ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE INC. et al v. SCHOENFELD
Plaintiff: ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE INC. and ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE CORPORATION
Defendant: MATTHEW SCHOENFELD, SCOTT SCHOENFELD and MHS CONSULTING LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv07350
Filed: December 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
2 Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2023 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by APRIL CAMPOS on behalf of MHS CONSULTING LLC, MATTHEW SCHOENFELD, SCOTT SCHOENFELD (CAMPOS, APRIL)
October 31, 2023 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIGITTE M. GLADIS on behalf of MHS CONSULTING LLC, MATTHEW SCHOENFELD, SCOTT SCHOENFELD (GLADIS, BRIGITTE)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 90 LETTER ORDER that the 11/2/2023 telephone conference is adjourned to 12/14/2023 at 12:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/26/2023. (sm)
October 25, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the #89 Letter submitted by MARYANN STALLONE on 10/24/2023 was incorrectly submitted as a motion. The motion has been terminated. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. For future filings of this nature, please select the event "Letter" located in the Other Documents menu. This message is for informational purposes only. (lag, )
October 24, 2023 Filing 89 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE CORPORATION, ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE INC.. (STALLONE, MARYANN)
August 18, 2023 Filing 88 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by MHS CONSULTING LLC.(ISRAEL, RONALD)
August 18, 2023 Filing 87 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by SCOTT SCHOENFELD.(ISRAEL, RONALD)
August 8, 2023 Filing 86 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE CORPORATION, ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE INC.. MHS CONSULTING LLC waiver sent on 7/14/2023, answer due 9/12/2023; SCOTT SCHOENFELD waiver sent on 7/14/2023, answer due 9/12/2023. (LEONE, AMANDA)
July 21, 2023 Filing 85 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by All Plaintiffs. (LEONE, AMANDA)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 84 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 7/20/2023. (mxw)
July 18, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Scheduling Conference held on 7/18/2023. (seb)
July 17, 2023 Filing 83 Joint Discovery Plan by All Plaintiffs.(LEONE, AMANDA)
July 17, 2023 Filing 82 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by MATTHEW SCHOENFELD.(ISRAEL, RONALD)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to this Courts Order, dated April 25, 2023, (ECF No. 74), whereby the parties stipulated and agreed to resolve with prejudice Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Motion for an Order to Show Cause (Plaintiffs Motions), (ECF Nos. 4, 42), and to resolve certain claims as to be reflected in an Amended Complaint, which was subsequently filed on June 9, 2023, (ECF No. 78), Plaintiffs Motions are hereby terminated with prejudice. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on July 13, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 07/13/2023. (lr, )
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #63 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 7/12/2023. (mxw)
June 20, 2023 Clerk`s Text Order - The #79 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MATTHEW SCHOENFELD has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/7/2023. (mxw)
June 19, 2023 Filing 79 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to the First Amended Complaint.. (ISRAEL, RONALD)
June 9, 2023 Filing 78 AMENDED COMPLAINT against MATTHEW SCHOENFELD, SCOTT SCHOENFELD, MHS CONSULTING LLC, filed by ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE CORPORATION, ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE INC..(LEONE, AMANDA)
June 9, 2023 Filing 77 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney EVAN MARC LAZEROWITZ terminated. Attorney MARYANN C. STALLONE,AMANDA MARIE LEONE for ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE CORPORATION,MARYANN C. STALLONE,AMANDA MARIE LEONE for ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE INC. added.. (LEONE, AMANDA)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER that Plaintiff's deadline to file an amended complaint is extended by 21 days to 6/9/2023. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 5/22/2023. (mxw)
May 19, 2023 Filing 75 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order by ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE CORPORATION, ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE INC.. (LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION AND ORDER enjoining Defendant from reviewing, using, disclosing, or transmitting any of Plaintiffs confidential information and trade secrets. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 4/25/2023. (mxw)
April 24, 2023 Filing 73 STIPULATION and Proposed Order by ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE CORPORATION, ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE INC.. (LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)
April 11, 2023 Filing 72 Letter from Evan Lazerowitz regarding status of settlement discussions. (LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)
April 4, 2023 Filing 71 Letter from Evan M. Lazerowitz. (LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 LETTER ORDER adjourning the Initial Conference previously set for 4/13/2023 to 7/18/2023 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/30/2023. (mxw)
March 28, 2023 Filing 69 Letter from Evan M. Lazerowitz regarding status of settlement discussions. (LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)
March 21, 2023 Filing 68 Letter from Evan M. Lazerowitz regarding status of settlement discussions. (LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)
March 14, 2023 Filing 66 Letter from Evan M. Lazerowitz re 65 Order. (LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 TEXT ORDER: The hearing scheduled for April 3 2023 is cancelled. The parties shall meet and confer and submit 3 proposed dates to the court for the hearing. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 03/14/2023. (lr, )
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 TEXT ORDER: The parties are participating in mediation with retired Chief Judge Freda Wolfson and shall update the Court in due course. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 03/13/2023. (lr, )
