit A to the Declaration of Chul K. Park by SLI Production IW Corp. re #14 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Improper Venue (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - sunssc.com web page)(Nixon, Coby)
August 9, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Improper Venue with Brief In Support by SLI Production IW Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Declaration of Chul K. Park)(Nixon, Coby)
July 28, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth Kincaid Trimble on behalf of SLI Production IW Corp. (Trimble, Seth)
July 26, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by JBS Hair, Inc.. (Kent, Daniel)
July 26, 2021 Filing 11 First AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against SLI Production IW Corp.with Jury Demand filed by JBS Hair, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Pat No 10,945,478, #2 Exhibit B - US Pat No 10,980,301, #3 Exhibit C - '478 Patent Claim Chart, #4 Exhibit D - '301 Patent Claim Chart)(Kent, Daniel) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) denying as moot Defendant's #10 Motion to Dismiss in the light of Plaintiff's #11 First Amended Complaint. Ordered by Judge Michael L. Brown on 7/26/2021. (bgt)
July 12, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue with Brief In Support by SLI Production IW Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Declaration of Chul K. Park)(Nixon, Coby)
June 30, 2021 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Persons by SLI Production IW Corp.. (Nixon, Coby)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, SLI Production IW Corp. Answer due 7/12/2021. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 6/3/2021. (dob)
June 2, 2021 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by SLI Production IW Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nixon, Coby)
June 2, 2021 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by JBS Hair, Inc.. SLI Production IW Corp. served on 5/14/2021, answer due 6/4/2021. (Kent, Daniel)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/11/2021. (bgt)
May 5, 2021 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to SLI Production IW Corp. (rvb)
May 4, 2021 Filing 3 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (rvb)
May 4, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JBS Hair, Inc.(rvb)
May 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by JBS Hair, Inc. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-10952051) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A US Pat No 10,945,478, #2 Exhibit B US Pat No 10,980,301, #3 C '478 Patent Claim Chart, #4 D '301 Patent Claim Chart, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(rvb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Attachments 1-4 replaced on 5/5/2021) (rvb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JBS Hair, Inc. v. SLI Production IW Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JBS Hair, Inc.
Represented By: RICHARD CHARLES WEINBLATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLI Production IW Corp.
Represented By: ROBERT MARIO FANTONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?