OUR OWN CANDLE COMPANY, INC., v. GIVAUDAN S.A. et al
Plaintiff: OUR OWN CANDLE COMPANY, INC.,
Defendant: GIVAUDAN S.A., GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, GIVAUDAN FLAVORS CORPORATION, UNGERER & COMPANY, INC., INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC., Symrise AG, SYMRISE INC., SYMRISE US LLC, FIRMENICH INTERNATIONAL S.A., FIRMENICH INCORPORATED and AGILEX FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2023cv02174
Filed: April 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jessica S Allen
Referring Judge: James B Clark
2 Judge: William J Martini
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Anti-trust
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2023 Filing 43 Letter from James Cecchi, Esq. to Honorable Jessica S. Allen, U.S.M.J. (including exhibit). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order for Consolidation and Schedule ()(CECCHI, JAMES)
July 14, 2023 Filing 42 Letter from James E. Cecchi, Esq. to the Honorable Jessica S. Allen. (CECCHI, JAMES)
July 10, 2023 Filing 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FIRMENICH INCORPORATED identifying Fragar (America) SA as Corporate Parent.. (KULIK, SARAH)
July 10, 2023 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AGILEX FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES, INC. identifying Agilex Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (KULIK, SARAH)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Application for the pro hac vice admission of attorneys BORIS BERSHTEYN, MATTHEW MARTINO, and EVAN LEVICOFF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 7/7/2023. (jd, )
July 5, 2023 Pro Hac Vice counsel, WILLIAM H. BAVE III and ROBERT A. MILNE, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jd, )
July 5, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #32 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Interim Class Counsel and Liaison Counsel. Motion set for 8/7/2023 before Judge William J. Martini. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jd, )
July 3, 2023 Filing 38 Letter from Tansy Woan re: Applications for Pro Hac Vice Admission on Consent. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Tansy Woan, #2 Certification of Boris Bershteyn, #3 Certification of Matthew Martino, #4 Certification of Evan Levicoff, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(WOAN, TANSY)
July 3, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by TANSY WOAN on behalf of INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC. (WOAN, TANSY)
July 3, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW MUSCATO on behalf of INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC. (MUSCATO, ANDREW)
July 3, 2023 Filing 35 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice William H. Bave III to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-14429451.) (WALSH, LIZA)
July 3, 2023 Filing 34 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Robert Milne to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-14429446.) (WALSH, LIZA)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting pro hac vice admission of Robert Milne & Willian H. Bave III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 6/30/2023. (lag, )
June 30, 2023 Filing 32 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Interim Class Counsel and Liaison Counsel by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James E. Cecchi, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
June 29, 2023 Pro Hac Vice counsel, AIDAN SYNNOTT and EYITAYO ST. MATTHEW-DANIEL, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jd, )
June 29, 2023 Pro Hac Vice counsel, ROBERT M. OAKES, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jd, )
June 29, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF docket regarding attorney Robert M. Oakes entry filed by the Clerk's Office on 6/29/2023 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (jd, )
June 28, 2023 Filing 31 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Eyitayo St. Matthew-Daniel, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-14421171.) (REICH, KEVIN)
June 28, 2023 Filing 30 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Aidan Synnott, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-14421160.) (REICH, KEVIN)
June 28, 2023 Filing 29 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Jessica S. Allen, U.S.M.J. re: Pro Hac Vice Application on Consent. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Robert Milne, #2 Certification of William H. Bave III, #3 Certification of Liza M. Walsh, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 -5 Application for the admission of pro hac vice attorney, EYITAYO ST. MATTHEW-DANIEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 6/28/2023. (jd, )
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 -4 Application for the admission of pro hac vice attorney, AIDAN SYNNOTT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 6/28/2023. (jd, )
June 27, 2023 Filing 26 Letter from Kevin R. Reich enclosing pro hac vice applications. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin R. Reich, Esq., #2 Declaration of Aidan Synnott, Esq., #3 Declaration of Eyitayo St. Matthew-Daniel, Esq., #4 Text of Proposed Order regarding Aidan Synnott, #5 Text of Proposed Order regarding Eyitayo St. Matthew-Daniel)(REICH, KEVIN)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge James B. Clark recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/26/2023. (jd, )
June 26, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN REED REICH on behalf of GIVAUDAN FLAVORS CORPORATION, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, UNGERER & COMPANY, INC. (REICH, KEVIN)
June 26, 2023 Pro Hac Vice counsel, ARTHUR J. BURKE and ANNA M. KOZLOWSKI, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jd, )
June 23, 2023 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to ANNA M. KOZLOWSKI and ARTHUR J. BURKE: $ 300, receipt number 133258 (jdg)
June 22, 2023 Filing 23 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Anna M. Kozlowski to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (MCCONNELL, SEAN)