March 13, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #63 MOTION to Seal . Motion set for 4/3/2023 before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mxw)
March 10, 2023 Filing 63 MOTION to Seal by ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE CORPORATION, ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Robert Booker in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Index in Support of Motion to Seal, #18 Text of Proposed Order)(LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)
March 6, 2023 Filing 62 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian R. Martinotti: Status Conference held on 3/6/2023, HEARING set for 4/3/2023 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 1 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti.). (Court Reporter, Tammera Witte (973-457-8230)) (lr, )
February 28, 2023 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/6/2023 02:00 PM before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Link to follow. (lr, )
February 27, 2023 Filing 61 Letter from Ronald L. Israel, Esq. re #60 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,,,,. (ISRAEL, RONALD)
February 24, 2023 Filing 60 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #42 MOTION for Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Steven A. Zuckerman in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Show Cause, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit Exhibit L)(LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 21, 2023 Filing 59 Letter from Evan Lazerowitz re 58 Order,,. (LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs letter [cm/ecf 57] in response to the courts text order [cm/ecf 55] that the parties submit agreed upon proposed dates to reschedule the telephone conference in this matter. Unfortunately, the court is not available on March 1st. The parties are hereby directed once again meet and confer and provide the court with agreed upon dates for a telephone conference in this matter after Tuesday, February 23, 2023. SO ORDERED by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 02/17/2023. (lr, )
February 17, 2023 Pro Hac Vice counsel, ADAM GERSHENSON, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mxw)
February 16, 2023 Filing 57 Letter from Evan M. Lazerowitz re 55 Order,. (LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)
February 16, 2023 Filing 56 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Adam Gershenson to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-14043199.) (LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendants letter [cm/ecf 52] requesting an adjournment of the telephone conference set for Friday, February 16th. Defendants requested is granted. The parties are hereby directed to meet and confer and provide the court with agreed upon dates for a telephone conference in this matter after Tuesday, February 23, 2023. SO ORDERED by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 02/16/2023. (lr, )
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/13/2023 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/13/2023. (seb)
February 15, 2023 Filing 53 ANSWER to Complaint by MATTHEW SCHOENFELD.(ISRAEL, RONALD)
February 15, 2023 Filing 52 Letter from Ronald L. Israel. (ISRAEL, RONALD)
February 15, 2023 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 2/17/2023 12:00 PM before Judge Brian R. Martinotti.. The parties are instructed to dial 1-888-684-8852 and enter Access Code 1852046# at the time of the Conference. (lr, )
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Leave for Adam S. Gershenson, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/14/2023. (mxw)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti for all further proceedings. Judge John Michael Vazquez no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 02/14/23. (aw, )
February 13, 2023 Filing 49 Letter from Ronald L. Israel. (ISRAEL, RONALD)
February 11, 2023 Filing 48 Letter from Evan Lazerowitz re #45 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joe Savarese, #2 Exhibit A: 5/24/22 Email, #3 Exhibit B: 5/31/22 Email, #4 Exhibit C: Message, #5 Exhibit D: 6/15/22 Email, #6 Exhibit E: 6/15/22 Message, #7 Declaration of John Knopf)(LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)
February 10, 2023 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by MATTHEW SCHOENFELD re #42 MOTION for Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ronald L. Israel, Esq., #2 Declaration of Matthew Schoenfeld, #3 Declaration of Scott Schoenfeld, #4 Declaration of John Grancarich)(ISRAEL, RONALD)
February 9, 2023 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE CORPORATION, ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE INC.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion of Pro Hac Vice Admission of Adam S. Gershenson, #2 Declaration of Evan M. Lazerowitz in Support, #3 Certification of Adam S. Gershenson in Support, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)
February 9, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #46 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 3/6/2023 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mxw, )
February 7, 2023 Filing 45 Letter from Ronald L. Israel. (ISRAEL, RONALD)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 TEXT ORDER: : The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Show Cause, D.E. #42 . Defendant's opposition is due on Friday, February 10, 2023. So Ordered by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 2/7/2023. (jr)
February 7, 2023 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #42 MOTION for Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Joseph D. Lockinger in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Show Cause, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit Exhibit R, #20 Declaration Declaration of John Herrema in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Show Cause, #21 Declaration Declaration of Stephen Kampf in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Show Cause, #22 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order to Show Cause)(LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 7, 2023 Filing 42 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by All Plaintiffs. (LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)
February 7, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #42 MOTION for Order to Show Cause . Motion set for 3/6/2023 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mxw, )
February 3, 2023 Filing 41 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Michael Berkovits to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-14006625.) (LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)
