CASE MEDICAL, INC. v. ROCK CITY LOGISTICS et al
Plaintiff: Case Medical, Inc.
Defendant: Rock City Logistics, Saia LTL Freight and PRIORITY 1 INC
Case Number: 2:2023cv02954
Filed: May 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 81 Damaged Goods While Being Transported
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2023 Reset Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Motion reset for 8/21/2023 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jd, )
July 19, 2023 Filing 15 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint . (RINDOSH, JASON)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney STEVEN J. KUSTRA. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 7/12/2023. (jd, )
July 11, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Motion set for 8/7/2023 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jd, )
July 11, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steven Kustra (Unopposed). Motion set for 8/7/2023 before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jd, )
July 10, 2023 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROCK CITY LOGISTICS. (LUCCA, CHRISTOPHER)
July 10, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by ROCK CITY LOGISTICS. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order)(LUCCA, CHRISTOPHER)
July 10, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steven Kustra (Unopposed) by ROCK CITY LOGISTICS. (Attachments: #1 Certification of C. Lucca in Support of PHV Admission of S. Kustra, #2 Exhibit A - Certification of S. Kustra, #3 Proposed Order)(LUCCA, CHRISTOPHER)
July 10, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER M. LUCCA on behalf of ROCK CITY LOGISTICS (LUCCA, CHRISTOPHER)
July 10, 2023 Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 2-8 of the Amended Complaint. Motion reset for 8/21/2023 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jd, )
July 7, 2023 Filing 9 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 2-8 of the Amended Complaint . (RINDOSH, JASON)
July 5, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 2-8 of the Amended Complaint. Motion set for 8/7/2023 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jd, )
June 30, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 2-8 of the Amended Complaint by SAIA LTL FREIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(MERRICK, CHRISTOPHER)
June 29, 2023 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and CIS served on SAIA LTL FREIGHT on 05/05/2023, filed by CASE MEDICAL, INC.. (RINDOSH, JASON)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: The Court has received Defendant Saia LTL Freights motion to dismiss. D.E. 3. Plaintiff subsequently filed an amended complaint as a matter of course pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B). D.E. 4, 5. Therefore, Defendants motion to dismiss will be administratively terminated, and Defendant may file a new motion addressing the Amended Complaint. So Ordered by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 6/20/2023. (ro, )
June 19, 2023 Filing 5 Letter re #4 Amended Complaint. (RINDOSH, JASON)
June 19, 2023 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by CASE MEDICAL, INC..(RINDOSH, JASON)
June 8, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). Motion set for 7/3/2023 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jd, )
June 7, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by SAIA LTL FREIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(MERRICK, CHRISTOPHER)
May 31, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (ak, )
May 31, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Saia LTL Freight identifying Saia Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (MERRICK, CHRISTOPHER)
May 31, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Saia LTL Freight from Superior Court of New Jersey, Essex County, Law Division, case number ESX-L-002477-23. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14353391), filed by Saia LTL Freight. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(MERRICK, CHRISTOPHER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CASE MEDICAL, INC. v. ROCK CITY LOGISTICS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Case Medical, Inc.
Represented By: JASON ALEXANDER RINDOSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rock City Logistics
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER M. LUCCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saia LTL Freight
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. MERRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRIORITY 1 INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?