LIVEUNIVERSE, INC. v. MUIJRERS et al
Plaintiff: LIVEUNIVERSE and LIFEUNIVERSE, INC.
Defendant: RENE MUIJRERS, ICONV SPRL, Techie Hosting Inc., VIRALHOG LLC, CHRISTOPHER VANDEVYVER, IVAN RUSSO, THEODORA HATZIKOSTAS, BRENT MAGGIO, KMMT LLC, RYAN BARTHOLOMEW and WAYNE ANASTASIAS
Case Number: 2:2022cv04918
Filed: August 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 LETTER ORDER that Plaintiff's counsel shall file a Motion to Withdraw by May 30, 2023. Plaintiff shall file its responses to the pending Motions to Dismiss by July 6, 2023.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/23/2023. (ld)
May 22, 2023 Filing 43 Letter from Howard Gutman. (GUTMAN, HOWARD)
May 8, 2023 Reset Deadlines as to #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and in the alternative for failure to state a claim, entire controversy, improper venue, improper dreivative suit, #40 MOTION to Dismiss , #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction /ineffective service of process. Motion set for 6/20/2023 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
May 7, 2023 Filing 42 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by LIFEUNIVERSE, INC. re #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and in the alternative for failure to state a claim, entire controversy, improper venue, improper dreivative suit, #40 MOTION to Dismiss , #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction /ineffective service of process (GUTMAN, HOWARD)
April 25, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and in the alternative for failure to state a claim, entire controversy, improper venue, improper dreivative suit. Motion set for 6/5/2023 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
April 24, 2023 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and in the alternative for failure to state a claim, entire controversy, improper venue, improper dreivative suit by RYAN BARTHOLOMEW, KMMT LLC, BRENT MAGGIO, VIRALHOG LLC. Responses due by 5/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration Declaration of Rehberger, #3 Exhibit Ex. A, #4 Exhibit Ex. B, #5 Exhibit Ex. C, #6 Exhibit Ex. D, #7 Exhibit Ex. E, #8 Exhibit Ex. F, #9 Exhibit Ex. G, #10 Exhibit Ex. H, #11 Exhibit Ex. I, #12 Exhibit Ex. J, #13 Exhibit Ex. K, #14 Exhibit Ex. L, #15 Exhibit Ex. M, #16 Exhibit Ex. N, #17 Exhibit Ex. O, #18 Exhibit Ex. P, #19 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Dismiss, #20 Certificate of Service)(REHBERGER, JAMES)
April 24, 2023 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss by WAYNE ANASTASIAS, TECHIE HOSTING INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Victor A. Afanador with Exhibits, #3 Declaration of Wayne Anastasia, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(AFANADOR, VICTOR)
April 24, 2023 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction /ineffective service of process by ICONV SPRL, RENE MUIJRERS. Responses due by 5/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Declaration Declaration of Rene Muijrers, #4 Declaration Declaration of Nicholas A. Duston, Esq., #5 Exhibit Exhibits 1-23 to Duston Certification)(DUSTON, NICHOLAS)
April 24, 2023 Deadlines as to #40 MOTION to Dismiss , #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction /ineffective service of process. Motion set for 6/5/2023 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
March 27, 2023 Filing 38 Letter from Howard Gutman re #37 Order,. (GUTMAN, HOWARD)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 LETTER ORDER - Any motion by Plaintiff seeking leave to amend the Complaint shall be filed by March 24, 2023. If no motion to amend is filed, Defendants shall respond to the Complaint by April 24, 2023. All other deadlines in this matter shall remain stayed. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/22/2023. (ld, )
February 21, 2023 Filing 36 Letter from counsel for Viralhog, LLC,KMMT, LLC, Brent Maggio and Ryan Bartholomew. (REHBERGER, JAMES)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 LETTER ORDER: By no later than February 21, 2023, the parties are to submit a joint letter advising the Court of the status of this matter in light of the stipulation of dismissal filed in Civil Action. No. 21-20054 (ES)(JBC) Palisades Capital, Inc. v. Muijrers, et al.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/14/2023. (ld, )
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 LETTER ORDER: The deadline for the defendants, served or unserved, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is stayed pending disposition of the defendants' forthcoming motions to dismiss in Civil Action. No. 21-20054 (ES)(JBC) Palisades Capital, Inc. v. Muijrers, et al. The initial conference scheduled in this matter for January 25, 2023 at 11:30 AM is adjourned. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 1/23/2023. (ld, )
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 LETTER ORDER - All deadlines in this matter shall continue to be stayed pending further Order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 11/10/2022. (ld, )
