COSPRO DEVELOPMENT CORP. v. INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC. et al
Plaintiff: COSPRO DEVELOPMENT CORP.
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC., GIVAUDAN SA, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORP., DSM-FIRMENICH AG, FIRMENICH INTERNATIONAL SA, FIRMENICH INC., AGILEX FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES, INC., SYMRISE AG and SYMRISE INC.
Case Number: 2:2023cv03368
Filed: June 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jessica S Allen
Referring Judge: James B Clark
2 Judge: William J Martini
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2023 Filing 16 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Joshua H. Grabar to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-14494414.) (COSLETT, CAITLIN)
July 31, 2023 Filing 15 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Marc H. Edelson to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-14494411.) (COSLETT, CAITLIN)
July 31, 2023 Filing 14 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Eric L. Cramer to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-14494381.) (COSLETT, CAITLIN)
July 31, 2023 Filing 13 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Candice J. Enders to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-14494371.) (COSLETT, CAITLIN)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge James B. Clark recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 7/19/2023. (ld, )
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to JOSHUA H. GRABAR, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/29/2023. (ld, )
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to MARC H. EDELSON, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/29/2023. (ld, )
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to ERIC L. CRAMER, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/29/2023. (ld, )
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to CANDICE J. ENDERS, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/29/2023. (ld, )
June 29, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Marc H. Edelson), #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Eric L. Cramer), #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Joshua H. Grabar), #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Candice J. Enders). Motion set for 8/7/2023 before Judge William J. Martini. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
June 28, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Joshua H. Grabar) by COSPRO DEVELOPMENT CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Caitlin G. Coslett, #2 Declaration of Joshua H. Grabar, #3 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(COSLETT, CAITLIN)
June 28, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Marc H. Edelson) by COSPRO DEVELOPMENT CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Caitlin G. Coslett, #2 Declaration of Marc H. Edelson, #3 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(COSLETT, CAITLIN)
June 28, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Eric L. Cramer) by COSPRO DEVELOPMENT CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Caitlin G. Coslett, #2 Certification of Eric L. Cramer, #3 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(COSLETT, CAITLIN)
June 28, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Candice J. Enders) by COSPRO DEVELOPMENT CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Caitlin G. Coslett, #2 Certification of Candice J. Enders, #3 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(COSLETT, CAITLIN)
June 21, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AGILEX FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES, INC., DSM-FIRMENICH AG, FIRMENICH INC., FIRMENICH INTERNATIONAL SA, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORP., GIVAUDAN SA, INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC., SYMRISE AG, SYMRISE INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
June 20, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by COSPRO DEVELOPMENT CORP. identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (COSLETT, CAITLIN)
June 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AGILEX FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES, INC., DSM-FIRMENICH AG, FIRMENICH INC., FIRMENICH INTERNATIONAL SA, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORP., GIVAUDAN SA, INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC., SYMRISE AG, SYMRISE INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number BNJDC-14400053) with JURY DEMAND, filed by COSPRO DEVELOPMENT CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(COSLETT, CAITLIN)
June 20, 2023 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COSPRO DEVELOPMENT CORP. v. INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COSPRO DEVELOPMENT CORP.
Represented By: CAITLIN G. COSLETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIVAUDAN SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSM-FIRMENICH AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRMENICH INTERNATIONAL SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRMENICH INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGILEX FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYMRISE AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYMRISE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?