MORRIS & DICKSON CO., L.L.C. v. GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC et al
Plaintiff: MORRIS & DICKSON CO., L.L.C.
Defendant: GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC formerly known as SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION doing business as GLAXOSMITHKLINE, SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD and TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC
Case Number: 2:2023cv02956
Filed: May 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
Presiding Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting the #55 Motion to Permit Bruce E. Gerstein, Dan Litvin, and Samuel E. Bonderoff to Appear and Participate Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/28/2023. (qa, )
July 28, 2023 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Peter S. Pearlman, Esq., #2 Certification of Bruce E. Gerstein, Esq., #3 Certification of Samuel E. Bonderoff, Esq., #4 Certification of Dan Litvin, Esq., #5 Text of Proposed Order)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting the #53 Pro Hac Vice Application to Admit Robin P. Sumner, Melissa Hatch O'Donnell, Daniel J. Boland, and Brett E. Broczkowski. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/17/2023. (qa, )
July 14, 2023 Filing 53 Letter from Lauren E. Van Driesen re: Pro Hac Vice Motions on Consent. (Attachments: #1 Certification of L. VanDriesen in Support of PHV Application, #2 Certification of B. Broczkowski in Support of PHV Application, #3 Certification of M. O'Connell in Support of PHV Application, #4 Certification of R. Sumner in Support of PHV Application, #5 Certification of D. Boland in Support of PHV Application, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(VAN DRIESEN, LAUREN)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 TEXT ORDER: Per counsel's request, and with consent, the Court will prepone the initial conference in this matter to 7/31/23 at 10:30 a.m., and will conduct that conference via Zoom. The Court will circulate connection information on the day of the conference. Going forward, unless and until these matters are formally consolidated, counsel are directed to file all correspondence in each individual matter. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/5/23. (tjd)
June 23, 2023 Filing 51 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC. (VAN DRIESEN, LAUREN)
June 22, 2023 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW F. GATELY on behalf of All Plaintiffs (GATELY, MATTHEW)
June 22, 2023 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER S. PEARLMAN on behalf of All Plaintiffs (PEARLMAN, PETER)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor in courtroom 4D on 8/1/23 at 10:00 AM. Local counsel must be present. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order (for Judge Salas cases, please use her dedicated PTSO found in the same location) found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/22/23. (tjg, )
June 20, 2023 Filing 47 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC.(WALSH, LIZA)
June 20, 2023 Filing 46 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC.(VAN DRIESEN, LAUREN)
June 20, 2023 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN E. VAN DRIESEN on behalf of GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC (VAN DRIESEN, LAUREN)
June 15, 2023 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by HECTOR DANIEL RUIZ on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC (RUIZ, HECTOR)
June 15, 2023 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by LIZA M. WALSH on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC (WALSH, LIZA)
May 31, 2023 Filing 42 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:23-cv-00480. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 31, 2023 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO TRANSFER IS GRANTED. CONSISTENT WITH THIS ORDER, THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER THIS MATTER TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO STAY (ECF NOS. 14 & 26) AND ANY RESPONSE AND OPPOSITION THERETO, THE MOTION TO STAY IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 5/30/23. 5/31/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
May 31, 2023 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 5/30/23. 5/31/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
May 31, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, )
April 17, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Brinna Ludwig on behalf of GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC(Ludwig, Brinna)
March 27, 2023 Filing 38 Response re #37 Notice (Other) / Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Notice Regarding Defendants' Motion to Transfer by GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. (GUNDERSON, KARL)
March 24, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE by MORRIS & DICKSON CO., L.L.C. re #14 MOTION to Stay Case, #12 MOTION to Transfer PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER (SORENSEN, DAVID)
March 23, 2023 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Transfer filed by GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. (GUNDERSON, KARL)
March 23, 2023 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Stay Case filed by GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. (O'DONNELL, MELISSA)
March 20, 2023 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by JAY P. LEFKOWITZ on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. with Certificate of Service(LEFKOWITZ, JAY)
March 20, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by GILAD BENDHEIM on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. with Certificate of Service(BENDHEIM, GILAD)
March 20, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by DEVORA W. ALLON on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. with Certificate of Service(ALLON, DEVORA)
March 17, 2023 Filing 31 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dan Litvin by MORRIS & DICKSON CO., L.L.C.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16569780.). (COSLETT, CAITLIN)
March 17, 2023 Filing 30 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bruce E. Gerstein by MORRIS & DICKSON CO., L.L.C.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number BPAEDC-16569758.). (COSLETT, CAITLIN)
March 17, 2023 Filing 29 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including GlaxoSmithKline LLC by GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC.(O'DONNELL, MELISSA)