November 9, 2022 Filing 32 Letter from counsel for Viralhog, LLC,KMMT, LLC, Brent Maggio and Ryan Bartholomew. (REHBERGER, JAMES)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 LETTER ORDER that the deadline for the defendants, served or unserved, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is stayed pending disposition of the plaintiff's forthcoming motion to amend in Civil Action. No. 21-20054 (ES)(JBC) Palisades Capital, Inc. v. Muijrers, et al. The pending motion to dismiss [Dkt. No. 7] is hereby ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATED. The defendants may request the reinstatement of their motion to dismiss via letter to the Court upon disposition of the aforementioned motion to amend.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 11/3/2022. (ld, )
November 2, 2022 Filing 30 Letter from Nicholas A. Duston, Esq. on behalf of ICONV Defendants re #25 Order, #29 Letter, #28 Order,. (DUSTON, NICHOLAS)
November 2, 2022 Filing 29 Letter from counsel for Viralhog, LLC,KMMT, LLC, Brent Maggio and Ryan Bartholomew re #27 Letter. (REHBERGER, JAMES)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 LETTER ORDER that the pending motion by Leslie Ann Farber, Esq. of Leslie A. Farber, LLC to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff in this matter [Dkt. No. 16] is hereby TERMINATED as moot in light of the substitution of counsel for Plaintiff filed on October 7, 2022 [Dkt. No. 23].. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 11/2/2022. (ld, )
November 2, 2022 Filing 27 Letter from Howard Gutman. (GUTMAN, HOWARD)
October 24, 2022 Filing 26 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Martin Rogers, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (REHBERGER, JAMES)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 LETTER ORDER setting deadline to answer; The stay of Defendants' time to respond to the Complaint [see Dkt. No. 22] is hereby lifted. Any defendants already served and/or appearing in this action shall respond to the Complaint within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/17/2022. (ld, )
October 13, 2022 Filing 24 Letter from Howard Gutman. (GUTMAN, HOWARD)
October 13, 2022 Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and in the alternative for failure to state a claim, entire controversy, improper venue, improper dreivative suit. Motion set for 11/21/2022 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
October 7, 2022 Filing 23 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney LESLIE ANN FARBER terminated. Attorney HOWARD A. GUTMAN added for Plaintiff LIFEUNIVERSE, INC. (FARBER, LESLIE) Modified on 10/11/2022 (dam).
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 LETTER ORDER - The deadline for Defendants to respond to the complaint is stayed pending further order of the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/6/2022. (ld, )
October 6, 2022 Filing 21 Letter from Counsel for Muijrers and ICONV to The Honorable James B. Clark, III,U.S.M.J.. (KARG, STEVEN)
October 6, 2022 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LIFEUNIVERSE, INC.. VIRALHOG LLC served on 8/10/2022, answer due 9/14/2022., Request for Summons to be Issued by LIFEUNIVERSE, INC. as to VIRALHOG LLC. (FARBER, LESLIE)
October 5, 2022 Filing 19 Letter from Victor A. Afanador to the Hon. James B. Clark, U.S.M.J. (AFANADOR, VICTOR)
October 5, 2022 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Martin Rogers $ 150, receipt number TRE128902 (jal, )
October 4, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Leslie A. Farber. Motion set for 11/7/2022 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
October 3, 2022 Filing 18 Letter from counsel for Viralhog, LLC,KMMT, LLC, Brent Maggio and Ryan Bartholomew. (REHBERGER, JAMES)
October 3, 2022 Filing 17 AMENDED DOCUMENT by LIFEUNIVERSE, INC.. Amendment to #16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Leslie A. Farber . (Attachments: #1 Brief)(FARBER, LESLIE)
October 3, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Leslie A. Farber by LIFEUNIVERSE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leslie A Farber, #2 Brief, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(FARBER, LESLIE)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference scheduled in Civil Action No. 22-4918 for November 15, 2022 at 11:30 AM is adjourned to 1/25/2023 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 9/21/2022. (ld, )
September 21, 2022 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ek)
September 20, 2022 Filing 14 Letter from Counsel for Muijrers and ICONV to The Honorable Esther Salas without prejudice to defenses (copy to Magistrate Judge James B. Clark re #10 Letter, #12 Letter. (KARG, STEVEN)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to MARTIN ROGERS,ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 9/19/2022. (ld, )
