IN RE: FRAGRANCE INDIRECT PURCHASER ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Plaintiff: CHAUTAUQUA SOAP COMPANY and ALEXIA DAHMES individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated doing business as ALEXIA VIOLA NAPA VALLEY
Defendant: GIVAUDAN S.A., GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, GIVAUDAN FLAVORS CORPORATION, UNGERER & COMPANY, INC., INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES, INC., Symrise AG, SYMRISE INC., SYMRISE US LLC, FIRMENICH INTERNATIONAL S.A., FIRMENICH INCORPORATED, AGILEX FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES, INC., CUSTOM ESSENCE INCORPORATED, GIVAUDAN ROURE INC. and FIRMENICH SA
In Re: FRAGRANCE INDIRECT PURCHASER ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Case Number: 2:2023cv03249
Filed: June 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jessica S Allen
Referring Judge: William J Martini
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Interim Lead Counsel, Steering Committee, And Liaison Counsel For Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class by ALEXIA DAHMES, CHAUTAUQUA SOAP COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Joseph J. DePalma, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(DEPALMA, JOSEPH)
August 10, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN REED REICH on behalf of CUSTOM ESSENCE INCORPORATED, GIVAUDAN FLAVORS CORPORATION, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, GIVAUDAN ROURE INC., UNGERER & COMPANY, INC. (REICH, KEVIN)
August 9, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel E. Gustafson, Daniel C. Hedlund, Dennis Stewart and Michelle J. Looby. Motion set for 9/5/2023 before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (wh)
August 8, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel E. Gustafson, Daniel C. Hedlund, Dennis Stewart and Michelle J. Looby by ALEXIA DAHMES d/b/a ALEXIA VIOLA NAPA VALLEY. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Joseph J. DePalma, Esq., #2 Certification of Daniel E. Gustafson, Esq., #3 Certification of Daniel C. Hedlund, Esq., #4 Certification of Dennis Stewart, Esq., #5 Certification of Michelle J. Looby, Esq., #6 Text of Proposed Order)(DEPALMA, JOSEPH)
August 8, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by SEAN PATRICK MCCONNELL on behalf of AGILEX FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES, INC., FIRMENICH INCORPORATED (MCCONNELL, SEAN)
August 8, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH O'LAUGHLIN KULIK on behalf of AGILEX FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES, INC., FIRMENICH INCORPORATED (KULIK, SARAH)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER. The above-captioned Actions, Civil Actions 23-3249 (WJM)(JSA) and 23-3547 (WJM)(JSA), are hereby consolidated for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 8/4/2023. (qa, )
July 28, 2023 Filing 15 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER by CHAUTAUQUA SOAP COMPANY. (DEPALMA, JOSEPH) Modified on 7/31/2023 (wh).
July 25, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHAUTAUQUA SOAP COMPANY. SYMRISE US LLC served on 7/11/2023, answer due 8/1/2023. (DEPALMA, JOSEPH)
July 25, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHAUTAUQUA SOAP COMPANY. SYMRISE INC. served on 7/11/2023, answer due 8/1/2023. (DEPALMA, JOSEPH)
July 25, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHAUTAUQUA SOAP COMPANY. FIRMENICH INCORPORATED served on 7/11/2023, answer due 8/1/2023. (DEPALMA, JOSEPH)
July 25, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHAUTAUQUA SOAP COMPANY. UNGERER & COMPANY, INC. served on 7/11/2023, answer due 8/1/2023. (DEPALMA, JOSEPH)
July 25, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHAUTAUQUA SOAP COMPANY. GIVAUDAN FLAVORS CORPORATION served on 7/11/2023, answer due 8/1/2023. (DEPALMA, JOSEPH)
July 25, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHAUTAUQUA SOAP COMPANY. GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION served on 7/11/2023, answer due 8/1/2023. (DEPALMA, JOSEPH)
July 25, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHAUTAUQUA SOAP COMPANY. AGILEX FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES, INC. served on 7/11/2023, answer due 8/1/2023. (DEPALMA, JOSEPH)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge James B. Clark recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/26/2023. (wh)
June 16, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE B. DERENZE on behalf of CHAUTAUQUA SOAP COMPANY (DERENZE, CATHERINE)
June 16, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MINDEE J. REUBEN on behalf of CHAUTAUQUA SOAP COMPANY (REUBEN, MINDEE)
June 16, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH J. DEPALMA on behalf of CHAUTAUQUA SOAP COMPANY (DEPALMA, JOSEPH)
June 14, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHAUTAUQUA SOAP COMPANY. (FINLEY, ALEC)
June 14, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AGILEX FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES, INC., FIRMENICH INCORPORATED, FIRMENICH INTERNATIONAL S.A., GIVAUDAN FLAVORS CORPORATION, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, GIVAUDAN S.A., INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES, INC., SYMRISE AG, SYMRISE INC., SYMRISE US LLC, UNGERER & COMPANY, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (wh)
June 14, 2023 Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark added. (ps)
June 14, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party or intervenor. Please refer to the Court's website at #www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (wh)
June 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AGILEX FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES, INC., FIRMENICH INCORPORATED, FIRMENICH INTERNATIONAL S.A., GIVAUDAN FLAVORS CORPORATION, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, GIVAUDAN S.A., INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES, INC., SYMRISE INC., SYMRISE US LLC, Symrise AG, UNGERER & COMPANY, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14387148) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CHAUTAUQUA SOAP COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(FINLEY, ALEC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: FRAGRANCE INDIRECT PURCHASER ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHAUTAUQUA SOAP COMPANY
Represented By: ALEC BLAINE FINLEY, JR.
Represented By: JOSEPH J. DEPALMA
Represented By: MINDEE J. REUBEN
Represented By: CATHERINE B. DERENZE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXIA DAHMES individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated doing business as ALEXIA VIOLA NAPA VALLEY
Represented By: JOSEPH J. DEPALMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIVAUDAN S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION
Represented By: KEVIN REED REICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIVAUDAN FLAVORS CORPORATION
Represented By: KEVIN REED REICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNGERER & COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: KEVIN REED REICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symrise AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYMRISE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYMRISE US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRMENICH INTERNATIONAL S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRMENICH INCORPORATED
Represented By: SARAH O'LAUGHLIN KULIK
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK MCCONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGILEX FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES, INC.
Represented By: SARAH O'LAUGHLIN KULIK
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK MCCONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CUSTOM ESSENCE INCORPORATED
Represented By: KEVIN REED REICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIVAUDAN ROURE INC.
Represented By: KEVIN REED REICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRMENICH SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: FRAGRANCE INDIRECT PURCHASER ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?