March 16, 2023 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Stay Case filed by MORRIS & DICKSON CO., L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SORENSEN, DAVID)
March 16, 2023 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Transfer filed by MORRIS & DICKSON CO., L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter Kohn in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(SORENSEN, DAVID)
March 16, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION for Joinder of Defendants' Motion to Stay Case (Dkt. No.14) and Motion to Transfer (Dkt. No. 12) filed by TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD..Certificate of Service.(GUNDERSON, KARL)
March 16, 2023 Filing 25 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD..(GUNDERSON, KARL)
March 16, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by KARL GUNDERSON on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. with Certificate of Service(GUNDERSON, KARL)
March 7, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Brinna Ludwig on behalf of GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC with Certificate of Service(Ludwig, Brinna)
March 7, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Brianna Alunni on behalf of GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC with Certificate of Service(Alunni, Brianna)
March 7, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA HATCH O'DONNELL on behalf of GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC with Certificate of Service(O'DONNELL, MELISSA)
March 7, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J. BOLAND on behalf of GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC with Certificate of Service(BOLAND, DANIEL)
March 7, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBIN P. SUMNER on behalf of GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC with Certificate of Service(SUMNER, ROBIN)
March 7, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by JAY P. LEFKOWITZ on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(LEFKOWITZ, JAY)
March 7, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by GILAD BENDHEIM on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(BENDHEIM, GILAD)
March 7, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by DEVORA W. ALLON on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(ALLON, DEVORA)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF DEVORA W. ALLON, ESQUIRE (ECF 9), JAY P. LEFKOWITZ, ESQUIRE (ECF 10) AND GILAD BENDHEIM, ESQUIRE (ECF 11), ARE GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 3/6/23.3/6/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
March 6, 2023 Filing Fee for PRO HAC VICE by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. (Filing Fee $40, receipt number APAEDC-16541661). (GUNDERSON, KARL)
March 2, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay Case filed by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(GUNDERSON, KARL)
March 2, 2023 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. with Certificate of Service by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..(GUNDERSON, KARL)
March 2, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Transfer filed by GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..Memorandum, Declaration, Proposed Order, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Declaration of Gilad Bendheim and Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(GUNDERSON, KARL)
March 2, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Gilad Bendheim ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16536654.) filed by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..Proposed Order, Certificate of Service.(GUNDERSON, KARL)
March 2, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Jay P. Lefkowitz ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16536652.) filed by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..Proposed Order, Certificate of Service.(GUNDERSON, KARL)
March 2, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Devora W. Allon filed by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..Proposed Order, Certificate of Service.(GUNDERSON, KARL)
March 2, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by KARL GUNDERSON on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (GUNDERSON, KARL)
March 1, 2023 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service re Served Summons and Complaint upon Defendant GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Defendant Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc., and Defendant Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(COSLETT, CAITLIN)
February 14, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER R. KOHN on behalf of MORRIS & DICKSON CO., L.L.C. with Certificate of Service(KOHN, PETER)
February 13, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by CAITLIN G. COSLETT on behalf of MORRIS & DICKSON CO., L.L.C. with Certificate of Service(COSLETT, CAITLIN)
February 13, 2023 Filing 4 COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS SENT TO TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. VIA FEDEX, TRACKING NUMBER 7712 7560 8687. (sg) (sg).
February 7, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 2/7/23 (bw)
February 7, 2023 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Morris & Dickson Holding Co., LLC with Certificate of Service by MORRIS & DICKSON CO., L.L.C..(SORENSEN, DAVID)
February 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16484421.), filed by MORRIS & DICKSON CO., L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(SORENSEN, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MORRIS & DICKSON CO., L.L.C. v. GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC formerly known as SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION doing business as GLAXOSMITHKLINE
Represented By: LAUREN E. VAN DRIESEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION
Represented By: LAUREN E. VAN DRIESEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Represented By: HECTOR DANIEL RUIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC
Represented By: HECTOR DANIEL RUIZ
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MORRIS & DICKSON CO., L.L.C.
Represented By: CAITLIN G. COSLETT
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Represented By: MATTHEW F. GATELY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?