MLI RX LLC et al v. GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC et al
Plaintiff: MLI RX LLC, AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORP., AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP., H.D. SMITH, LLC, VALLEY WHOLESALE DRUG CO., LLC, CARDINAL HEALTH INC., CARDINAL HEALTH P.R. 120, INC., THE HARVARD DRUG GROUP, L.L.C., CARDINAL HEALTH 110, LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, BURLINGTON DRUG COMPANY, INC., DAKOTA DRUG, INC., NORTH CAROLINA MUTUAL WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY, J M SMITH CORPORATION doing business as SMITH DRUG COMPANY, VALUE DRUG COMPANY and Prescription Supply, Inc.
Defendant: GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC formerly known as SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION doing business as GLAXOSMITHKLINE, SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD and TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC
Interested Party: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv02960
Filed: May 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
Presiding Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #72 Application for ROBIN P. SUMNER, MELISSA HATCH ODONNELL, DANIEL J. BOLAND, AND BRETT E. BROCZKOWSKI to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/17/2023. (mxw)
July 14, 2023 Filing 72 Letter from Lauren E. Van Driesen re: Pro Hac Motions on Consent. (Attachments: #1 Certification of L. Van Driesen in Support of PHV Application, #2 Certification of D. Boland in Support of PHV Application, #3 Certification of B. Broczkowski in Support of PHV Application, #4 Certification of M. O'Donnell in Support of PHV Application, #5 Certification of R. Sumner in Support of PHV Application, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(VAN DRIESEN, LAUREN)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 TEXT ORDER: Per counsel's request, and with consent, the Court will prepone the initial conference in this matter to 7/31/23 at 10:30 a.m., and will conduct that conference via Zoom. The Court will circulate connection information on the day of the conference. Going forward, unless and until these matters are formally consolidated, counsel are directed to file all correspondence in each individual matter. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/5/23. (tjd)
June 23, 2023 Filing 70 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC. (VAN DRIESEN, LAUREN)
June 22, 2023 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW F. GATELY on behalf of All Plaintiffs (GATELY, MATTHEW)
June 22, 2023 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER S. PEARLMAN on behalf of All Plaintiffs (PEARLMAN, PETER)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor in courtroom 4D on 8/1/23 at 10:00 AM. Local counsel must be present. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order (for Judge Salas cases, please use her dedicated PTSO found in the same location) found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/20/23. (tjg, )
June 22, 2023 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, )
June 20, 2023 Filing 66 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC.(WALSH, LIZA)
June 20, 2023 Filing 65 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC.(VAN DRIESEN, LAUREN)
June 20, 2023 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN E. VAN DRIESEN on behalf of GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC (VAN DRIESEN, LAUREN)
June 15, 2023 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by HECTOR DANIEL RUIZ on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC (RUIZ, HECTOR)
June 15, 2023 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by LIZA M. WALSH on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC (WALSH, LIZA)
May 31, 2023 Filing 61 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:23-cv-00429. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 31, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, )
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING #28 MOTION TO TRANSFER TO USDC FOR THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY. DEFENDANTS' JOINT #30 MOTION TO STAY IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 5/30/23. 5/31/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va)
May 30, 2023 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM SIGNED BY HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 5/30/23. 5/31/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
April 17, 2023 Filing 58 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Brinna Ludwig on behalf of GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC(Ludwig, Brinna)
March 27, 2023 Filing 57 Response re #54 Notice (Other),, / Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Notice Regarding Defendants' Motion to Transfer by GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. (GUNDERSON, KARL)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATIONS FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE FOR ATTORNEY BRUCE E. GERSTEIN AND DAN LITVIN IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 3/24/2023. 3/24/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE FOR KRISTYN FIELDS IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 3/23/2023.3/24/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
March 24, 2023 Filing 54 NOTICE by AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORP., AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP., BURLINGTON DRUG COMPANY, INC., CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, CARDINAL HEALTH P.R. 120, INC., CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., DAKOTA DRUG, INC., H.D. SMITH, LLC, J M SMITH CORPORATION, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MLI RX LLC, NORTH CAROLINA MUTUAL WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY, PRESCRIPTION SUPPLY, INC., THE HARVARD DRUG GROUP, L.L.C., VALLEY WHOLESALE DRUG CO., LLC, VALUE DRUG COMPANY re #28 MOTION to Transfer , #30 MOTION to Stay Case PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER (SORENSEN, DAVID)
