GILCO ENTERPRISES, LLC AND ITS OPERATING ENTITIES ACE CONTRACT CARRIERS, INC. et al v. CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. et al
Plaintiff: GILCO ENTERPRISES, LLC AND ITS OPERATING ENTITIES ACE CONTRACT CARRIERS, INC., ACE DRIVE PRODUCTS & SERVICES, INC. and AMERICAN COMMERCIAL EQUIPMENT LEASING, LLC
Defendant: CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., KAREN CLARKE, DAMIEN DANNA and DAMIEN D'ANNA
Case Number: 2:2023cv00019
Filed: January 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jose R Almonte
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER ORDER Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.1. On 3/15/2023 at 11:00 AM there shall be an Initial Scheduling Conference before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 2/9/2023. (smf)
February 1, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Motion set for 3/6/2023 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mxw)
January 31, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.. Responses due by 2/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Philip A. Goldstein, #3 Exhibit A - Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Land Lease, #5 Exhibit C - Termination Notice, #6 Exhibit D - Unreported Decisions, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice as to KAREN CLARKE and DAMIEN D'ANNA. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 1/30/2023. (lag, )
January 27, 2023 Filing 9 Letter from Philip A. Goldstein re: Proposed Stipulation and Order of Dismissal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Proposed) Stipulation and Order)(GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION and ORDER extending time to respond to complaint through 1/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 1/24/2023. (lag, )
January 23, 2023 Filing 7 Letter from Philip A. Goldstein re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal,,. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Stipulation and Order)(GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
January 10, 2023 Clerk`s Text Order - The #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by DAMIEN D'ANNA, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., KAREN CLARKE has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/24/2023. (mxw)
January 9, 2023 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiffs' Complaint.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
January 3, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. (ak, )
January 3, 2023 Filing 5 Diversity Disclosure Statement by DAMIEN DANNA. (GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
January 3, 2023 Filing 4 Diversity Disclosure Statement by KAREN CLARKE. (GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
January 3, 2023 Filing 3 Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by KAREN CLARKE, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., DAMIEN DANNA. (GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
January 3, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. identifying CSX Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
January 3, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DAMIEN DANNA, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., KAREN CLARKE from Superior Court of the State of New Jersey, Union County, Law Division, case number UNN-L-003427-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13932150), filed by DAMIEN DANNA, CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC., KAREN CLARKE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - 12.2.2022 Email, #3 Exhibit C - Notice to State Court and Adverse Parties, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate of Service)(GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GILCO ENTERPRISES, LLC AND ITS OPERATING ENTITIES ACE CONTRACT CARRIERS, INC. et al v. CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GILCO ENTERPRISES, LLC AND ITS OPERATING ENTITIES ACE CONTRACT CARRIERS, INC.
Represented By: JARED ALAN GEIST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACE DRIVE PRODUCTS & SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: JARED ALAN GEIST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN COMMERCIAL EQUIPMENT LEASING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Represented By: PHILIP ANDREW GOLDSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAREN CLARKE
Represented By: PHILIP ANDREW GOLDSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAMIEN DANNA
Represented By: PHILIP ANDREW GOLDSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAMIEN D'ANNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?