February 3, 2023 Pro Hac Vice counsel, MICHAEL BERKOVITS, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mxw, )
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Leave for Michael Berkovits, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/2/2023. (mxw)
February 2, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #39 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael Berkovits. Motion set for 3/6/2023 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mxw)
February 1, 2023 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael Berkovits by ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE CORPORATION, ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE INC.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion of Pro Hac Vice Admission of Michael Berkovits, #2 Declaration of Evan M. Lazerowitz in support, #3 Certification of Michael Berkovits in support, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER amending #24 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 1/18/2023. (mxw)
January 17, 2023 Filing 37 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE CORPORATION, ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE INC. re #33 MOTION for Reconsideration re #24 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Schoenfeld Answers to Plaintiffs Interrogatories)(LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)
January 13, 2023 Filing 36 BRIEF in Opposition filed by MATTHEW SCHOENFELD re #33 MOTION for Reconsideration re #24 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ronald L. Israel, Esq.)(ISRAEL, RONALD)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs letter, D.E. 34, requesting an expedited briefing schedule for Plaintiffs motion for reconsideration, D.E. 33. In light of the time-sensitive nature of the matter, Defendants opposition is due on Friday, January 13, 2023, and Plaintiffs reply is due on Tuesday, January 17, 2023. So Ordered by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 1/9/2023. (ro, )
January 6, 2023 Filing 34 Letter from Evan Lazerowitz re #33 MOTION for Reconsideration re #24 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Motion for Reconsideration, #2 Exhibit 2- Order)(LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)
January 6, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #33 MOTION for Reconsideration re #24 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction . Motion set for 2/6/2023 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mxw)
January 5, 2023 Filing 33 MOTION for Reconsideration re #24 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE CORPORATION, ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Reconsideration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 JOINT CONSENT ORDER setting expedited discovery schedule. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 1/4/2023. (mxw)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 1/4/2023. (mxw)
January 3, 2023 Filing 29 Letter from Evan M. Lazerowitz enclosing Joint Consent Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Consent Order)(LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)
January 3, 2023 Filing 28 Letter from Evan M. Lazerowitz to provide a proposed order regarding the confidential exchange of information. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Regarding the Confidential Exchange of Information, #2 Exhibit B - Redline [Proposed] Order)(LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)
January 3, 2023 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE INC., ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE CORPORATION. MATTHEW SCHOENFELD waiver sent on 12/17/2022, answer due 2/15/2023. (LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)
December 31, 2022 Filing 30 Transcript of Oral Argument held on December 22, 2022, before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Court Reporter: Lisa Larsen (973-776-7741). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter due, but not filed, by 1/23/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/31/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/31/2023. (adc)
December 22, 2022 Filing 26 Letter from Daniel D. Barnes, Esq. re #24 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #25 Letter. (BARNES, DANIEL)
December 22, 2022 Filing 25 Letter from Evan Lazerowitz re #24 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Document 4-14])(LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #4 Motion for TRO and Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 12/22/22. (ro, )
December 22, 2022 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held by telephone conference before Judge John Michael Vazquez: Motion Hearing held on 12/22/2022 re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE CORPORATION, ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE INC.. (Court Reporter, Lisa Larsen (973-776-7741)) (ro, )
December 22, 2022 Pro Hac Vice counsel, GERARD O'SHEA, STEVEN A. ZUCKERMAN and JOSEPH D. LOCKINGER, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mxw)
December 21, 2022 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by MATTHEW SCHOENFELD re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Brief in Opposition (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Grancarich, #2 Declaration of Ronald L. Israel, #3 Declaration of Matthew Schoenfeld)(ISRAEL, RONALD)
December 21, 2022 Filing 21 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Joseph D. Lockinger to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13912180.) (LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)
December 21, 2022 Filing 20 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Steven A. Zuckerman to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13912174.) (LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)
December 21, 2022 Filing 19 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Gerard O'Shea to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13912081.) (LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steven A. Zuckerman, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 12/20/2022. (mxw)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gerard OShea, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 12/20/2022. (mxw)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joseph D. Lockinger. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 12/20/2022. (mxw, )
December 20, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joseph D. Lockinger, #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steven A. Zuckerman, #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gerard O'Shea. Motion set for 1/17/2023 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mxw, )
