WATCHUNG DENTAL CARE PC v. DENTAL CARE WATCHUNG LLC et al
Plaintiff: WATCHUNG DENTAL CARE PC and WATCHUNG DENTAL CARE PC doing business as WATCHUNG DENTAL CARE
Defendant: JEROME SIMON, DENTAL CARE WATCHUNG LLC, DENTAL CARE OF PRINCETON LLC, DENTAL CARE BASKING RIDGE, LLC, DENTAL ASSOCIATES OF STAMFORD, P.C., JERRY SIMON, SERITAGE GROWTH PROPERTIES, L.P., DENTAL CARE WATCHUNG LLC doing business as DENTAL CARE WATCHUNG, DENTAL CARE OF PRINCETON LLC doing business as DENTAL CARE PRINCETON, DENTAL CARE BASKING RIDGE, LLC doing business as DENTAL CARE BASKING RIDGE, DENTAL ASSOCIATES OF STAMFORD, P.C. doing business as DENTAL CARE STAMFORD and JOHN DOES 1-10
Case Number: 2:2023cv02123
Filed: April 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael E Farbiarz
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
2 Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Michael E. Farbiarz on 6/13/2023. (dam)
June 13, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With prejudice by WATCHUNG DENTAL CARE PC (LEE, PETER)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LETTER ORDER granting #12 Defendant Seritage's Request for an extension of time, through 6/30/2023, to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/19/2023. (dam)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Michael E. Farbiarz for all further proceedings. Judge John Michael Vazquez no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 5/19/2023. (mmb, )
May 19, 2023 Filing 12 Letter from Cameron A. Welch, Esq. requesting an extension of time through June 30, 2023 to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint. (WELCH, CAMERON)
May 16, 2023 Clerk's Text Order - The document #10 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SERITAGE GROWTH PROPERTIES, L.P. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/29/2023. (dam)
May 15, 2023 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WATCHUNG DENTAL CARE PC. JEROME SIMON waiver sent on 4/26/2023, answer due 6/26/2023. (LEE, PETER)
May 15, 2023 Filing 10 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Seritage Growth Properties, L.P.. Attorney CAMERON A. WELCH for SERITAGE GROWTH PROPERTIES, L.P. added. (WELCH, CAMERON)
May 8, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WATCHUNG DENTAL CARE PC. DENTAL CARE WATCHUNG LLC waiver sent on 4/26/2023, answer due 6/26/2023. (LEE, PETER)
May 8, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WATCHUNG DENTAL CARE PC. DENTAL ASSOCIATES OF STAMFORD, P.C. waiver sent on 4/26/2023, answer due 6/26/2023. (LEE, PETER)
April 24, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WATCHUNG DENTAL CARE PC. DENTAL CARE OF PRINCETON LLC served on 4/24/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. (LEE, PETER)
April 24, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WATCHUNG DENTAL CARE PC. SERITAGE GROWTH PROPERTIES, L.P. served on 4/24/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. (LEE, PETER)
April 22, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WATCHUNG DENTAL CARE PC. DENTAL CARE BASKING RIDGE, LLC served on 4/21/2023, answer due 5/12/2023. (LEE, PETER)
April 18, 2023 Filing 4 AO120 Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1) (dam)
April 18, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to DENTAL ASSOCIATES OF STAMFORD, P.C., DENTAL CARE BASKING RIDGE, LLC, DENTAL CARE OF PRINCETON LLC, DENTAL CARE WATCHUNG LLC, SERITAGE GROWTH PROPERTIES, L.P., JEROME SIMON. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam)
April 17, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WATCHUNG DENTAL CARE PC. (LEE, PETER)
April 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DENTAL ASSOCIATES OF STAMFORD, P.C., DENTAL CARE BASKING RIDGE, LLC, DENTAL CARE OF PRINCETON LLC, DENTAL CARE WATCHUNG LLC, SERITAGE GROWTH PROPERTIES, L.P., JEROME SIMON, JOHN DOES 1-10 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14250519) with JURY DEMAND, filed by WATCHUNG DENTAL CARE PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1--TRADEMARK REGISTRATION)(LEE, PETER) Modified on 4/18/2023 (dam).
April 17, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WATCHUNG DENTAL CARE PC v. DENTAL CARE WATCHUNG LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEROME SIMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENTAL CARE WATCHUNG LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENTAL CARE OF PRINCETON LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENTAL CARE BASKING RIDGE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENTAL ASSOCIATES OF STAMFORD, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JERRY SIMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERITAGE GROWTH PROPERTIES, L.P.
Represented By: CAMERON A. WELCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENTAL CARE WATCHUNG LLC doing business as DENTAL CARE WATCHUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENTAL CARE OF PRINCETON LLC doing business as DENTAL CARE PRINCETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENTAL CARE BASKING RIDGE, LLC doing business as DENTAL CARE BASKING RIDGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENTAL ASSOCIATES OF STAMFORD, P.C. doing business as DENTAL CARE STAMFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WATCHUNG DENTAL CARE PC
Represented By: PETER Y. LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WATCHUNG DENTAL CARE PC doing business as WATCHUNG DENTAL CARE
Represented By: PETER Y. LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?