March 23, 2023 Filing 53 REPLY to Response to Motion re #28 MOTION to Transfer filed by GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. (GUNDERSON, KARL)
March 23, 2023 Filing 52 REPLY to Response to Motion re #30 MOTION to Stay Case filed by GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. (O'DONNELL, MELISSA)
March 21, 2023 Filing 51 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Kristyn Fields ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16575208.) filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORP., AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP., BURLINGTON DRUG COMPANY, INC., CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, CARDINAL HEALTH P.R. 120, INC., CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., DAKOTA DRUG, INC., H.D. SMITH, LLC, J M SMITH CORPORATION, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MLI RX LLC, NORTH CAROLINA MUTUAL WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY, PRESCRIPTION SUPPLY, INC., THE HARVARD DRUG GROUP, L.L.C., VALLEY WHOLESALE DRUG CO., LLC, VALUE DRUG COMPANY.Certificate of Service.(KOHN, PETER)
March 20, 2023 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by JAY P. LEFKOWITZ on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. with Certificate of Service(LEFKOWITZ, JAY)
March 20, 2023 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by GILAD BENDHEIM on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. with Certificate of Service(BENDHEIM, GILAD)
March 20, 2023 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by DEVORA W. ALLON on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. with Certificate of Service(ALLON, DEVORA)
March 17, 2023 Filing 47 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dan Litvin by AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORP., AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP., BURLINGTON DRUG COMPANY, INC., CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, CARDINAL HEALTH P.R. 120, INC., CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., DAKOTA DRUG, INC., H.D. SMITH, LLC, J M SMITH CORPORATION, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MLI RX LLC, NORTH CAROLINA MUTUAL WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY, PRESCRIPTION SUPPLY, INC., THE HARVARD DRUG GROUP, L.L.C., VALLEY WHOLESALE DRUG CO., LLC, VALUE DRUG COMPANY. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16569739.). (COSLETT, CAITLIN)
March 17, 2023 Filing 46 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bruce E. Gerstein by AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORP., AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP., BURLINGTON DRUG COMPANY, INC., CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, CARDINAL HEALTH P.R. 120, INC., CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., DAKOTA DRUG, INC., H.D. SMITH, LLC, J M SMITH CORPORATION, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MLI RX LLC, NORTH CAROLINA MUTUAL WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY, PRESCRIPTION SUPPLY, INC., THE HARVARD DRUG GROUP, L.L.C., VALLEY WHOLESALE DRUG CO., LLC, VALUE DRUG COMPANY. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16569721.). (COSLETT, CAITLIN)
March 17, 2023 Filing 45 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including GloxoSmithKline LLC by GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC.(O'DONNELL, MELISSA)
March 16, 2023 Filing 44 Joinder of Defendants' Motion to Stay Case (Dkt. No.30) and Motion to Transfer (Dkt. No. 28) filed by TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD..Certificate of Service.(GUNDERSON, KARL) Modified on 3/17/2023 (lisad, ).
March 16, 2023 Filing 43 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD..(GUNDERSON, KARL)
March 16, 2023 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by KARL GUNDERSON on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. with Certificate of Service(GUNDERSON, KARL)
March 16, 2023 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 MOTION to Stay Case filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORP., AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP., BURLINGTON DRUG COMPANY, INC., CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, CARDINAL HEALTH P.R. 120, INC., CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., DAKOTA DRUG, INC., H.D. SMITH, LLC, J M SMITH CORPORATION, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MLI RX LLC, NORTH CAROLINA MUTUAL WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY, PRESCRIPTION SUPPLY, INC., THE HARVARD DRUG GROUP, L.L.C., VALLEY WHOLESALE DRUG CO., LLC, VALUE DRUG COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SORENSEN, DAVID)
March 16, 2023 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 MOTION to Transfer filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORP., AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP., BURLINGTON DRUG COMPANY, INC., CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, CARDINAL HEALTH P.R. 120, INC., CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., DAKOTA DRUG, INC., H.D. SMITH, LLC, J M SMITH CORPORATION, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MLI RX LLC, NORTH CAROLINA MUTUAL WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY, PRESCRIPTION SUPPLY, INC., THE HARVARD DRUG GROUP, L.L.C., VALLEY WHOLESALE DRUG CO., LLC, VALUE DRUG COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Peter Kohn in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(SORENSEN, DAVID)
March 7, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Brinna Ludwig on behalf of GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC with Certificate of Service(Ludwig, Brinna)
March 7, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Brianna Alunni on behalf of GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC with Certificate of Service(Alunni, Brianna)
