Tesfast, LLC et al v. Fastmed, LLC et al
Plaintiff: TESFAST, LLC, Alexander Katz, Aaron Kraminer, Joseph Krausz and Simon Apel
Defendant: FASTMED, LLC, Yonah Carlebach, Dr. Richard Afonja, Eric Bober and COUNTY OF BERGEN
Case Number: 2:2023cv03594
Filed: July 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Michael E Farbiarz
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2023 Judge Michael E. Farbiarz and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark added. (ps)
July 5, 2023 Filing 52 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:23-cv-00249. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: For reasons set forth at the status conference today, with counsel for all parties agreeing the case should be venued in the District of New Jersey, it is hereby ORDERED that this case be transferred forthwith to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. The waiting period of Local Rule 83.1 shall not apply. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 7/5/2023) (ate)
July 5, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Seibel: Pre-Motion Conference held on 7/5/2023. Plaintiffs' counsel Scott Levenson, Esq. appears telephonically. Defendants' counsel Jacob Rubinstein, Esq. appears telephonically. Law Clerk Saniya Suri appears telephonically. The Court will not enter a Default as to the Defendant(s) as the Court finds no prejudice or willfulness on the Defendants' part. This case will be transferred to the District of New Jersey on the consent of the parties. The Court will issue an Order. This proceeding was recorded via the AT&T Teleconference platform. (wc)
July 5, 2023 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of New Jersey. (ate)
June 14, 2023 Filing 50 NOTICE RE: CHANGE OF TIME OF CONFERENCE: The Pre-Motion Conference previously scheduled before this Court for July 5, 2023 at 2:30 p.m. will be held at 10:15 a.m. (same date) via telephone. Pursuant to Judge Seibel's Emergency Individual Rules and Practices in light of COVID-19, last revised on July 29, 2021, the parties are directed to attend by phone using the following information: Toll-Free Tele-conference number: (877) 336 1839 to call in and enter access code: 1047966#. Telephone Conference set for 7/5/2023 at 10:15 AM before Judge Cathy Seibel..(mml)
June 8, 2023 Filing 49 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Jacob Rubinstein, Esq. dated 6/5/2023 re: Letter Request by Judge Seibel Explaining Delayed FIling. Document filed by Richard Afonja, Eric Bober, Yonah Carlebach, Fastmed, LLC..(Rubinstein, Jacob)
June 6, 2023 NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only..(kgo)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER deferring ruling on #46 Motion for Entry of Default: It appears that Defendants Fastmed, Carlebach, Afonja and Bober were to respond to the Complaint by 4/13/23. On 4/21/23 they filed a pre-motion letter, which under my rules stays the time to respond. But they have not explained why they did not file until 4/21/23. And when their filing was bounced back for a filing error, they did not refile until today (perhaps awakened by Plaintiffs' request for entry of default). The Court will hold a conference on 7/5/23 at 2:30 pm (in person). Defendants shall explain by letter, no later than 6/21/23, why they did not timely respond to the Complaint. Plaintiffs may reply no later than 6/28/23. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
June 2, 2023 Filing 47 FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - SECOND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Document filed by Richard Afonja, Eric Bober, Yonah Carlebach, Fastmed, LLC..(Rubinstein, Jacob) Modified on 6/2/2023 (kj).
June 2, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - PDF ERROR. Notice to Attorney Jacob Rubinstein to RE-FILE Document #47 SECOND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Wrong PDF Attached. (kj)
June 1, 2023 Filing 46 MOTION for Entry of Default as to FASTMED, LLC, YONAH CARLEBACH, DR. RICHARD AFONJA, ERIC BOBER . Document filed by Simon Apel, Alexander Katz, Aaron Kraminer, Joseph Krausz, Tesfast, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affirmation of Scott C. Levenson).(Levenson, Scott)
April 21, 2023 Filing 45 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference to dismiss Plaintiff's complaint addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Jacob Rubinstein dated 4/20/2023. Document filed by Richard Afonja, Eric Bober, Yonah Carlebach, Fastmed, LLC..(Rubinstein, Jacob) Modified on 4/21/2023 (kj).
