PROGRESSIVE SPINE AND ORTHOPAEDICS, LLC v. CENTRAL STATES, SOUTHEAST AND SOUTHWEST AREAS HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, TEAMCARE et al
Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE SPINE AND ORTHOPAEDICS, LLC
Defendant: CENTRAL STATES, SOUTHEAST AND SOUTHWEST AREAS HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, TEAMCARE, JOHN DOE (1-10) and XYZ CORP (1-10)
Case Number: 2:2023cv04225
Filed: August 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael E Farbiarz
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relatio
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Dismiss with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael E. Farbiarz on 9/29/2023. (qa, )
September 28, 2023 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by CENTRAL STATES, SOUTHEAST AND SOUTHWEST AREAS HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, TEAMCARE. (NEW, DAVID)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement.( Administrative Termination deadline set for 11/27/2023). Signed by Judge Michael E. Farbiarz on 9/25/2023. (lag, )
September 22, 2023 Filing 10 Letter from Jeffrey M. Halkovich. (HALKOVICH, JEFFREY)
September 7, 2023 Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 10/16/2023 before Judge Michael E. Farbiarz. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
September 6, 2023 Filing 9 Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by CENTRAL STATES, SOUTHEAST AND SOUTHWEST AREAS HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, TEAMCARE. (NEW, DAVID)
September 5, 2023 Filing 8 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss . (HALKOVICH, JEFFREY)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/1/2023 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/31/23. (LM, )
August 31, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 10/2/2023 before Judge Michael E. Farbiarz. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
August 29, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by CENTRAL STATES, SOUTHEAST AND SOUTHWEST AREAS HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, TEAMCARE. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Juan Beaton, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Brief Memorandum of Law, #8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(NEW, DAVID)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to answer the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/10/2023. (lag, )
August 9, 2023 Filing 4 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANTS TIME TO ANSWER THE COMPLAINT by CENTRAL STATES, SOUTHEAST AND SOUTHWEST AREAS HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, TEAMCARE. (NEW, DAVID)
August 9, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY M HALKOVICH on behalf of PROGRESSIVE SPINE AND ORTHOPAEDICS, LLC (HALKOVICH, JEFFREY)
August 8, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CENTRAL STATES, SOUTHEAST AND SOUTHWEST AREAS HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, TEAMCARE. (NEW, DAVID)
August 8, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CENTRAL STATES, SOUTHEAST AND SOUTHWEST AREAS HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, TEAMCARE from Superior Court of New Jersey - Bergen County, case number BER-L-003365-23. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14511282), filed by CENTRAL STATES, SOUTHEAST AND SOUTHWEST AREAS HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, TEAMCARE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(NEW, DAVID)
August 8, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Michael E. Farbiarz and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PROGRESSIVE SPINE AND ORTHOPAEDICS, LLC v. CENTRAL STATES, SOUTHEAST AND SOUTHWEST AREAS HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, TEAMCARE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE SPINE AND ORTHOPAEDICS, LLC
Represented By: JEFFREY M HALKOVICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTRAL STATES, SOUTHEAST AND SOUTHWEST AREAS HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN, TEAMCARE
Represented By: DAVID W. NEW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ CORP (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?