UNITED MERCHANT SERVICES, INC et al v. ROYAL WESTERN COMPUTER, INC et al
Plaintiff: UNITED MERCHANT SERVICES, INC and BLUU, INC
Defendant: ROYAL WESTERN COMPUTER, INC, TOMORROW POS, INC and JONG S LIM
Case Number: 2:2022cv04791
Filed: July 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jose R Almonte
Referring Judge: Katharine S Hayden
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2022 Filing 24 Letter from Jonathan F. Donath, Esq.. (DONATH, JONATHAN)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs' extension request (D.E. 22) regarding the briefing schedule on defendants motion to dismiss (D.E. 13) is granted. The Rule 16 conference before Judge Almonte shall nonetheless proceed as scheduled on November 3, 2022. So Ordered by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 9/19/22. (cm, )
September 16, 2022 Filing 22 Letter from Jonathan F. Donath, Esq.. (DONATH, JONATHAN)
September 14, 2022 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by JONG S LIM, ROYAL WESTERN COMPUTER, INC, TOMORROW POS, INC re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason Champion with Exhibits A-G, #2 Declaration of Jong Soo Lim with Exhibits H-Q, #3 Declaration of Muhammad Tariq with Exhibit R, #4 Declaration of YongSeung Kim, #5 Declaration of Jong Suk Lee, #6 Declaration of David Yun, #7 Certificate of Service)(BETZ, CYNTHIA)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 LETTER ORDER granting #19 Defendants' Letter requesting permission to file an over-length brief of 45 pages. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 9/13/2022. (wh)
September 13, 2022 Filing 19 Letter from Defendants to Hon. Katharine S. Hayden, U.S.D.J. re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (BETZ, CYNTHIA)
September 12, 2022 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JASON CHAMPION and JON W. GURKA, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ams, )
September 9, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN EDMUND FLAHERTY on behalf of JONG S LIM, ROYAL WESTERN COMPUTER, INC, TOMORROW POS, INC (FLAHERTY, JOHN)
September 9, 2022 Filing 17 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jason Champion to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13680576.) (BETZ, CYNTHIA)
September 9, 2022 Filing 16 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jon Gurka to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13680566.) (BETZ, CYNTHIA)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jon Gurka, Esq. and Jason Champion, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 9/8/2022. (sm)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LETTER ORDER Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.1. On 11/3/2022 at 3:30 PM there shall be an Initial Scheduling Conference before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 9/7/2022. (smf)
September 2, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 10/3/2022 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
September 1, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by JONG S LIM, ROYAL WESTERN COMPUTER, INC, TOMORROW POS, INC. Responses due by 9/19/2022 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(BETZ, CYNTHIA)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendants' adjournment request (ECF No. 10) regarding the pending motion for a preliminary injunction at ECF No. 8. The request is granted. Additionally, the parties shall meet and confer and, no later than September 23, 2022, submit a proposed schedule for the filing of defendants' answer, motion, or other response to the complaint. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 9/1/2022. (smf)
August 31, 2022 Filing 11 Letter from Defendants to Hon. Jose R. Almonte, U.S.M.J., re PHV admissions. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Cynthia Betz, #2 Certification of Jon Gurka, #3 Certification of Jason Champion, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(BETZ, CYNTHIA) Modified on 9/8/2022 (smf).
August 31, 2022 Filing 10 Letter from Defendants to Hon. Jos R. Almonte, U.S.M.J. re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (BETZ, CYNTHIA)
August 31, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by CYNTHIA STENCEL BETZ on behalf of JONG S LIM, ROYAL WESTERN COMPUTER, INC, TOMORROW POS, INC (BETZ, CYNTHIA)
August 26, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by BLUU, INC, UNITED MERCHANT SERVICES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion, #2 Certification of Seung Ho Park, #3 Certification of Jay Yoon, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(DONATH, JONATHAN)
August 26, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion set for 9/19/2022 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
August 4, 2022 Filing 7 AO121 Copyright Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Exhibits) (qa, )
August 3, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITED MERCHANT SERVICES, INC. (DONATH, JONATHAN)
August 3, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BLUU, INC. (DONATH, JONATHAN)
July 29, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JONG S LIM, ROYAL WESTERN COMPUTER, INC, TOMORROW POS, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
July 28, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN TAUB on behalf of All Plaintiffs (TAUB, BENJAMIN)
July 28, 2022 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by UNITED MERCHANT SERVICES, INC, BLUU, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Royal Western Computers Business Search in Georgia, #2 Exhibit B - Tomorrow POS, Inc. Business Search in Georgia, #3 Exhibit C - December 11, 2017 Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Certificate of Registration, #5 Exhibit E - February 14, 2022 Termination Letter)(DONATH, JONATHAN)
July 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13593431), filed by UNITED MERCHANT SERVICES, INC, BLUU, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Royal Western Computers Business Search in Georgia, #2 Exhibit B - Tomorrow POS, Inc. Business Search in Georgia, #3 Exhibit C - December 11, 2017 Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Certificate of Registration, #5 Exhibit E - February 14, 2022 Termination Letter, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(DONATH, JONATHAN)
July 28, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Katharine S. Hayden and Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED MERCHANT SERVICES, INC et al v. ROYAL WESTERN COMPUTER, INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED MERCHANT SERVICES, INC
Represented By: BENJAMIN TAUB
Represented By: JONATHAN F. DONATH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLUU, INC
Represented By: BENJAMIN TAUB
Represented By: JONATHAN F. DONATH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROYAL WESTERN COMPUTER, INC
Represented By: CYNTHIA STENCEL BETZ
Represented By: JOHN EDMUND FLAHERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOMORROW POS, INC
Represented By: CYNTHIA STENCEL BETZ
Represented By: JOHN EDMUND FLAHERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONG S LIM
Represented By: CYNTHIA STENCEL BETZ
Represented By: JOHN EDMUND FLAHERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?