March 7, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA HATCH O'DONNELL on behalf of GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC with Certificate of Service(O'DONNELL, MELISSA)
March 7, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J. BOLAND on behalf of GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC with Certificate of Service(BOLAND, DANIEL)
March 7, 2023 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBIN P. SUMNER on behalf of GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC with Certificate of Service(SUMNER, ROBIN)
March 7, 2023 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by JAY P. LEFKOWITZ on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(LEFKOWITZ, JAY)
March 7, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by GILAD BENDHEIM on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(BENDHEIM, GILAD)
March 7, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by DEVORA W. ALLON on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(ALLON, DEVORA)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF DEVORA W. ALLON, ESQUIRE, JAY P. LEFKOWITZ, ESQUIRE AND GILAD BENDHEIM, ESQUIRE, THE FILING FEES HAVING BEEN PAID, IT IS ORDERED THAT THE MOTIONS FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF DEVORA W. ALLEN, ESQUIRE #25 , JAY P. LEFKOWITZ, ESQUIRE #26 AND GILAD BENDHEIM, ESQUIRE #27 , ARE GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 3/6/23.3/7/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED, MAILED TO UNREP.(bw)
March 2, 2023 Filing 30 MOTION to Stay Case filed by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(GUNDERSON, KARL)
March 2, 2023 Filing 29 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. with Certificate of Service by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..(GUNDERSON, KARL)
March 2, 2023 Filing 28 MOTION to Transfer filed by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..Memorandum of Law, Declaration, Proposed Order, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Declaration of Gilad Bendheim and Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(GUNDERSON, KARL)
March 2, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Gilad Bendheim ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16536643.) filed by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..Proposed Order, Certificate of Service.(GUNDERSON, KARL)
March 2, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Jay P. Lefkowitz ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16536642.) filed by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..Proposed Order, Certificate of Service.(GUNDERSON, KARL)
March 2, 2023 Filing 25 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Devora W. Allon ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16536639.) filed by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..Proposed Order, Certificate of Service.(GUNDERSON, KARL)
March 2, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by KARL GUNDERSON on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (GUNDERSON, KARL)
March 1, 2023 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service re Served Summons and Complaint upon Defendant GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Defendant Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc., and Defendant Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(COSLETT, CAITLIN)
February 14, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER R. KOHN on behalf of AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORP., AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP., BURLINGTON DRUG COMPANY, INC., CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, CARDINAL HEALTH P.R. 120, INC., CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., DAKOTA DRUG, INC., H.D. SMITH, LLC, J M SMITH CORPORATION, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MLI RX LLC, NORTH CAROLINA MUTUAL WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY, PRESCRIPTION SUPPLY, INC., THE HARVARD DRUG GROUP, L.L.C., VALLEY WHOLESALE DRUG CO., LLC, VALUE DRUG COMPANY with Certificate of Service(KOHN, PETER)
February 13, 2023 Filing 22 COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS SENT TO TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. VIA FEDEX, TRACKING NUMBER 7712 7480 3283. (sg) (sg).
February 6, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by CAITLIN G. COSLETT on behalf of AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORP., AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP., BURLINGTON DRUG COMPANY, INC., CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, CARDINAL HEALTH P.R. 120, INC., CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., DAKOTA DRUG, INC., H.D. SMITH, LLC, J M SMITH CORPORATION, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MLI RX LLC, NORTH CAROLINA MUTUAL WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY, PRESCRIPTION SUPPLY, INC., THE HARVARD DRUG GROUP, L.L.C., VALLEY WHOLESALE DRUG CO., LLC, VALUE DRUG COMPANY with Certificate of Service(COSLETT, CAITLIN)
February 6, 2023 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. (amas)
February 3, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE by AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORP., AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP., BURLINGTON DRUG COMPANY, INC., CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, CARDINAL HEALTH P.R. 120, INC., CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., DAKOTA DRUG, INC., H.D. SMITH, LLC, J M SMITH CORPORATION, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MLI RX LLC, NORTH CAROLINA MUTUAL WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY, PRESCRIPTION SUPPLY, INC., THE HARVARD DRUG GROUP, L.L.C., VALLEY WHOLESALE DRUG CO., LLC, VALUE DRUG COMPANY re #1 Complaint (Attorney),, COMPLETED Designation Form (SORENSEN, DAVID)
February 3, 2023 Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED Designation Form in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Related Case section is incomplete. A signature is needed. (sbt)