December 20, 2022 Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction pursuant to the Court's TEXT ORDER at 15 . Motion set for 12/22/2022 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. (mxw)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction (D.E. 4). The Court held a telephone conference with counsel for the parties on December 19, 2022 as to the temporary restraints. As discussed during the telephone conference, Defendant shall submit its opposition to the motion for a temporary restraining order by the end of the day on December 21, 2022. The Court will hear the parties' arguments on the temporary restraints by telephone on December 22, 2022 at 2pm. So Ordered by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 12/19/2022. (ro, )
December 19, 2022 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held by telephone conference before Judge John Michael Vazquez: Status Conference held on 12/19/2022. (Court Reporter, Lisa Larsen (973-776-7741)) (ro, )
December 19, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steven A. Zuckerman by ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE CORPORATION, ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE INC.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion of Pro Hac Vice Admission for Steven A. Zuckerman, #2 Declaration Of Evan M. Lazerowitz in Support, #3 Certification of Steven A. Zuckerman in Support, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)
December 19, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gerard O'Shea by ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE CORPORATION, ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE INC.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion of Pro Hac Vice Admission for Gerard O'Shea, #2 Declaration Of Evan M. Lazerowitz in Support, #3 Certification of Gerard O'Shea in Support, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)
December 19, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joseph D. Lockinger by ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE CORPORATION, ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE INC.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion of Pro Hac Vice Admission for Joseph D. Lockinger, #2 Declaration Of Evan M. Lazerowitz in Support, #3 Certification of Joseph D. Lockinger in Support, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)
December 19, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK R. DWYER on behalf of MATTHEW SCHOENFELD (DWYER, PATRICK)
December 19, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL D. BARNES on behalf of MATTHEW SCHOENFELD (BARNES, DANIEL)
December 19, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL on behalf of MATTHEW SCHOENFELD (ISRAEL, RONALD)
December 19, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MATTHEW SCHOENFELD. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mxw, )
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: A telephone conference is scheduled in this matter for today, December 19, 2022 at 4:30 p.m. regarding the pending application for emergent relief. The court will provide counsel with dial-in information. So Ordered by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 12/19/2022. (ro, )
December 19, 2022 Filing 5 Letter from Evan Lazerowitz to Judge Michael Vazquez. (LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)
December 19, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion set for 1/17/2023 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mxw, )
December 18, 2022 Case assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (jr)
December 16, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE CORPORATION, ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE INC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Declaration of Christy Wyatt in Support, #3 Exhibit A to Wyatt Decl. - EEA, #4 Exhibit B to Wyatt Decl. - Cash Retention Award Agreement, #5 Exhibit C to Wyatt Decl. - Financial Analyst Day, #6 Exhibit D to Wyatt Decl. - GlobalData HelpSystems LLC Nov 17 2022, #7 Exhibit E to Wyatt Decl. - Cooley Correspondence Nov 18 2022, #8 Exhibit F to Wyatt Decl. - Cooley Correspondence Nov 23 2022, #9 Exhibit G to Wyatt Decl. - Response to Cease & Desist Letter, #10 Exhibit H to Wyatt Decl. - Nov 30 2022 Correspondence, #11 Declaration of Nicko Van Someren in Support, #12 Declaration of Robert Booker in Support, #13 Declaration of Stephen Kampf in Support, #14 Text of Proposed Order to Show Cause)(LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)
December 16, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by EVAN MARC LAZEROWITZ on behalf of ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE CORPORATION, ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE INC. (LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)
December 16, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE CORPORATION, ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE INC.. (LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)
December 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MATTHEW SCHOENFELD ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13902189), filed by ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE INC., ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEA, #2 Exhibit B - Cash Retention Award Agreement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(LAZEROWITZ, EVAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE INC. et al v. SCHOENFELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE INC.
Represented By: EVAN MARC LAZEROWITZ
Represented By: AMANDA MARIE LEONE
Represented By: MARYANN C. STALLONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABSOLUTE SOFTWARE CORPORATION
Represented By: EVAN MARC LAZEROWITZ
Represented By: MARYANN C. STALLONE
Represented By: AMANDA MARIE LEONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW SCHOENFELD
Represented By: DANIEL D. BARNES
Represented By: PATRICK R. DWYER
Represented By: RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL
Represented By: APRIL CAMPOS
Represented By: BRIGITTE M. GLADIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT SCHOENFELD
Represented By: RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL
Represented By: APRIL CAMPOS
Represented By: BRIGITTE M. GLADIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHS CONSULTING LLC
Represented By: RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL
Represented By: BRIGITTE M. GLADIS
Represented By: APRIL CAMPOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?