SULLIVAN v. HSA CLEANING, INC.
Petitioner: NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD and SUZANNE SULLIVAN
Respondent: HSA CLEANING, INC.
Amicus Curiae: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 32BJ
Case Number: 2:2023cv02994
Filed: June 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE by HSA CLEANING, INC.. (SOLOMON, DAVID)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SUZANNE SULLIVAN re #23 Order, Certificate of Service of Order Granting Temporary Injunction (SILVERSTEIN, MICHAEL)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting Temporary Injunction and that service of a copy of this Order, shall be forthwith made upon Respondents by an agent of the Board in any manner provided in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for the United States District Courts or by certified mail and that proof of such service be filed herein. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 7/6/2023. (jd, )
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 7/6/2023. (jd, )
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #6 and #16 Motion of SERVICE EMPLOYEES INT'L UNION, LOCAL 32BJ to Appear Amicus Curiae in support of Petitioner. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 7/6/2023. (jd, )
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #3 Motion for protective Order allowing to Redact Affidavits and Documentary evidence. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 7/6/2023. (jd, )
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #2 Petitioner's Motion to use Administrative Record from ALJ Hearing as Reasonable Cause Evidence. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 7/6/2023. (jd, )
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kevin McNulty: Show Cause Hearing held on 6/29/2023. Hearing on #5 Order to show cause why respondent should not be temporarily enjoined. Decision Reserved. (Court Reporter, Mary Jo Monteleone (973-645-3833)) (nic, )
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #17 Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF filed by DAVID SLUTSKY on 6/28/2023, was submitted incorrectly as a NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. For future reference please submit the Notice using the "Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF" event; Found under Civil, Other filings. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes and no further action is required. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jd, )
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice counsel, BRENT GARREN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jd, )
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID MARK SLUTSKY on behalf of SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 32BJ (SLUTSKY, DAVID)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 UNOPPOSED Motion to Appear Amicus Curiae by DAVID MARK SLUTSKY on behalf of SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 32BJ (SLUTSKY, DAVID) Modified on 6/29/2023 (dam).
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Letter. (SLUTSKY, DAVID)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SUZANNE SULLIVAN re #13 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion, (COSLOY, JAIME)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by SUZANNE SULLIVAN re #2 MOTION Motion to Use Administrative Record from ALJ Hearing as Reasonable Cause Evidence re #1 Complaint, PETITIONERS REPLY TO RESPONDENTS OPPOSITION TO THE PETITION FOR SECTION 10(J) INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (COSLOY, JAIME)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee: BRENT GARREN $ 150, receipt number TRE133263. (mlh)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 8/14/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/22/2023. (seb)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Opposition ANSWER to Complaint Show Cause Order by HSA CLEANING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Counsel, #2 Certificate of Service Certification of Service)(SOLOMON, DAVID)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SUZANNE SULLIVAN re #5 Order to Show Cause (SILVERSTEIN, MICHAEL)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to BRENT GARREN. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/12/2023. (jd, )
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae, #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion set for 7/3/2023 before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jd, )
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 32BJ. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brent Garren, #2 Declaration of David Slutsky, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(SLUTSKY, DAVID)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 32BJ re #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae (SLUTSKY, DAVID)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae by SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 32BJ. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SLUTSKY, DAVID)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Hearing set for 6/29/2023 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Post office & Courthouse, 1 Federal Square, Courtroom 4, before Judge Kevin McNulty. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 6/5/2023. (jd, )
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 COMPLAINT against HSA CLEANING, INC., filed by SUZANNE SULLIVAN.(SILVERSTEIN, MICHAEL)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #1 -1 Complaint submitted by MICHAEL SILVERSTEIN on 6/1/2023 contains an improper signature. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC OR SCANNED SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jd, )
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Redact #1 Complaint and #2 MOTION to Use Administrative Record from ALJ Hearing as Reasonable Cause Evidence Motion set for 7/3/2023 before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jd, )
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (ak, )
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Redact #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION Motion to Use Administrative Record from ALJ Hearing as Reasonable Cause Evidence re #1 Complaint, by NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Grant Protective Order and Motion to Redact)(SILVERSTEIN, MICHAEL)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION Motion to Use Administrative Record from ALJ Hearing as Reasonable Cause Evidence re #1 Complaint, by NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petitioner Exhibits 1 through 5, #2 Exhibit Petioner Exhibit 6a - ALJ Hearing Transcript Day 1, #3 Exhibit Petitioner Exhibit 6b - ALJ Hearing Transcript Day 2, #4 Exhibit Petitioner Exhibit 6c - ALJ Hearing Transcript Day 3, #5 Exhibit Petitioner Exhibit 7a - GC and Respondent Exhibits from ALJ Hearing, #6 Exhibit Confidential Witness Affidavit of Claudio Saldana)(SILVERSTEIN, MICHAEL)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HSA CLEANING, INC., filed by NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Petition Rider, #3 Declaration Regional Director Sullivan Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Show Cause, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Section 10j Injunction, #6 Brief Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Petition)(SILVERSTEIN, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SULLIVAN v. HSA CLEANING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD
Represented By: JAIME COSLOY
Represented By: MICHAEL P. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SUZANNE SULLIVAN
Represented By: JAIME COSLOY
Represented By: MICHAEL P. SILVERSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: HSA CLEANING, INC.
Represented By: DAVID ISAAC SOLOMON
Represented By: JOHN RONALD VREELAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 32BJ
Represented By: DAVID MARK SLUTSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?