INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 825 v. INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION et al
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 825
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION, INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION 1233, INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION 1235, INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION LOCAL 1804-1, INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION LOCAL 1233 and INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION LOCAL 1235
Case Number: 2:2023cv03689
Filed: July 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jose R Almonte
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendants' request to admit Nicholas M. Graziano, Esq., to appear before this Court pro hac vice (ECF No. 12). Local Civil Rule 101.1(c)(1) states that a party's motion for admission pro hac vice "shall contain a certified statement of the applicant disclosing each bar in which the applicant is a member in good standing including the year of admission and the name and address of the official or office maintaining the roll of such members of its bar; in lieu thereof, the motion may attach a certificate of good standing issued by the person or office maintaining the roll of the members of its bar." Nicholas M. Graziano provides no such certification or certificate(s) of good standing for the federal court(s) to which he is admitted, as required by Local Civil Rule 101.1(c)(1). The motion papers also do not indicate whether the request is made with the consent of the parties. The parties' consent is only noted in the text of the proposed order at ECF No. 12-2. No later than September 12, 2023, Defendants shall file a certification supplementing the application for admission pro hac vice with this information. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 9/7/2023. (akw)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 LETTER ORDER Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.1. On 10/16/2023 at 1:30 PM there shall be an Initial Scheduling Conference before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 9/5/2023. (wh)
August 31, 2023 Filing 14 Proposed Order by All Defendants re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. (SHERIDAN, JOHN)
August 31, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - A Proposed Order was not submitted with the #13 MOTION to Dismiss submitted by J. SHERIDAN on 8/30/2023. PLEASE SUBMIT THE MISSING DOCUMENT ONLY. (wh)
August 31, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Motion set for 10/2/2023 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (wh)
August 30, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Brief in support of motion, #2 Certification of John P. Sheridan, #3 Exhibit A)(SHERIDAN, JOHN)
August 29, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion set for 10/2/2023 before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (wh)
August 28, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(JASINSKI, BRIAN)
August 28, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN A. JASINSKI on behalf of All Defendants (JASINSKI, BRIAN)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Amended Complaint . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 8/14/2023. (akw)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: Defendants' motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise reply to the Amended Complaint until August 30, 2023 (ECF No. 8) is GRANTED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 8/14/2023. (akw)
August 11, 2023 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Amended Complaint by INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION, INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION LOCAL 1233, INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION LOCAL 1235, INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION LOCAL 1804-1. (SHERIDAN, JOHN)
August 2, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 825. INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION LOCAL 1235 served on 7/26/2023, answer due 8/16/2023. (HEMSLEY, ALEXANDER)
August 2, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 825. INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION LOCAL 1233 served on 7/26/2023, answer due 8/16/2023. (HEMSLEY, ALEXANDER)
July 19, 2023 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 825.(GIBLIN, VINCENT) Modified on 7/20/2023 (wh).
July 14, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDER HEMSLEY, III on behalf of INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 825 (HEMSLEY, ALEXANDER)
July 12, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 825. (GIBLIN, VINCENT)
July 11, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION, INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION LOCAL 1233, INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION LOCAL 1235, INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION LOCAL 1804-1. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (wh)
July 11, 2023 Case assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. (jr)
July 11, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party or intervenor. Please refer to the Court's website at #www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (wh)
July 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION, INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION LOCAL 1233, INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION LOCAL 1235, and INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION LOCAL 1804-1 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14443762), filed by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 825. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(GIBLIN, VINCENT) Modified on 7/11/2023 (wh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 825 v. INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 825
Represented By: VINCENT M. GIBLIN
Represented By: ALEXANDER HEMSLEY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION
Represented By: JOHN PHILIP SHERIDAN
Represented By: BRIAN A. JASINSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION 1233
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION 1235
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION LOCAL 1804-1
Represented By: BRIAN A. JASINSKI
Represented By: JOHN PHILIP SHERIDAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION LOCAL 1233
Represented By: JOHN PHILIP SHERIDAN
Represented By: BRIAN A. JASINSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION LOCAL 1235
Represented By: JOHN PHILIP SHERIDAN
Represented By: BRIAN A. JASINSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?