LUDWIG v. CALLIGARO, DPM et al
Plaintiff: VICTORIA LUDWIG
Defendant: LINDSEY CALLIGARO, DPM, WAYNE FOOT & ANKLE CENTER, P.A., ANKLE & FOOT CENTERS OF AMERICA NJ, ANKLE & FOOT CENTER OF AMERICA, JANE DOE, DPM 1-5 and XYZ COMPANY MEDICAL GROUP AND/OR ASSOCIATES 1-5
Case Number: 2:2023cv03652
Filed: July 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Esther Salas
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1402 Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: The Court will reschedule the 9/21/23 conference to 9/19/23 at 10am. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/31/23. (tjg, )
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and ORDER of Dismissal without prejudice as to Defendants ANKLE & FOOT CENTER OF AMERICA and ANKLE & FOOT CENTERS OF AMERICA NJ. Defendants ANKLE & FOOT CENTER OF AMERICA and ANKLE & FOOT CENTERS OF AMERICA NJ terminated. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 8/22/2023. (dam)
August 21, 2023 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to def Foot and Ankle Center by VICTORIA LUDWIG. (Attachments: #1 Stip of Dismissal)(ANDERSON, ROBERT)
August 21, 2023 Filing 7 Diversity Disclosure Statement by VICTORIA LUDWIG. (Attachments: #1 Certification Diversity Certification)(ANDERSON, ROBERT)
August 4, 2023 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ek)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor by telephone on 9/21/23 at 10am. Parties are to use the Courts teleconference dial-in: 888-808-6929 and Access Code is 9464201. Local counsel for any/all parties must participate. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order (for Judge Salas cases, please use her dedicated PTSO found in the same location) found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference.. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/3/23. (tjg, )
August 3, 2023 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, )
August 2, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by All Defendants.(DELAURENTIS, DOMINIC)
July 14, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by parties and intervenors in diversity actions to identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Such disclosure statements must be filed with the parties, intervenors or proposed intervenors first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response or other request addressed to the Court. (lag, )
July 13, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ANKLE & FOOT CENTER OF AMERICA, ANKLE & FOOT CENTERS OF AMERICA NJ, LINDSEY CALLIGARO, DPM, WAYNE FOOT & ANKLE CENTER, P.A.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
July 11, 2023 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint by VICTORIA LUDWIG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Curriculum Vitae)(ANDERSON, ROBERT)
July 11, 2023 Filing 2 Exhibit to QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44,, by All Plaintiffs. (ANDERSON, ROBERT)
July 11, 2023 Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (ps)
July 10, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a #Civil Cover Sheet using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ps)
July 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14439609) with JURY DEMAND, filed by VICTORIA LUDWIG. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(ANDERSON, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LUDWIG v. CALLIGARO, DPM et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTORIA LUDWIG
Represented By: ROBERT M. ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDSEY CALLIGARO, DPM
Represented By: DOMINIC A. DELAURENTIS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAYNE FOOT & ANKLE CENTER, P.A.
Represented By: DOMINIC A. DELAURENTIS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANKLE & FOOT CENTERS OF AMERICA NJ
Represented By: DOMINIC A. DELAURENTIS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANKLE & FOOT CENTER OF AMERICA
Represented By: DOMINIC A. DELAURENTIS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE, DPM 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ COMPANY MEDICAL GROUP AND/OR ASSOCIATES 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?