UNITED STEEL WORKERS OF AMERICA, AFL/CIO-CLC v. INTERNATIONAL MATEX TANK TERMINALS
Plaintiff: UNITED STEEL WORKERS OF AMERICA, AFL/CIO-CLC
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL MATEX TANK TERMINALS
Case Number: 2:2022cv02491
Filed: April 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jose R Almonte
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2022 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNITED STEEL WORKERS OF AMERICA, AFL/CIO-CLC. INTERNATIONAL MATEX TANK TERMINALS waiver sent on 5/4/2022, answer due 7/5/2022. (TYKULSKER, DAVID)
May 2, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to INTERNATIONAL MATEX TANK TERMINALS. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
April 28, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. (ak, )
April 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against INTERNATIONAL MATEX TANK TERMINALS ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13372591), filed by UNITED STEEL WORKERS OF AMERICA, AFL/CIO-CLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(TYKULSKER, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STEEL WORKERS OF AMERICA, AFL/CIO-CLC v. INTERNATIONAL MATEX TANK TERMINALS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STEEL WORKERS OF AMERICA, AFL/CIO-CLC
Represented By: DAVID TYKULSKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL MATEX TANK TERMINALS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?