PRIDE FUNDING, LLC v. CRANFORD HARRISON DEVELOPERS LLC et al
Plaintiff: PRIDE FUNDING, LLC and PRIDE GROUP, LLC
Defendant: CRANFORD HARRISON DEVELOPERS LLC, ALEXANDER PAVLOVSKY and ANY UNKNOWN TENANTS OR OCCUPANTS
Case Number: 2:2022cv07471
Filed: December 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jessica S Allen
Referring Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444 Notice of Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER As per today's Telephone Status Conference and the parties' joint status letter of 6/16/23, (ECF No. 18), the parties shall continue to explore settlement discussions. The parties shall submit a joint letter on or before 7/7/23: (1) addressing whether a Settlement Conference is appropriate, (2) confirming that Plaintiff does not intend to pursue any further discovery in light of defense counsel's representations and that Defendants do not intend to conduct any discovery, and (3) setting forth any proposed briefing schedule for Plaintiff's anticipated motion for summary judgment. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 06/20/2023. (Allen, Jessica)
June 16, 2023 Filing 18 Letter from Kevin M. Capuzzi, Esq. and Jeffrey J. Brookner, Esq. re 17 Order,,. (CAPUZZI, KEVIN)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: As per today's Telephone Status Conference and the parties' joint status letter of 5/19/23, (ECF No. 16), the parties shall continue to engage in settlement discussions. The parties shall submit a joint letter on or before 6/15/23, setting forth the status of settlement discussions and/or whether Plaintiff seeks leave to move for Summary Judgment. A Telephone Status Conference is scheduled for 6/20/23 at 4:00 p.m. The Court will provide the Conference Call information in advance. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 5/31/23. (jbb)
May 31, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen: Telephone Status Conference held on 5/31/2023. (Court Reporter: None) (jbb)
May 19, 2023 Filing 16 Letter from Kevin M. Capuzzi, Esq. to the The Honorable Jessica S. Allen. (CAPUZZI, KEVIN)
May 15, 2023 Filing 15 Letter from Defendants' Counsel re 14 Order,,,, #13 Letter. (BROOKNER, JEFFREY)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's counsel's letter of 5/9/23, (ECF No. 13), asserting that Defendants have not served written discovery requests or responded to Plaintiffs previously served written discovery requests. Defense counsel is directed to file a response on or before 5/15/23. Further, it is unclear whether the parties have had a meaningful meet and confer to resolve these discovery issues. They are directed to immediately do so. The parties then shall submit a JOINT letter on or before 5/19/23, addressing whether they have resolved these discovery issues, and if not, identify what, if any, discovery issues remain. Counsel is reminded that no formal discovery motions may be filed without leave of court. The Telephone Status Conference scheduled for 5/16/23 at 1:30 p.m. is rescheduled for May 31, 2023 at 9:30 a.m. The Court will provide the Conference Call information in advance. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 5/11/23. (jbb)
May 9, 2023 Filing 13 Letter from Kevin M. Capuzzi regarding Status of Discovery. (CAPUZZI, KEVIN)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 3/9/2023. (sm)
March 8, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen: Zoom Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/8/2023. (Court Reporter: None) (jbb)
January 23, 2023 Filing 11 Certification of Damages Pursuant to D.N.J. L.R. 201.1(d)(3) on behalf of PRIDE FUNDING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CAPUZZI, KEVIN)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 3/8/2023 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 1/18/23. (jbb)
January 13, 2023 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CRANFORD HARRISON DEVELOPERS LLC. (BROOKNER, JEFFREY)
January 13, 2023 Filing 8 Contesting ANSWER to Complaint in Foreclosure by CRANFORD HARRISON DEVELOPERS LLC, ALEXANDER PAVLOVSKY.(BROOKNER, JEFFREY)
January 13, 2023 Filing 7 Letter from Kevin M. Capuzzi, Esq.. (CAPUZZI, KEVIN)
January 12, 2023 Filing 6 Letter from Defendants' Counsel re 4 Order,,,,,,,,. (BROOKNER, JEFFREY)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT ORDER granting #3 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint up to and including 1/15/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 1/4/2023. (sm)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: Based on this Court's review, the Notice of Removal pleads that the Court has Jurisdiction over this Civil Action, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332. (NOR 10). Further, the Complaint and Notice of Removal refer to Plaintiff Pride Funding LLC as a Citizen of New York. (NOR 5; Compl., 1). However, neither the Complaint nor the Notice of Removal mention the Citizenship of the individual members of Plaintiff Pride Funding, LLC. Likewise, the Notice of Removal refers to Defendant Cranford Harrison Developers LLC as a Citizen of Florida, (NOR 7), while the Complaint refers to Cranford Harrison Developers LLC as a Citizen of New Jersey (Compl., 2). However, neither the Complaint nor the Notice of Removal mention the Citizenship of the individual members of Cranford Harrison Developers LLC. Federal Courts have an independent obligation to raise issues of Subject Matter Jurisdiction sua sponte and may do so at any stage of the litigation. Bracken v. Matgouranis, 296 F.3d 160, 162 (3d Cir. 2002). "Complete diversity between all plaintiffs and all defendants" must exist. Lincoln Benefit Life Co. v. AEI Life, LLC, 800 F.3d 99, 104 (3d Cir. 2015) (internal citations omitted). "[T]he citizenship of an LLC is determined by the citizenship of its members." Zambelli Fireworks Mfg. Co., Inc. v. Wood, 592 F.3d 412, 420 (3d Cir. 2010) (quotation omitted). Based on the record presented, it is unclear whether this Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this case in that Defendants' allegations of Citizenship regarding both Plaintiff Pride Funding LLC and Defendant Cranford Harrison Developers LLC are insufficient to establish diversity jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332. Therefore, on or before January 13, 2023, Defendants are directed to file a letter setting forth the citizenship of Plaintiff Pride Funding LLC and Defendant Cranford Harrison Developers LLC traced through the citizenship of all of its members. Plaintiff's response, if any, shall be filed by January 18, 2023. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 1/4/23. (jbb)
December 30, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by PRIDE FUNDING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(CAPUZZI, KEVIN)
December 28, 2022 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by parties and intervenors in diversity actions to identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Such disclosure statements must be filed with the parties, intervenors or proposed intervenors first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response or other request addressed to the Court. (ams, )
December 23, 2022 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet by CRANFORD HARRISON DEVELOPERS LLC, ALEXANDER PAVLOVSKY. (BROOKNER, JEFFREY)
December 23, 2022 Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen added. (ps)
December 22, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CRANFORD HARRISON DEVELOPERS LLC, ALEXANDER PAVLOVSKY from Superior Court of New Jersey, Chancery Division, case number F-11914-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13915760), filed by CRANFORD HARRISON DEVELOPERS LLC, ALEXANDER PAVLOVSKY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Lis Pendens, #3 Exhibit C: Lis Pendens, #4 Exhibit D: Docket Sheet)(BROOKNER, JEFFREY)
December 22, 2022 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a #Civil Cover Sheet using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PRIDE FUNDING, LLC v. CRANFORD HARRISON DEVELOPERS LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRIDE FUNDING, LLC
Represented By: KEVIN M. CAPUZZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRIDE GROUP, LLC
Represented By: KEVIN M. CAPUZZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANFORD HARRISON DEVELOPERS LLC
Represented By: JEFFREY J. BROOKNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDER PAVLOVSKY
Represented By: JEFFREY J. BROOKNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANY UNKNOWN TENANTS OR OCCUPANTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?