September 19, 2022 Filing 12 Letter from Victor A. Afanador to the Hon. Esther Salas, U.S.D.J.. (AFANADOR, VICTOR)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/15/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 9/19/2022. (seb)
September 16, 2022 Filing 10 Letter from Leslie A. Farber. (FARBER, LESLIE)
September 16, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice admission of Martin Rogers, Esq. by RYAN BARTHOLOMEW, KMMT LLC, BRENT MAGGIO, VIRALHOG LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of James S. Rehberger, Esq. in support of pro hac vice admission of Martin Rogers, #2 Affidavit Exh. A - Affidavit of Martin Rogers, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order admitting Martin Rogers pro hac vice, #4 Certificate of Service)(REHBERGER, JAMES)
September 16, 2022 Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motion reset for 11/7/2022 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (wh)
September 15, 2022 Filing 8 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by LIFEUNIVERSE, INC. re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and in the alternative for failure to state a claim, entire controversy, improper venue, improper dreivative suit (FARBER, LESLIE)
September 15, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motion set for 10/17/2022 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam)
September 14, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and in the alternative for failure to state a claim, entire controversy, improper venue, improper derivative suit by RYAN BARTHOLOMEW, KMMT LLC, BRENT MAGGIO, VIRALHOG LLC. Responses due by 10/3/2022 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James S. Rehberger, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Memorandum of Law, #18 Text of Proposed Order, #19 Certification of Service)(REHBERGER, JAMES) Modified on 9/15/2022 (dam).
August 31, 2022 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #6 submitted by VIRALHOG LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/14/2022. (sm)
August 30, 2022 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Viralhog, LLC, KMMT, LLC, Brent Maggio and Ryan Bartholomew. Attorney JAMES S. REHBERGER for RYAN BARTHOLOMEW,JAMES S. REHBERGER for KMMT LLC,JAMES S. REHBERGER for BRENT MAGGIO,JAMES S. REHBERGER for VIRALHOG LLC added. (REHBERGER, JAMES)
August 26, 2022 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 submitted by WAYNE ANASTASIAS, TECHIE HOSTING INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/19/2022. (sm)
August 23, 2022 Filing 5 Proposed Order RICO Case Order by LIFEUNIVERSE, INC.. (FARBER, LESLIE)
August 22, 2022 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Techie Hosting, Inc., and Wayne Anastasia. Attorney VICTOR A. AFANADOR,CATHERINE B. DERENZE for WAYNE ANASTASIAS,VICTOR A. AFANADOR,CATHERINE B. DERENZE for TECHIE HOSTING INC. added. (AFANADOR, VICTOR)
August 8, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to WAYNE ANASTASIAS, RYAN BARTHOLOMEW, THEODORA HATZIKOSTAS, ICONV SPRL, KMMT LLC, BRENT MAGGIO, RENE MUIJRERS, IVAN RUSSO, TECHIE HOSTING INC., CHRISTOPHER VANDEVYVER, VIRALHOG LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam)
August 4, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LIFEUNIVERSE, INC. (dam)
August 4, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (ak, )
August 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13609898) with JURY DEMAND, filed byLIFEUNIVERSE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-11, #2 Exhibit 12-32, #3 Exhibit 33-48, #4 Statement Corporate Disclosure FRCP 7.1)(FARBER, LESLIE) Modified on 8/8/2022 (dam).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LIVEUNIVERSE, INC. v. MUIJRERS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIVEUNIVERSE
Represented By: LESLIE ANN FARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIFEUNIVERSE, INC.
Represented By: LESLIE ANN FARBER
Represented By: HOWARD A. GUTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RENE MUIJRERS
Represented By: NICHOLAS A. DUSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICONV SPRL
Represented By: NICHOLAS A. DUSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Techie Hosting Inc.
Represented By: CATHERINE B. DERENZE
Represented By: VICTOR A. AFANADOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIRALHOG LLC
Represented By: JAMES S. REHBERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER VANDEVYVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IVAN RUSSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THEODORA HATZIKOSTAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENT MAGGIO
Represented By: JAMES S. REHBERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KMMT LLC
Represented By: JAMES S. REHBERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN BARTHOLOMEW
Represented By: JAMES S. REHBERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAYNE ANASTASIAS
Represented By: CATHERINE B. DERENZE
Represented By: VICTOR A. AFANADOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?