April 21, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Jacob Rubinstein to RE-FILE Document #45 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference to dismiss Plaintiff's complaint addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Jacob Rubinstein dated 4/20/2023.. ERROR(S): Incomplete Document (i.e., No signature or s/).. (kj)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Plaintiffs in this action, TESFAST, L.L.C., ALEX KATZ, AARON KRAMINER, JOSEPH KRAUSZ and SIMON APEL, hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice, against the following Defendant: THE COUNTY OF BERGEN. SO ORDERED. County of Bergen terminated. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 4/12/2023) (vfr) Modified on 4/12/2023 (vfr).
April 12, 2023 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #43 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Cathy Seibel for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp)
April 11, 2023 Filing 43 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) County of Bergen. Document filed by Aaron Kraminer, Alexander Katz, Joseph Krausz, Tesfast, LLC, Simon Apel. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Levenson, Scott)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #9 Complaint or otherwise respond addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Philip W Lamparello dated 04/07/2023. Defendant County of Bergen's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended until May 12, 2023. SO ORDERED. #9 Complaint,. County of Bergen answer due 5/12/2023. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 4/7/2023) (vfr)
April 7, 2023 Filing 41 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #9 Complaint, or otherwise respond addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Philip W Lamparello dated 04/07/2023. Document filed by County of Bergen..(Lamparello, Philip)
April 6, 2023 Filing 40 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Richard Afonja served on 3/23/2023, answer due 4/13/2023. Service was accepted by Miran Lopez Authorized Agent. Document filed by Aaron Kraminer; Alexander Katz; Joseph Krausz; Tesfast, LLC; Simon Apel..(Levenson, Scott)
April 6, 2023 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Eric Bober served on 3/23/2023, answer due 4/13/2023. Service was accepted by Miran Lopez Authorized Agent. Document filed by Aaron Kraminer; Alexander Katz; Joseph Krausz; Tesfast, LLC; Simon Apel..(Levenson, Scott)
April 6, 2023 Filing 38 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Yonah Carlebach served on 3/23/2023, answer due 4/13/2023. Service was accepted by Miran Lopez Authorized Agent. Document filed by Aaron Kraminer; Alexander Katz; Joseph Krausz; Tesfast, LLC..(Levenson, Scott)
April 6, 2023 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Fastmed, LLC served on 3/23/2023, answer due 4/13/2023. Service was accepted by Miran Lopez Authorized Agent. Document filed by Aaron Kraminer; Alexander Katz; Joseph Krausz; Tesfast, LLC; Simon Apel..(Levenson, Scott)
April 6, 2023 Filing 36 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. County of Bergen served on 3/23/2023, answer due 4/13/2023. Service was accepted by Marilyn Johnson Executive Assistant. Document filed by Aaron Kraminer; Alexander Katz; Joseph Krausz; Tesfast, LLC..(Levenson, Scott)
February 10, 2023 Filing 35 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fastmed, LLC. (vf)
February 10, 2023 Filing 34 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Eric Bober. (vf)
February 10, 2023 Filing 33 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Yonah Carlebach. (vf)
February 10, 2023 Filing 32 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to County of Bergen. (vf)
February 10, 2023 Filing 31 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Richard Afonja. (vf)
February 9, 2023 Filing 30 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FASTMED, LLC, re: #9 Complaint,. Document filed by Simon Apel, Alexander Katz, Aaron Kraminer, Joseph Krausz, Tesfast, LLC..(Levenson, Scott)
February 9, 2023 Filing 29 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ERIC BOBER, re: #9 Complaint,. Document filed by Simon Apel, Alexander Katz, Aaron Kraminer, Joseph Krausz, Tesfast, LLC..(Levenson, Scott)
February 9, 2023 Filing 28 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to YONAH CARLEBACH, re: #9 Complaint,. Document filed by Simon Apel, Alexander Katz, Aaron Kraminer, Joseph Krausz, Tesfast, LLC..(Levenson, Scott)
February 9, 2023 Filing 27 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE COUNTY of BERGEN, re: #9 Complaint,. Document filed by Simon Apel, Alexander Katz, Aaron Kraminer, Joseph Krausz, Tesfast, LLC..(Levenson, Scott)
February 9, 2023 Filing 26 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DR. RICHARD AFONJA, re: #9 Complaint,. Document filed by Simon Apel, Alexander Katz, Aaron Kraminer, Joseph Krausz, Tesfast, LLC..(Levenson, Scott)
February 8, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Scott Craig Levenson to RE-FILE Document No. #21 Request for Issuance of Summons, #22 Request for Issuance of Summons, #25 Request for Issuance of Summons, #24 Request for Issuance of Summons, #23 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party name must match pleading in docket entry and on PDF (Richard Afonja). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
February 7, 2023 Filing 25 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FASTMED, LLC, re: #9 Complaint. Document filed by Simon Apel, Alexander Katz, Aaron Kraminer, Joseph Krausz, Tesfast, LLC..(Levenson, Scott) Modified on 2/8/2023 (sj).
