TFORCE FREIGHT, INC. v. CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.
Plaintiff: TFORCE FREIGHT, INC.
Defendant: CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2023cv03263
Filed: June 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Interstate Commerce Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2023 Filing 10 Letter from Thomas C. Martin, Esq.. (MARTIN, THOMAS)
August 4, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #10 Letter Requesting an Automatic Extension of a Dispositive Motion pursuant to Loc. Civ. R. 7.1(d)(5) filed by THOMAS C. MARTIN on 8/4/2023 was submitted using the CM/ECF Event, Letter. For future reference, please refer to the CM/ECF Event, Letter Rule 7.1, which can be found under Responses and Replies as well as Other Filings, Other Documents. This message is for informational purposes only. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dam)
August 4, 2023 Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion reset for 9/5/2023 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam)
July 21, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Bill of Lading)(CAPUZZI, KEVIN)
July 21, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 8/21/2023 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam)
June 27, 2023 Clerk's Text Order - The document #7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CISCO SYSTEMS, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/21/2023. (dam)
June 26, 2023 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.. (CAPUZZI, KEVIN)
June 26, 2023 Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Reply to Complaint. Attorney KEVIN M. CAPUZZI for CISCO SYSTEMS, INC. added. (CAPUZZI, KEVIN)
June 20, 2023 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Appearance, Corporate Disclosure served on Johnnie Myers on 06/16/2023, filed by TFORCE FREIGHT, INC.. (MARTIN, THOMAS)
June 15, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam)
June 14, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM D. BIERMAN on behalf of TFORCE FREIGHT, INC. (BIERMAN, WILLIAM)
June 14, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS C. MARTIN on behalf of TFORCE FREIGHT, INC. (MARTIN, THOMAS)
June 14, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TFORCE FREIGHT, INC.. (MARTIN, THOMAS)
June 14, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CISCO SYSTEMS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14388984), filed by TFORCE FREIGHT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MARTIN, THOMAS)
June 14, 2023 Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TFORCE FREIGHT, INC. v. CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TFORCE FREIGHT, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS C. MARTIN
Represented By: WILLIAM D. BIERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: KEVIN M. CAPUZZI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?