FWK HOLDINGS, LLC. v. GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC et al
Plaintiff: FWK Holdings LLC
Defendant: GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC formerly known as SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION doing business as GLAXOSMITHKLINE, SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD and TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC
Case Number: 2:2023cv02958
Filed: May 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
Presiding Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robin P. Sumner, Esq., Melissa Hatch O'Donnell, Esq., Daniel J. Boland, Esq., and Brett E. Broczkowski, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/17/2023. (ld, )
July 14, 2023 Filing 46 Letter from Lauren E. Van Driesen re: Pro Hac Vice Motions on Consent. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Lauren Van Driesen in Support of PHV Applications, #2 Certification of Daniel J. Boland for PHV, #3 Certification of Brett E. Broczkowski for PHV, #4 Certification of Melissa H. O'Donnell for PHV, #5 Certification of Robin P. Sumner for PHV, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(VAN DRIESEN, LAUREN)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 TEXT ORDER: Per counsel's request, and with consent, the Court will prepone the initial conference in this matter to 7/31/23 at 10:30 a.m., and will conduct that conference via Zoom. The Court will circulate connection information on the day of the conference. Going forward, unless and until these matters are formally consolidated, counsel are directed to file all correspondence in each individual matter. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/5/23. (tjd)
June 23, 2023 Filing 44 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC. (VAN DRIESEN, LAUREN)
June 22, 2023 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW F. GATELY on behalf of All Plaintiffs (GATELY, MATTHEW)
June 22, 2023 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER S. PEARLMAN on behalf of All Plaintiffs (PEARLMAN, PETER)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor in courtroom 4D on 8/1/23 at 10:00 AM. Local counsel must be present. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order (for Judge Salas cases, please use her dedicated PTSO found in the same location) found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/20/23. (tjg, )
June 22, 2023 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, )
June 20, 2023 Filing 40 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC.(WALSH, LIZA)
June 20, 2023 Filing 39 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC.(VAN DRIESEN, LAUREN)
June 20, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN E. VAN DRIESEN on behalf of GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC (VAN DRIESEN, LAUREN)
June 15, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by HECTOR DANIEL RUIZ on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC (RUIZ, HECTOR)
June 15, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by LIZA M. WALSH on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC (WALSH, LIZA)
May 31, 2023 Filing 35 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:23-cv-00757. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO TRANSFER IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER THIS MATTER TO THE USDC FOR THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY. THE MOTION TO STAY IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 5/30/23. 5/31/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
May 31, 2023 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 5/30/23. 5/31/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
May 31, 2023 CASE TRANSFERED TO USDC FOR NEW JERSEY (JL)
May 31, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, )
April 17, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Brinna Ludwig on behalf of GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC(Ludwig, Brinna)
March 27, 2023 Filing 31 Response re #28 Notice (Other) / Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Notice Regarding Defendants' Motion to Transfer by GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. (GUNDERSON, KARL)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER THAT THE BRUCE E. GERSTEIN AND DAN LITVIN APPLICATION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 3/23/23. 3/24/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL) (Main Document 30 replaced on 3/24/2023) (jl).
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF DEVORA W. ALLEN, JAY P. LEFKOWITZ AND GILAD BENDHEIM ARE GRANTED PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2 (b); ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 3/23/23.3/24/23 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
March 24, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE by FWK HOLDINGS, LLC. re #17 MOTION to Transfer , #18 MOTION to Stay PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER (SORENSEN, DAVID)
March 23, 2023 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION to Transfer filed by GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. (GUNDERSON, KARL)
March 23, 2023 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Stay filed by GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. (O'DONNELL, MELISSA)
March 21, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER R. KOHN on behalf of FWK HOLDINGS, LLC. with Certificate of Service(KOHN, PETER)
March 20, 2023 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Service re Served Summons and Complaint upon Defendant GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Defendant Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc., and Defendant Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(COSLETT, CAITLIN)
March 17, 2023 Filing 23 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dan Litvin by FWK HOLDINGS, LLC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16569753.). (COSLETT, CAITLIN)
March 17, 2023 Filing 22 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bruce E. Gerstein by FWK HOLDINGS, LLC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16569746.). (COSLETT, CAITLIN)
March 17, 2023 Filing 21 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including GlaxoSmithKline LLC by GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC.(O'DONNELL, MELISSA)
March 16, 2023 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Stay filed by FWK HOLDINGS, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SORENSEN, DAVID)
March 16, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Transfer filed by FWK HOLDINGS, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter Kohn in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(SORENSEN, DAVID)
March 16, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION to Stay filed by GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..Memorandum of Law in Support, Proposed Order, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(GUNDERSON, KARL)
March 16, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Transfer filed by GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..Memorandum, Declaration, Proposed Order, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Declaration of Gilad Bendheim in Support, #3 Exhibit A to Bendheim Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(GUNDERSON, KARL)
March 16, 2023 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. with Certificate of Service by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..(GUNDERSON, KARL)
March 16, 2023 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD..(GUNDERSON, KARL)
March 16, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Gilad Bendheim ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16566687.) filed by TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..Proposed Order, Certificate of Service.(GUNDERSON, KARL)
March 16, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Jay P. Lefkowitz ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16566669.) filed by TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..Proposed Order, Certificate of Service.(GUNDERSON, KARL)
March 16, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Devora W. Allon ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16566630.) filed by TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..Proposed Order, Certificate of Service.(GUNDERSON, KARL)
March 16, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by KARL GUNDERSON on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(GUNDERSON, KARL)
March 16, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brinna Ludwig on behalf of GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC with Certificate of Service(Ludwig, Brinna)
March 16, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brianna Alunni on behalf of GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC with Certificate of Service(Alunni, Brianna)
March 16, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA HATCH O'DONNELL on behalf of GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC with Certificate of Service(O'DONNELL, MELISSA)
March 16, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J. BOLAND on behalf of GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC with Certificate of Service(BOLAND, DANIEL)
March 16, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBIN P. SUMNER on behalf of GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC with Certificate of Service(SUMNER, ROBIN)
March 8, 2023 Filing 5 Letter dated 3/8/23 RE: REGARDING SERVICE OF THE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT UPON DEFENDANT TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. (JL)
March 8, 2023 SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT SERVED UPON TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD BY FEDERAL EXPRESS IN TEL AVIV ISRAEL TRACKING NUMBER 7715 0514 1857 (JL)
February 28, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by CAITLIN G. COSLETT on behalf of FWK HOLDINGS, LLC. with Certificate of Service(COSLETT, CAITLIN)
February 28, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 2/28/23 (JL)
February 28, 2023 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by FWK HOLDINGS, LLC.. (JL)
February 27, 2023 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by FWK HOLDINGS, LLC..(SORENSEN, DAVID)
February 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16526587.), filed by FWK HOLDINGS, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(SORENSEN, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FWK HOLDINGS, LLC. v. GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC formerly known as SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION doing business as GLAXOSMITHKLINE
Represented By: LAUREN E. VAN DRIESEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION
Represented By: LAUREN E. VAN DRIESEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Represented By: HECTOR DANIEL RUIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Represented By: HECTOR DANIEL RUIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FWK Holdings LLC
Represented By: BRUCE E. GERSTEIN
Represented By: MATTHEW F. GATELY
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?