ROBERTS v. ALARIS HEALTH AT HAMILTON PARK et al
Plaintiff: DARYL ROBERTS and ESTATE OF CHERYL ROBERTS,
Defendant: ALARIS HEALTH AT HAMILTON PARK, ALARIS HEALTH, LLC and JOHN DOES 1-10
Case Number: 2:2022cv02298
Filed: April 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Andre M Espinosa
Referring Judge: Julien Xavier Neals
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Tort/Non-Motor Vehic
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2022 Filing 12 Letter from Defendants, Alaris Health at Hamilton Park and Alaris Health, LLC re #8 MOTION to Remand . (MILLER, MALINDA)
June 6, 2022 Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Remand . Motion reset for 7/5/2022 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, )
June 2, 2022 Filing 11 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by ALARIS HEALTH AT HAMILTON PARK, ALARIS HEALTH, LLC re #8 MOTION to Remand (MILLER, MALINDA)
May 24, 2022 Filing 10 Letter from Derek S. Fanciullo, Esq.. (FANCIULLO, DEREK)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LETTER ORDER - In the interest of efficient case management, Defendants' Motions to Dismiss [ECF No. 7] is hereby administratively terminated pending resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand [ECF No. 8]. Should the Motion to Remand be denied, Defendants may file a letter on the Court's docket requesting that their Motion to Dismiss be reinstated.. Signed by Judge Julien Xavier Neals on 5/23/2022. (ld, )
May 23, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 6/21/2022 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, )
May 22, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by DARYL ROBERTS. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Brief - Exhibits A-X, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(FANCIULLO, DEREK)
May 18, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 6/21/2022 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, )
May 17, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by ALARIS HEALTH AT HAMILTON PARK, ALARIS HEALTH, LLC. Responses due by 6/7/2022 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of Malinda A. Miller, Esq., #3 Exhibit A - Complaint, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(MILLER, MALINDA)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER - As requested in D.E. 5, Defendants Alaris Health at HamiltonPark and Alaris Health, LLC shall have until May 18, 2022, to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 5/9/2022. (jis)
May 5, 2022 Filing 5 Letter from Defendants enclosing proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Order for extension of time to answer, move or otherwise reply)(MARTINO, SALVATORE)
May 4, 2022 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ALARIS HEALTH, LLC, ALARIS HEALTH AT HAMILTON PARK has been DENIED as time to answer has expired. (ams, )
May 3, 2022 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (MARTINO, SALVATORE)
April 20, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by SALVATORE CHRISTOPHER MARTINO on behalf of ALARIS HEALTH AT HAMILTON PARK, ALARIS HEALTH, LLC (MARTINO, SALVATORE)
April 20, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALARIS HEALTH AT HAMILTON PARK, ALARIS HEALTH, LLC. (MILLER, MALINDA)
April 20, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ALARIS HEALTH, LLC, ALARIS HEALTH AT HAMILTON PARK from Superior Court of New Jersey - Hudson County, case number HUD-L-00930-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13350418), filed by ALARIS HEALTH, LLC, ALARIS HEALTH AT HAMILTON PARK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Statement of Interest, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certification Notice of Filing in State Court)(MILLER, MALINDA)
April 20, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Julien Xavier Neals and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROBERTS v. ALARIS HEALTH AT HAMILTON PARK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARYL ROBERTS
Represented By: WILLIAM C. MATSIKOUDIS
Represented By: DEREK SCOTT FANCIULLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF CHERYL ROBERTS,
Represented By: WILLIAM C. MATSIKOUDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALARIS HEALTH AT HAMILTON PARK
Represented By: SALVATORE CHRISTOPHER MARTINO
Represented By: MALINDA A. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALARIS HEALTH, LLC
Represented By: SALVATORE CHRISTOPHER MARTINO
Represented By: MALINDA A. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?