LANDSTAR GLOBAL LOGISTICS, INC. v. PERFECTION PLUS TRUCKING, INC.
Plaintiff: LANDSTAR GLOBAL LOGISTICS, INC.
Defendant: PERFECTION PLUS TRUCKING, INC.
Case Number: 2:2023cv02808
Filed: May 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Andre M Espinosa
Referring Judge: Evelyn Padin
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Interstate Commerce Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2023 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Perfection Plus Trucking, Inc. for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (sm)
July 13, 2023 Filing 8 Request for Default by LANDSTAR GLOBAL LOGISTICS, INC. against Perfection Plus Trucking, Inc.. (MARTIN, THOMAS)
June 8, 2023 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Appearance, Corporate Disclosure served on Samara Garcia, Authorized Agent of Perfection Plus Trucking, inc. on 06/05/2023, filed by LANDSTAR GLOBAL LOGISTICS, INC.. (MARTIN, THOMAS)
May 31, 2023 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LANDSTAR GLOBAL LOGISTICS, INC.. (MARTIN, THOMAS)
May 26, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PERFECTION PLUS TRUCKING, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
May 23, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM D. BIERMAN on behalf of LANDSTAR GLOBAL LOGISTICS, INC. (BIERMAN, WILLIAM)
May 23, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS C. MARTIN on behalf of LANDSTAR GLOBAL LOGISTICS, INC. (MARTIN, THOMAS)
May 23, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LANDSTAR GLOBAL LOGISTICS, INC.. (MARTIN, THOMAS)
May 23, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PERFECTION PLUS TRUCKING, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14337329), filed by LANDSTAR GLOBAL LOGISTICS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MARTIN, THOMAS)
May 23, 2023 Case assigned to Judge Evelyn Padin and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LANDSTAR GLOBAL LOGISTICS, INC. v. PERFECTION PLUS TRUCKING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LANDSTAR GLOBAL LOGISTICS, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM D. BIERMAN
Represented By: THOMAS C. MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERFECTION PLUS TRUCKING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?