June 22, 2023 Filing 22 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Arthur J. Burke to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (MCCONNELL, SEAN)
June 21, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by MARTIN TOTO on behalf of SYMRISE INC., SYMRISE US LLC (TOTO, MARTIN)
June 21, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA K. FORMICHELLA on behalf of SYMRISE INC., SYMRISE US LLC (FORMICHELLA, JESSICA)
June 21, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by LIZA M. WALSH on behalf of SYMRISE INC., SYMRISE US LLC (WALSH, LIZA)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Letter Application of pro hac vice Counsel, ANNA M. KOZLOWSKI. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/20/2023. (jd, )
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Letter Application of pro hac vice counsel, ARTHUR BURKE. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/20/2023. (jd, )
June 16, 2023 Filing 16 Letter from Sean P. McConnell regarding Pro Hac Vice Applications. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sean McConnell with Exhibits, #2 Text of Proposed Order regarding Arthur Burke application, #3 Text of Proposed Order regarding Anna Kozlowski application)(MCCONNELL, SEAN)
June 14, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH O'LAUGHLIN KULIK on behalf of AGILEX FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES, INC., FIRMENICH INCORPORATED (KULIK, SARAH)
June 14, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by SEAN PATRICK MCCONNELL on behalf of AGILEX FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES, INC., FIRMENICH INCORPORATED (MCCONNELL, SEAN)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying without prejudice, Plaintiff's request to appoint interim counsel, etc. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 6/7/23. (gh, )
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #11 Defendant, IFF's timeline shall proceed as entered in Court Order CM/ECF No. #6 . Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/30/2023. (jd, )
May 26, 2023 Filing 11 Letter from Lindsey H. Taylor Enclosing Proposed Stipulation and Order Regarding Scheduling. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(TAYLOR, LINDSEY)
May 26, 2023 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by OUR OWN CANDLE COMPANY, INC.,. INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC. waiver sent on 5/23/2023, answer due 7/24/2023. (TAYLOR, LINDSEY)
May 25, 2023 Filing 9 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Linda P. Nussbaum to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (TAYLOR, LINDSEY)
May 25, 2023 Pro Hac Vice fee: $150.00, receipt number NEW48355 as to Linda P. Nussbaum. (ps)
May 25, 2023 Pro Hac Vice counsel, LINDA P. NUSSBAUM, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jd, )
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Application to appear pro hac vice as to LINDA P. NUSSBAUM. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/24/2023. (jd, )
May 23, 2023 Filing 7 Letter from Lindsey H. Taylor Enclosing Pro Hac Vice Application. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lindsey H. Taylor, #2 Declaration of Linda P. Nussbaum, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(TAYLOR, LINDSEY)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #4 . Setting the timeline for parties submissions. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/22/2023. (jd, )
May 19, 2023 Filing 5 Letter from James E. Cecchi and Linda Nussbaum Regarding Appointment of Interim Class Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
May 19, 2023 Filing 4 Letter from Lindsey H. Taylor Enclosing Proposed Stipulation and Order Regarding Scheduling. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(TAYLOR, LINDSEY)
April 27, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OUR OWN CANDLE COMPANY, INC., identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (TAYLOR, LINDSEY)
April 26, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AGILEX FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES, INC., FIRMENICH INCORPORATED, FIRMENICH INTERNATIONAL S.A., GIVAUDAN FLAVORS CORPORATION, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, GIVAUDAN S.A., INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC., SYMRISE AG, SYMRISE INC., SYMRISE US LLC, UNGERER & COMPANY, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jd, )
April 26, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party or intervenor. Please refer to the Court's website at #www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (jd, )
April 19, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button. This complaint has previously been opened as 3:23-cv-02173. In the event an error is made during the case opening process please call (609)989-2065 or refer to the Attorney Case Opening guide for assistance. DO NOT create a new case . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
April 18, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (ak, )
April 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14256121) with JURY DEMAND, filed by OUR OWN CANDLE COMPANY, INC.,. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CECCHI, JAMES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OUR OWN CANDLE COMPANY, INC., v. GIVAUDAN S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OUR OWN CANDLE COMPANY, INC.,
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIVAUDAN S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIVAUDAN FLAVORS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNGERER & COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symrise AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYMRISE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYMRISE US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRMENICH INTERNATIONAL S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRMENICH INCORPORATED
Represented By: SARAH O'LAUGHLIN KULIK
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK MCCONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGILEX FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES, INC.
Represented By: SARAH O'LAUGHLIN KULIK
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK MCCONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?