SCHECHTER v. CLEAN TEAM, INC. et al
Petitioner: Colleen Breslin, REGIONAL DIRECTOR SUZANNE SULLIVAN and ERIC R SCHECHTER
Respondent: CLEAN TEAM, INC. and THETA HOLDINGS COMPANY, L.P.
Not Classified By Court: SHERYL M. GOSKI
Case Number: 2:2023cv02343
Filed: April 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 7/18/2023. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 5/19/2023. (dam)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER appointing Mediator Sheryl M. Goski, Esq.; directing the parties to attend mediation sessions as requested by the Mediator; administratively terminating without prejudice #1 Petitioner's Petition for Injunctive Relief, #2 Motion to use affidavits as the record, and #11 Cross-Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 5/16/2023. (dam)
May 8, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motions set for 6/5/2023 before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, these motions will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam)
May 5, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Status Conference call held on 5/5/2023. (jl, )
May 5, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CLEAN TEAM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Paul H. Schafhauser, #2 Certification of Jerrold F. Goldberg, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(SCHAFHAUSER, PAUL)
May 5, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CLEAN TEAM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Paul H. Schafhauser, #2 Certification of Justin F. Keith, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(SCHAFHAUSER, PAUL)
May 4, 2023 Filing 13 Letter from Theo E. M. Gould supplementing Respondent Theta Holding Corporation's #11 Motion to Stay and Grant Discovery based on new facts discovered. (GOULD, THEO)
May 4, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #11 Cross MOTION to Stay and Opposition to #2 Petitioner's Motion to Determine Petition on Affidavits and Documents. Motion set for 6/5/2023 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam)
May 3, 2023 Filing 12 Letter from Respondent Clean Team, Inc. in Response to Plaintiff's letter dated May 3, 2023 (Dck. 10) re #10 Letter. (SCHAFHAUSER, PAUL)
May 3, 2023 Filing 11 Cross MOTION to Stay and Opposition to #2 Petitioner's Motion to Determine Petition on Affidavits and Documents by THETA HOLDINGS COMPANY, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Cross Motion and in Opposition to Motion, #2 Declaration of Theo E. M. Gould in support of Cross Motion and in Opposition to Motion, #3 Exhibit 1-3 to Gould Decl.) (GOULD, THEO) Modified on 5/4/2023 (dam).
May 3, 2023 Filing 10 Letter from Petitioner in Response to Clean Team's May 1 letter request re #7 Letter. (BRESLIN, COLLEEN)
May 2, 2023 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE upon Theta by ERIC R SCHECHTER re #1 PETITION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (BRESLIN, COLLEEN) Modified on 5/3/2023 (dam).
May 2, 2023 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE upon Clean Team by ERIC R SCHECHTER re #1 PETITION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (BRESLIN, COLLEEN) Modified on 5/3/2023 (dam).
May 1, 2023 Filing 7 Letter from Paul H. Schafhauser, Esq.. (SCHAFHAUSER, PAUL)
May 1, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL H. SCHAFHAUSER on behalf of CLEAN TEAM, INC. (SCHAFHAUSER, PAUL)
April 28, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by THEO E.M. GOULD on behalf of THETA HOLDINGS COMPANY, L.P. (GOULD, THEO)
April 28, 2023 Filing 4 Exhibit to #2 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Cover Letter explaining correction to Proposed Order by ERIC R SCHECHTER. (BRESLIN, COLLEEN)
April 28, 2023 Filing 3 Exhibit to #2 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Proposed Order (with Corrected Language) by ERIC R SCHECHTER. (BRESLIN, COLLEEN)
April 28, 2023 Case assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jrp)
April 28, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #2 MOTION to use Affidavits as the Record before this Court. Motion set for 6/5/2023 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam)
April 27, 2023 Filing 2 First MOTION, re #1 Complaint, to use Affidavits as the Record before this Court by ERIC R. SCHECHTER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Try Case on Affidavits) (BRESLIN, COLLEEN) Modified on 4/28/2023 (dam). Modified on 4/28/2023 (dam).
April 27, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against CLEAN TEAM, INC. and THETA HOLDINGS, L.P. filed by ERIC R. SCHECHTER (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Acting Regional Director Declaration, #3 Memorandum of Law in Support of Petition for Injunctive Relief, #4 Text of Proposed Order to Show Cause, #5 Text of Proposed Order Granting Injunction) (BRESLIN, COLLEEN) Modified on 4/28/2023 (dam).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCHECHTER v. CLEAN TEAM, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Colleen Breslin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: REGIONAL DIRECTOR SUZANNE SULLIVAN
Represented By: COLLEEN BRESLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ERIC R SCHECHTER
Represented By: COLLEEN BRESLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SHERYL M. GOSKI
Represented By: SHERYL MINTZ GOSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CLEAN TEAM, INC.
Represented By: PAUL H. SCHAFHAUSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THETA HOLDINGS COMPANY, L.P.
Represented By: THEO E.M. GOULD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?