February 7, 2023 Filing 24 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to YONAH CARLEBACH, re: #9 Complaint. Document filed by Simon Apel, Alexander Katz, Aaron Kraminer, Joseph Krausz, Tesfast, LLC..(Levenson, Scott) Modified on 2/8/2023 (sj).
February 7, 2023 Filing 23 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ERIC BOBER, re: #9 Complaint. Document filed by Simon Apel, Alexander Katz, Aaron Kraminer, Joseph Krausz, Tesfast, LLC..(Levenson, Scott) Modified on 2/8/2023 (sj).
February 7, 2023 Filing 22 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE COUNTY of BERGEN, re: #9 Complaint. Document filed by Simon Apel, Alexander Katz, Aaron Kraminer, Joseph Krausz, Tesfast, LLC..(Levenson, Scott) Modified on 2/8/2023 (sj).
February 7, 2023 Filing 21 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DR. RICHARD AFONJAS, re: #9 Complaint. Document filed by Simon Apel, Alexander Katz, Aaron Kraminer, Joseph Krausz, Tesfast, LLC..(Levenson, Scott) Modified on 2/8/2023 (sj).
February 6, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Scott Craig Levenson to RE-FILE Document No. #18 Request for Issuance of Summons, #17 Request for Issuance of Summons, #16 Request for Issuance of Summons, #20 Request for Issuance of Summons, #19 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on the docket entry text must match exactly as it appears on the pleading caption; party name on the PDF case caption must match exactly as it appears on the pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
February 3, 2023 Filing 20 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FASTMED, LLC, re: #9 Complaint,. Document filed by Simon Apel, Alexander Katz, Aaron Kraminer, Joseph Krausz, Tesfast, LLC..(Levenson, Scott) Modified on 2/6/2023 (jgo).
February 3, 2023 Filing 19 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ERIC BOBER, re: #9 Complaint,. Document filed by Simon Apel, Alexander Katz, Aaron Kraminer, Joseph Krausz, Tesfast, LLC..(Levenson, Scott) Modified on 2/6/2023 (jgo).
February 3, 2023 Filing 18 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to YONAH CARLEBACH, re: #9 Complaint,. Document filed by Simon Apel, Alexander Katz, Aaron Kraminer, Joseph Krausz, Tesfast, LLC..(Levenson, Scott) Modified on 2/6/2023 (jgo).
February 3, 2023 Filing 17 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE COUNTY OF BERGEN C/O THOMAS J. DUCH, ESQ, re: #9 Complaint,. Document filed by Simon Apel, Alexander Katz, Aaron Kraminer, Joseph Krausz, Tesfast, LLC..(Levenson, Scott) Modified on 2/6/2023 (jgo).
February 3, 2023 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST AS TO AND PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DR. RICHARD AFONJAS, M.D., re: #9 Complaint,. Document filed by Simon Apel, Alexander Katz, Aaron Kraminer, Joseph Krausz, Tesfast, LLC..(Levenson, Scott) Modified on 2/6/2023 (jgo).
February 3, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Scott Craig Levenson to RE-FILE Document No. #11 Request for Issuance of Summons, #14 Request for Issuance of Summons, #15 Request for Issuance of Summons, #12 Request for Issuance of Summons, #13 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the form used for the summons is not the official A.O. Standard Summons form dated 6/12; All Defendant's names must be clearly seen in caption, if all names do not fit in the space provided, name the first listed defendant on the pleading followed by 'et al'. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
February 2, 2023 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to YONAH CARLEBACH, re: #9 Complaint,. Document filed by Simon Apel, Alexander Katz, Aaron Kraminer, Joseph Krausz, Tesfast, LLC..(Levenson, Scott) Modified on 2/3/2023 (sj).