February 2, 2023 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including wholly owned by Generic Drug Holdings, LLC, which is wholly owned by HDG Acquisition, LLC, which is wholly owned by Cardinal Health 110, LLC, which is wholly owned by Cardinal Health, Inc., which is a publicly traded company with Certificate of Service by THE HARVARD DRUG GROUP, L.L.C..(SORENSEN, DAVID)
February 2, 2023 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by VALUE DRUG COMPANY.(SORENSEN, DAVID)
February 2, 2023 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by J M SMITH CORPORATION.(SORENSEN, DAVID)
February 2, 2023 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by PRESCRIPTION SUPPLY, INC..(SORENSEN, DAVID)
February 2, 2023 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by NORTH CAROLINA MUTUAL WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY.(SORENSEN, DAVID)
February 2, 2023 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by DAKOTA DRUG, INC..(SORENSEN, DAVID)
February 2, 2023 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by BURLINGTON DRUG COMPANY, INC..(SORENSEN, DAVID)
February 2, 2023 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by MCKESSON CORPORATION.(SORENSEN, DAVID)
February 2, 2023 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Cardinal Health, Inc. with Certificate of Service by CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC.(SORENSEN, DAVID)
February 2, 2023 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Cardinal Health, Inc. with Certificate of Service by CARDINAL HEALTH P.R. 120, INC..(SORENSEN, DAVID)
February 2, 2023 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CARDINAL HEALTH, INC..(SORENSEN, DAVID)
February 2, 2023 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including H.D. Smith, LLC, H.D. Smith Holdings, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation, and AmerisourceBergen Corporation with Certificate of Service by VALLEY WHOLESALE DRUG CO., LLC.(SORENSEN, DAVID)
February 2, 2023 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including H.D. Smith Holdings, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation, and AmerisourceBergen Corporation with Certificate of Service by H.D. SMITH, LLC.(SORENSEN, DAVID)
February 2, 2023 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including AmerisourceBergen Services Corp. and AmerisourceBergen Corporation with Certificate of Service by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP..(SORENSEN, DAVID)
February 2, 2023 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORP..(SORENSEN, DAVID)
February 2, 2023 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by MLI RX LLC.(SORENSEN, DAVID)
February 2, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16476801.), filed by BURLINGTON DRUG COMPANY, INC., CARDINAL HEALTH P.R. 120, INC., PRESCRIPTION SUPPLY, INC., AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORP., MLI RX LLC, VALUE DRUG COMPANY, NORTH CAROLINA MUTUAL WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY, CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP., CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, DAKOTA DRUG, INC., J M SMITH CORPORATION, THE HARVARD DRUG GROUP, L.L.C., H.D. SMITH, LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, VALLEY WHOLESALE DRUG CO., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(SORENSEN, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MLI RX LLC et al v. GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC formerly known as SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION doing business as GLAXOSMITHKLINE
Represented By: LAUREN E. VAN DRIESEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION
Represented By: LAUREN E. VAN DRIESEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD
Represented By: HECTOR DANIEL RUIZ
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Represented By: HECTOR DANIEL RUIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MLI RX LLC
Represented By: MATTHEW F. GATELY
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORP.
Represented By: MATTHEW F. GATELY
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP.
Represented By: MATTHEW F. GATELY
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.D. SMITH, LLC
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Represented By: MATTHEW F. GATELY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALLEY WHOLESALE DRUG CO., LLC
Represented By: MATTHEW F. GATELY
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARDINAL HEALTH INC.
Represented By: MATTHEW F. GATELY
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARDINAL HEALTH P.R. 120, INC.
Represented By: MATTHEW F. GATELY
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE HARVARD DRUG GROUP, L.L.C.
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Represented By: MATTHEW F. GATELY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARDINAL HEALTH 110, LLC
Represented By: MATTHEW F. GATELY
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Represented By: MATTHEW F. GATELY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BURLINGTON DRUG COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: MATTHEW F. GATELY
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAKOTA DRUG, INC.
Represented By: MATTHEW F. GATELY
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTH CAROLINA MUTUAL WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY
Represented By: MATTHEW F. GATELY
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J M SMITH CORPORATION doing business as SMITH DRUG COMPANY
Represented By: MATTHEW F. GATELY
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALUE DRUG COMPANY
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Represented By: MATTHEW F. GATELY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prescription Supply, Inc.
Represented By: MATTHEW F. GATELY
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?