February 2, 2023 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE COUNTY OF BERGEN C/O THOMAS J. DUCH, ESQ, re: #9 Complaint,. Document filed by Simon Apel, Alexander Katz, Aaron Kraminer, Joseph Krausz, Tesfast, LLC..(Levenson, Scott) Modified on 2/3/2023 (sj).
February 2, 2023 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FASTMED, LLC, re: #9 Complaint,. Document filed by Simon Apel, Alexander Katz, Aaron Kraminer, Joseph Krausz, Tesfast, LLC..(Levenson, Scott) Modified on 2/3/2023 (sj).
February 2, 2023 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ERIC BOBER, re: #9 Complaint,. Document filed by Simon Apel, Alexander Katz, Aaron Kraminer, Joseph Krausz, Tesfast, LLC..(Levenson, Scott) Modified on 2/3/2023 (sj).
February 2, 2023 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DR. RICHARD AFONJAS, M.D, re: #9 Complaint. Document filed by Simon Apel, Alexander Katz, Aaron Kraminer, Joseph Krausz, Tesfast, LLC..(Levenson, Scott) Modified on 2/3/2023 (sj).
February 2, 2023 Filing 10 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Levenson, Scott)
February 2, 2023 Filing 9 COMPLAINT against Richard Afonja, Eric Bober, Yonah Carlebach, County of Bergen, Fastmed, LLC. Document filed by Aaron Kraminer, Alexander Katz, Joseph Krausz, Tesfast, LLC, Simon Apel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Levenson, Scott)
February 2, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Scott Craig Levenson to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; The names of all parties must be seen in caption, if all names do not fit in the space provided, name the first listed defendant on the pleading followed by 'et al'; The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your summons request when you correct and refile your pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
February 2, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Scott Craig Levenson to RE-FILE re: Document No. #2 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading; if a party name is modified, it must be added to the docket. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
February 1, 2023 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to YONAH CARLEBACH, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Simon Apel, Alexander Katz, Aaron Kraminer, Joseph Krausz, Tesfast, LLC..(Levenson, Scott)
February 1, 2023 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE COUNTY OF BERGEN C/O THOMAS J. DUCH, ESQ, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Simon Apel, Alexander Katz, Aaron Kraminer, Joseph Krausz, Tesfast, LLC..(Levenson, Scott)
February 1, 2023 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FASTMED, LLC, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Simon Apel, Alexander Katz, Aaron Kraminer, Joseph Krausz, Tesfast, LLC..(Levenson, Scott)
February 1, 2023 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ERIC BOBER, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Simon Apel, Alexander Katz, Aaron Kraminer, Joseph Krausz, Tesfast, LLC..(Levenson, Scott)
February 1, 2023 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DR. RICHARD AFONJAS, M.D., re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Simon Apel, Alexander Katz, Aaron Kraminer, Joseph Krausz, Tesfast, LLC..(Levenson, Scott)
February 1, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Levenson, Scott)
February 1, 2023 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Eric Bober, Yonah Carlebach, County of Bergen, Fastmed, LLC. Document filed by Aaron Kraminer, Alexander Katz, Joseph Krausz, Tesfast, LLC, Simon Apel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Levenson, Scott) Modified on 2/2/2023 (sj).
January 12, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Scott Craig Levenson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
January 12, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Scott Craig Levenson. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
January 12, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Scott Craig Levenson to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected; the pleading was not signed by the attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
January 12, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Scott Craig Levenson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: TESFAST, LLC; FASTMED, LLC; Yonah Cerlebach. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
January 12, 2023 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
January 12, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
January 12, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
January 11, 2023 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27189514)Document filed by Aaron Kraminer, Alexander Katz, Joseph Krausz, TESFAST, LLC, Simon Apel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Photos, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Records of Tests).(Levenson, Scott) Modified on 1/12/2023 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tesfast, LLC et al v. Fastmed, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TESFAST, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Kraminer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Krausz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon Apel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FASTMED, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yonah Carlebach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Richard Afonja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Bober
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF BERGEN
Represented By: PHILIP WILLIAM LAMPARELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?